Delgado-Rodriguez v. United States Postal Service et al
Plaintiff: Wilson Delgado-Rodriguez
Defendant: USPS Office of Inspector General (OIG), United States Department of Justice and United States Postal Service
Case Number: 3:2018cv01489
Filed: July 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Office: San Juan Office
County: San Sebastian
Presiding Judge: Aida M Delgado-Colon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2018 **SEE IMAGE #6 **SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilson Delgado-Rodriguez upon United States Department of Justice served on 8/22/2018, answer due 10/12/2018. (cm)
August 22, 2018 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service by All Plaintiffs upon United States Department of Justice served on 8/22/2018, answer due 9/12/2018. (Cobo-Estrella, Humberto)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re #1 Complaint, filed by Wilson Delgado-Rodriguez. The complaint's caption indicates that plaintiff seeks a temporary restraining order and a preliminary injunction. Nonetheless, the complaint does not mention or argue for a temporary restraining order. If plaintiff wishes to obtain a temporary restraining order, he must comply with the requirements of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65(b) and Local Civil Rule 65. Likewise, if plaintiff is pursuing a preliminary injunction, he must comply with the notice requirements of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65(a), as well as Local Civil Rule 65. Signed by U.S. District Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 7/31/2018.(wm)
July 31, 2018 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #4 Summons Issued. ***FILED IN ERROR. Duplicate filing as in D.E. #3 .*** (rom)
July 31, 2018 Filing 4 ***FILED IN ERROR. Duplicate filing as in D.E. #3 .*** Summons Issued as to USPS Office of Inspector General (OIG), United States Department of Justice, United States Postal Service. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (rim) Modified on 7/31/2018 (rom).
July 30, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to USPS Office of Inspector General (OIG), United States Department of Justice, United States Postal Service & U.S. Attorneys Office (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
July 17, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon.(Filing Fee $400.00, Receipt Number PRX100056887) (arg)
July 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Wilson Delgado-Rodriguez. Service due by 10/15/2018, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Summons OIG, #4 Summons Summons US Attorney General, #5 Summons Summons US Attorney Office/PR, #6 Summons Summons US Postal Service)(Cobo-Estrella, Humberto)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Delgado-Rodriguez v. United States Postal Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilson Delgado-Rodriguez
Represented By: Humberto F. Cobo-Estrella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USPS Office of Inspector General (OIG)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?