All further filings must only be made in the CM/ECF system of the US Bankruptcy Court for the District of PR, Case No. 17-BK-3566(LTS)
Plaintiff: Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico
Undetermined: Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund V, Inc., Puerto Rico Mortgage-Backed & U.S. Government Securities Fund, Inc, Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Bond Fund II, Inc., PUERTO RICO FIXED INCOME FUND V, INC., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund VI, Inc., Tax-Free Puerto Rico Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund VI, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund II, Inc., American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees (AFSCME), Tax-Free Puerto Rico Target Maturity Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico GNMA and U.S. Government Target Maturity Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund IV, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund, Inc., Tax-Free Puerto Rico Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax Free Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Bond Fund I, Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund IV, Inc., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Target Maturity Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund III, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund III, Inc. and Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Bond Fund, Inc.
Debtor: The Employees Retirement System of the Government of the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico
Case Number: 3:2017cv01685
Filed: May 21, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Office: San Juan Office
County: San Juan
Presiding Judge: Laura Taylor Swain
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 11:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: For administration purposes only, the public docket in the above-captioned case shall be maintained on the Case Management / Electronic Case Files (CM/ECF) system of the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Puerto Rico. Bankruptcy Case No. 17 BK 3566 has been opened and will correspond to the existing case no. 17 CV 1685. All further filings in the above-captioned cases must only be made in the CM/ECF system of the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Puerto Rico, and the Clerk of Court for the District of Puerto Rico will transfer all existing filings into the Bankruptcy Court CM/ECF system. Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 5/26/2017.(ct)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER OF DESIGNATION. Pursuant to 48 U.S.C. 2168(b), United States District Judge Laura Taylor Swain, from the Southern District of New York, is designated as the presiding judge in this case. Signed by Chief Judge, US Court of Appeals for the First Circuit, Jeffrey R. Howard on 5/23/2017.(gsr)
May 23, 2017 Filing 15 Motion to allow Dipesh Patel to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-5452983) filed by Manuel A. Rodriguez-Banchs on behalf of American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees (AFSCME) Responses due by 6/6/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rodriguez-Banchs, Manuel)
May 23, 2017 Filing 14 Motion to allow Sharon Levine to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-5452972) filed by Manuel A. Rodriguez-Banchs on behalf of American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees (AFSCME) Responses due by 6/6/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rodriguez-Banchs, Manuel)
May 23, 2017 Filing 13 Motion to allow Rachel Ehrlich Albanese to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-5452967) filed by Jose Alberto Sosa-Llorens on behalf of The Employees Retirement System of the Government of the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Responses due by 6/6/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Sosa-Llorens, Jose) Modified on 5/24/2017 to correct attorney's name (cm).
May 23, 2017 Filing 12 Motion to allow Matthew Blumin to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-5452960) filed by Manuel A. Rodriguez-Banchs on behalf of American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees (AFSCME) Responses due by 6/6/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rodriguez-Banchs, Manuel)
May 23, 2017 Filing 11 Motion to allow Richard Chesley to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-5452948) filed by Jose Alberto Sosa-Llorens on behalf of The Employees Retirement System of the Government of the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Responses due by 6/6/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Sosa-Llorens, Jose)
May 23, 2017 Filing 10 Motion to allow Teague Paterson to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-5452949) filed by Manuel A. Rodriguez-Banchs on behalf of American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees (AFSCME) Responses due by 6/6/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rodriguez-Banchs, Manuel)
May 23, 2017 Filing 9 Motion to allow Judith Rivlin to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-5452941) filed by Manuel A. Rodriguez-Banchs on behalf of American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees (AFSCME) Responses due by 6/6/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rodriguez-Banchs, Manuel)
May 23, 2017 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jose Alberto Sosa-Llorens on behalf of The Employees Retirement System of the Government of the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico (Sosa-Llorens, Jose)
May 23, 2017 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Manuel A. Rodriguez-Banchs on behalf of American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees (AFSCME) (Rodriguez-Banchs, Manuel)
May 23, 2017 Filing 6 Motion to allow John Cunningham to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-5451182) filed by Alicia I. Lavergne-Ramirez on behalf of PUERTO RICO FIXED INCOME FUND V, INC., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Bond Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Bond Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Target Maturity Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund III, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund IV, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund VI, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico GNMA and U.S. Government Target Maturity Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Bond Fund I, Puerto Rico Investors Tax Free Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund III, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund IV, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund V, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund VI, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Mortgage-Backed & U.S. Government Securities Fund, Inc, Tax-Free Puerto Rico Fund II, Inc., Tax-Free Puerto Rico Fund, Inc., Tax-Free Puerto Rico Target Maturity Fund, Inc. Responses due by 6/6/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Lavergne-Ramirez, Alicia)
May 23, 2017 Filing 5 Motion to allow Jason Zakia to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-5451161) filed by Alicia I. Lavergne-Ramirez on behalf of PUERTO RICO FIXED INCOME FUND V, INC., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Bond Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Bond Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Target Maturity Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund III, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund IV, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund VI, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico GNMA and U.S. Government Target Maturity Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Bond Fund I, Puerto Rico Investors Tax Free Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund III, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund IV, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund V, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund VI, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Mortgage-Backed & U.S. Government Securities Fund, Inc, Tax-Free Puerto Rico Fund II, Inc., Tax-Free Puerto Rico Fund, Inc., Tax-Free Puerto Rico Target Maturity Fund, Inc. Responses due by 6/6/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Lavergne-Ramirez, Alicia)
May 23, 2017 Filing 4 Motion to allow Fernando de la Hoz to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-5451129) filed by Alicia I. Lavergne-Ramirez on behalf of PUERTO RICO FIXED INCOME FUND V, INC., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Bond Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Bond Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Target Maturity Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund III, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund IV, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund VI, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico GNMA and U.S. Government Target Maturity Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Bond Fund I, Puerto Rico Investors Tax Free Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund III, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund IV, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund V, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund VI, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Mortgage-Backed & U.S. Government Securities Fund, Inc, Tax-Free Puerto Rico Fund II, Inc., Tax-Free Puerto Rico Fund, Inc., Tax-Free Puerto Rico Target Maturity Fund, Inc. Responses due by 6/6/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Lavergne-Ramirez, Alicia)
May 23, 2017 Filing 3 Motion to allow Glenn Kurtz to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-5451096) filed by Alicia I. Lavergne-Ramirez on behalf of PUERTO RICO FIXED INCOME FUND V, INC., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Bond Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Bond Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Target Maturity Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund III, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund IV, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund VI, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico GNMA and U.S. Government Target Maturity Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Bond Fund I, Puerto Rico Investors Tax Free Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund III, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund IV, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund V, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund VI, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Mortgage-Backed & U.S. Government Securities Fund, Inc, Tax-Free Puerto Rico Fund II, Inc., Tax-Free Puerto Rico Fund, Inc., Tax-Free Puerto Rico Target Maturity Fund, Inc. Responses due by 6/6/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Lavergne-Ramirez, Alicia)
May 23, 2017 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Alicia I. Lavergne-Ramirez on behalf of Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Bond Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Bond Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Target Maturity Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund III, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund IV, Inc., PUERTO RICO FIXED INCOME FUND V, INC., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund VI, Inc., Puerto Rico GNMA and U.S. Government Target Maturity Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Bond Fund I, Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax Free Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund III, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund IV, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund V, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund VI, Inc., Puerto Rico Mortgage-Backed & U.S. Government Securities Fund, Inc, Tax-Free Puerto Rico Fund, Inc., Tax-Free Puerto Rico Fund II, Inc., Tax-Free Puerto Rico Target Maturity Fund, Inc. (Lavergne-Ramirez, Alicia)
May 21, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Title III Petition Filed by the Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico on behalf of the Employees Retirement System of the Government of the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico (ERS) against Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-5448622.), filed by Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico. Service due by 8/21/2017,(Bauer-Alvarez, Hermann) Modified on 5/22/2017 as to name of filer (mr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: All further filings must only be made in the CM/ECF system of the US Bankruptcy Court for the District of PR, Case No. 17-BK-3566(LTS)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund, Inc.
Represented By: Alicia I. Lavergne-Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund V, Inc.
Represented By: Alicia I. Lavergne-Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Puerto Rico Mortgage-Backed & U.S. Government Securities Fund, Inc
Represented By: Alicia I. Lavergne-Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Bond Fund II, Inc.
Represented By: Alicia I. Lavergne-Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: PUERTO RICO FIXED INCOME FUND V, INC.
Represented By: Alicia I. Lavergne-Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund VI, Inc.
Represented By: Alicia I. Lavergne-Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Tax-Free Puerto Rico Fund II, Inc.
Represented By: Alicia I. Lavergne-Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund VI, Inc.
Represented By: Alicia I. Lavergne-Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund II, Inc.
Represented By: Alicia I. Lavergne-Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees (AFSCME)
Represented By: Manuel A. Rodriguez-Banchs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Tax-Free Puerto Rico Target Maturity Fund, Inc.
Represented By: Alicia I. Lavergne-Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Puerto Rico GNMA and U.S. Government Target Maturity Fund, Inc.
Represented By: Alicia I. Lavergne-Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund IV, Inc.
Represented By: Alicia I. Lavergne-Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund, Inc.
Represented By: Alicia I. Lavergne-Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Tax-Free Puerto Rico Fund, Inc.
Represented By: Alicia I. Lavergne-Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Puerto Rico Investors Tax Free Fund II, Inc.
Represented By: Alicia I. Lavergne-Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Puerto Rico Investors Bond Fund I
Represented By: Alicia I. Lavergne-Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund IV, Inc.
Represented By: Alicia I. Lavergne-Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Target Maturity Fund, Inc.
Represented By: Alicia I. Lavergne-Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund III, Inc.
Represented By: Alicia I. Lavergne-Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund III, Inc.
Represented By: Alicia I. Lavergne-Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Bond Fund, Inc.
Represented By: Alicia I. Lavergne-Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico
Represented By: Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: The Employees Retirement System of the Government of the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico
Represented By: Jose Alberto Sosa-Llorens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?