Casco, Inc. v. John Deere Construction Company & Forestry Company

Plaintiff: Casco, Inc.
Defendant: John Deere Construction Company & Forestry Company
Case Number: 3:2013cv01325
Filed: April 25, 2013
Court: Puerto Rico District Court
Office: San Juan Office
County: San Juan
Presiding Judge: Gustavo A. Gelpi
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1330 Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 8, 2015 193 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER: Denying 156 "Motion in Limine Regarding Plaintiff's CPA;" Granting in Part and Denying in Part 177 "Defendant John Deere Construction & Forestry Company's Motion in Limine;" and Denying 185 "Plaintiff's Motion in Limine to Suppress Termination Letter." See Opinion and Order attached. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 7/8/2015. (DJP)
August 26, 2014 117 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER Denying 64 Motion for summary judgment; Denying 66 motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (MET)
August 1, 2013 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Denying 39 motion to deposit funds. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 8/1/2013.(TC)
June 24, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER: Denying 11 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; Noted 27 Motion In Compliance and Setting Case Schedule. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 6/24/2013. (TC) Modified on 6/25/2013 as to title (er).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Casco, Inc. v. John Deere Construction Company & Forestry Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casco, Inc.
Represented By: Sarika J. Angulo-Velazquez
Represented By: Ricardo F. Casellas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Deere Construction Company & Forestry Company
Represented By: Henry O. Freese-Souffront
Represented By: Eduardo A. Zayas-Marxuach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?