Laguerre Saavedra et al v. Editorial Cultural, Inc.
Plaintiff: Beatriz Laguerre Saavedra and Roberto Ramos Perea
Defendant: Editorial Cultural, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv02436
Filed: October 5, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Office: San Juan Office
County: Adjuntas
Presiding Judge: Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 183 OPINION AND ORDER regarding 180 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marcos E. Lopez on 3/8/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 6, # 2 Exhibit 7) (YI)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 156 OPINION AND ORDER denying 150 Motion in Limine. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marcos E. Lopez on 1/29/2019. (YI)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 146 OPINION AND ORDER denying 113 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marcos E. Lopez on 12/11/2018. (YI)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laguerre Saavedra et al v. Editorial Cultural, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beatriz Laguerre Saavedra
Represented By: Jose A. Hernandez-Mayoral
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberto Ramos Perea
Represented By: Jose A. Hernandez-Mayoral
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Editorial Cultural, Inc.
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?