Biaggi & Biaggi, P.S.C. v. Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation (FDIC-R)

Plaintiff: Biaggi & Biaggi, P.S.C.
Defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation (FDIC-R)
Case Number: 3:2010cv01671
Filed: July 15, 2010
Court: Puerto Rico District Court
Office: San Juan Office
County: Mayaguez
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 16, 2018 136 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting 128 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Judgment shall be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez on 08/16/2018. (NNR)
April 16, 2018 113 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying 89 motion to supplement, denying 91 motion to supplement, granting in part 94 motion to strike. The court will not consider the invoices in reconsideration of its denial of the motion for summary judgment, but plaintif f may attempt to introduce them into evidence at trial. The FDIC is granted until 5/16/18 to conduct discovery, strictly limited to these invoices. So ordered. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on April 16, 2018.(McGiverin, Bruce)
October 23, 2015 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 39 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment 77 . Signed by Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez on 10/23/2015. (VCC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Biaggi & Biaggi, P.S.C. v. Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation (FDIC-R)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation (FDIC-R)
Represented By: Freddie Perez-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Biaggi & Biaggi, P.S.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?