Rivera-Cruz v. Hewitt Associates Caribe, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Nilda Rivera-Cruz |
Defendant: |
Hewitt Associates Caribe, Inc. and Aon Risk Solutions of Puerto Rico, Inc. |
Case Number: |
3:2015cv01454 |
Filed: |
April 23, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico |
Office: |
San Juan Office |
County: |
San Juan |
Presiding Judge: |
Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 2000 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 6, 2018 |
Filing
141
OPINION AND ORDER: Adopting in part and Rejecting in Part 137 "Report and Recommendation." See attached. The request for summary judgment on plaintiff's hostile work environment claim based on national origin is DENIED under Title VII and Law 100; The request for summary judgment with respect to plaintiff's discrimination claim under ADEA and Law 100 is GRANTED; The request for summary judgment on plaintiff's hostile work environment claim based on age is GRANTED; Th e request for summary judgment as to plaintiff's retaliation claim is GRANTED; The request for summary judgment regarding plaintiff's claims under Law 379, the Civil Code and the Puerto Rico Constitution is GRANTED; and The request for summary judgment on plaintiff's Law 80 claim is DENIED. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 03/30/2018.(LMR)
|
February 21, 2018 |
Filing
138
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Adopting 136 "Report and Recommendation." Accordingly, the motion for summary judgment at Docket No. 108 is granted. Plaintiff's claims against ARS under Title VII, ADEA, Law 100, Law 379, Law 80, Article 18 02 of the Puerto Rico Civil Code and breach of contract statutes are dismissed. By March 1, 2018, plaintiff shall show cause as to why her claims against ARS under the Puerto Rico Constitution should not be dismissed as well. See attached. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 02/21/2018.(LMR)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?