Berio-Ramos v. Flores-Garcia et al
Plaintiff: Monin Berio-Ramos
Defendant: Gerardo Flores-Garcia and Eduardo Bhatia-Gautier
Case Number: 3:2013cv01879
Filed: November 27, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Office: San Juan Office
County: San Juan
Presiding Judge: Francisco A. Besosa
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 141 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Granting 122 "Motion in Limine to Exclude Plaintiffs Expert Witness Testimony and Report." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 3/7/2016. (DJP)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Granting in Part and Denying in Part 112 "Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings." Plaintiff's claims against the Senate are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 1/21/2016. (DJP)
December 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 102 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Denying 101 "Motion to Compel Defendants to Produce Mr. Flores to be Deposed by Plaintiff." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 12/11/2015. (DJP)
December 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 100 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Denying 95 "Urgent Informative Motion and Request for Extension of Time to Finalize Discovery." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 12/10/2015. (DJP)
July 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Denying 66 "Plaintiff's Motion to Inform Serving of Process on the Senate of Puerto Rico Through its President and Request for an Order Requiring the Senate to Reimburse Plaintiff for her Cost of Serving Process." See Memorandum and Order attached. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 7/29/2015. (DJP)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berio-Ramos v. Flores-Garcia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monin Berio-Ramos
Represented By: Manuel Moraza-Choisne
Represented By: Donato Rivera-De-Jesus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerardo Flores-Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eduardo Bhatia-Gautier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?