EON Corp, IP Holdings, LLC v. AT&T Mobility LLC

Defendant: Puerto Rico Telephone Company, Inc., Claro, Inc., AT&T Mobility Puerto Rico, Inc., Telecomunicaciones de Puerto Rico, Inc., Telefonica de Puerto Rico, Inc. and AT&T Mobility LLC.
Plaintiff: EON Corp, IP Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 3:2011cv01555
Filed: June 14, 2011
Court: Puerto Rico District Court
Office: San Juan Office
County: San Juan
Presiding Judge: Francisco A. Besosa
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 25, 2014 465 Opinion or Order of the Court CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Silvia Carreno-Coll on 4/25/2014. (NBB)
July 30, 2012 161 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER re: Patent Prosecution Bar. An updated protective order is due August 10, 2012. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Silvia Carreno-Coll(NBB)
July 24, 2012 157 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER re 39 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; re 77 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; and re 120 Report and Recommendation. The Court has made an independent examination of the entire record in this case, includ ing plaintiff's objections to the R&R and defendants' opposition to those objections, and ADOPTS IN PART AND DENIES IN PART the magistrate judge's findings and recommendations as the opinion of this Court. Regarding ATT-M, the Court f inds that specific jurisdiction is proper and therefore REJECTS ATT-M's motion to dismiss. Regarding ATT-I, the Court also finds that specific jurisdiction is proper and therefore DENIES ATT-I's motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 07/24/2012. (brc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EON Corp, IP Holdings, LLC v. AT&T Mobility LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Puerto Rico Telephone Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claro, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Mobility Puerto Rico, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Telecomunicaciones de Puerto Rico, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Telefonica de Puerto Rico, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Mobility LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EON Corp, IP Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Carmen M. Alfonso-Rodriguez
Represented By: Cristina Arenas-Solis
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Johnson
Represented By: Pedro Santiago-Rivera
Represented By: Daniel Scardino
Represented By: Eugenio J. Torres-Oyola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?