Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc. v. Zaragoza-Gomez

Plaintiff: Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc.
Defendant: Juan C Zaragoza-Gomez
Case Number: 3:2015cv03018
Filed: December 4, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Office: San Juan Office
County: San Juan
Presiding Judge: Jose A. Fuste
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 141 OPINION AND ORDER: On the basis of the Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law contained in our expanded Opinion and Order, the court hereby permanently enjoins and declares invalid, under both federal constitutional and statutory law, section 1022.0 3(b)(2) and (d) of the Puerto Rico Internal Revenue Code of 2011, which is codified at 13 L.P.R.A. § 30073(b)(2) and (d). Those subsections of the AMT statute comprise the second measure of tentative minimum tax, which consists of the tangible- property tax and the expenses tax, and the list of exemptions to the tangible-property tax. The injunction shall go into effect immediately. The Puerto Rico Secretary of the Treasury and all of his or her subordinates must stop all levying, collection, and enforcement of the AMT under the enjoined subsections, including as an estimated payment under 13 L.P.R.A. § 30263 and any other applicable section. Signed by Judge Jose A. Fuste on 3/28/2016.(mrj)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 95 OPINION AND ORDER re 93 Supplemental Motion filed by Melba Acosta-Febo, 81 MOTION to Compel GDB President to Produce Documents and Information filed by Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc., 90 Motion In Compliance with Order in Docket No. 88 filed by Melba Acosta-Febo. Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 1/21/2016, 3:00 P.M. Signed by Judge Jose A. Fuste on 1/21/2016.(mrj)
January 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER DENYING 53 MOTION to Amend/Correct or Alter Orders filed by Juan C Zaragoza-Gomez. Signed by Judge Jose A. Fuste on 1/8/2016.(mrj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc. v. Zaragoza-Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc.
Represented By: Francisco G. Bruno-Rovira
Represented By: Alejandro J. Cepeda-Diaz
Represented By: Joseph PHV S. Grinstein
Represented By: Neal S. Manne
Represented By: Juan A. Marques-Diaz
Represented By: Shawn J. Rabin
Represented By: Steven M. Shepard
Represented By: Virkram Swaruup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan C Zaragoza-Gomez
Represented By: Gerardo A. De-Jesus-Annoni
Represented By: Roberto A. Fernandez-Quiles
Represented By: Jose L. Gonzalez-Castaner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?