Lugo et al v. Country Fresh Carolinas LLC
Plaintiff: Mr Giovanny J Lugo, Edward Quinonez-Guzman, Jose A Santiago-Lugo, Juan J Malave-Robles, Jose A Rodriguez-Ruiz, Javier Colon, Fernando N De Jesus-Gonzalez, Sabriel Rivera-Perez, Ryan A Martinez-Delgado, Edgard M Garcia-Vera, Jonathan A Ostolaza-Laboy, Cristian Rodriguez-Vidal, Alexis Huertas-Figueroa, Jose A Ramos-Gonzalez, Jose D Saez-Rodriguez, Pamela Burgos, Heriberto Rosado-Figueroa, Sonny Maldonado-Hernandez, Glorimar Valle-Iturralde, Carlos G Rodriguez-Agosto, Jose A Rodriguez-David, Jose A Casanova, Christopher J Rojas, Efren Coimbre, Peter Louis Santiago-Reyes, Angel J Rivas-Sotomayor, Jonathan A Santiago-Ruiz, Ruben Ortiz-Cordero, Josue M Cora-Yeye, Kelvin Montes-Rivera, Johnny Figueroa-Guzman, Jaime Mendez-Ortiz, Ricardo Davila-Berrios, Juan C Vega-Rodriguez, Rafael D Rodriguez-Vega, Marlene Mercado, Antonio Rios-Santiago, Rauly Cancel, Randy Vazquez-Rivera, Gregorio Rivera-Rosado, Ian J Burgos, Alejandro Laporte-Rivera, Iris N Castaner, Hector O Padilla-Rivera, Alba Reyes-Garcia, Marangely Zayas-Figueroa, Michael Jordan-Lugo, Orlando L Vazquez-Perez, Mayra A Flores-Fradera, Ruben A Garay-Pomales, Nestor L Rivera-Rivera, Jaret Rosario-Danzot, Kevin Q Ramos-Negron, Josue C Lopez-Negron, Jose L Aponte, Charlie Oyola-Colon, Steven Santiago-Santiago, Jose F Santiago-Miranda, Wilson Rivera, Anibal Castrello, Carmen D Serrano-Ortiz, Angel D Velasquez-Delgado, Cristhian A Santiago-Santiago, Luis R Ortiz-Torres, Abner Rodriguez-Rivera, Carlos R Alvarado-Diaz, Marina Garcia-Nieves, Jonathan A. Ostolaza-Laboy, Iris N. Castaner-Caraballo, Juan C. Vega-Rodriguez, Jose D. Saez-Rodriguez, Anibal Castrello-Colon, Edward Quinones-Guzman, Pamela Burgos-Arroyo, Josue M. Cora-Yeye, Nestor L. Rivera-Rivera, Josue C. Lopez-Negron, Carlos G. Rodriguez-Agosto, Luis R. Ortiz-Torres, Mayra A. Flores-Fradera, Juan J. Malave-Robles, Carmen D. Serrano-Ortiz, Jose L. Aponte-Mateo, Jose A. Casanova-Figueroa, Rafael D. Rodriguez-Vega, Orlando L. Vazquez-Perez, Ian J. Burgos-Maiz, Angel D. Velasquez-Delgado, Angel J. Rivas-Sotomayor, Christian Rodriguez-Vidal, Edgard M. Garcia-Vera, Jose A. Santiago-Lugo, Jose A. Rodriguez-Ruiz, Efren Coimbre-Lugo, Fernando N. De Jesus-Gonzalez, Kevin Q. Ramos-Negron, Hector O. Padilla-Rivera, Rauly Cancel-Ramos, Ruben A. Garay-Pomales, Christopher J. Rojas, Javier Colon-Rosario, Jose F. Santiago-Miranda, Carlos R. Alvarado-Diaz, Giovanny J. Lugo-Tirado, Cristhian A. Santiago-Santiago, Jose A. Ramos-Gonzalez, Ryan A. Martinez-Delgado, Jonathan A. Santiago-Ruiz and Jose A. Rodriguez-David
Defendant: Country Fresh Carolinas LLC and Country Fresh Carolina LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv01512
Filed: July 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Office: San Juan Office
County: San Juan
Presiding Judge: Jay A Garcia-Gregory
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2019 Filing 43 Memorandum in Support of its Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint filed by Country Fresh Carolina LLC Re: #35 MOTION to dismiss as to All Plaintiffs filed by Country Fresh Carolina LLC filed by Country Fresh Carolina LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Perez-Giusti, Luis)
January 9, 2019 Filing 42 AMENDED COMPLAINT First against All Defendants, filed by Jonathan A. Ostolaza-Laboy, Luis R. Ortiz-Torres, Orlando L. Vazquez-Perez, Alexis Huertas-Figueroa, Jose A. Casanova-Figueroa, Sonny Maldonado-Hernandez, Ruben A. Garay-Pomales, Johnny Figueroa-Guzman, Gregorio Rivera-Rosado, Jose A. Santiago-Lugo, Ryan A. Martinez-Delgado, Peter Louis Santiago-Reyes, Carmen D. Serrano-Ortiz, Edgard M. Garcia-Vera, Efren Coimbre-Lugo, Ruben Ortiz-Cordero, Hector O. Padilla-Rivera, Javier Colon-Rosario, Jose A. Rodriguez-Ruiz, Juan C. Vega-Rodriguez, Marlene Mercado, Rafael D. Rodriguez-Vega, Antonio Rios-Santiago, Randy Vazquez-Rivera, Jonathan A. Santiago-Ruiz, Wilson Rivera, Josue M. Cora-Yeye, Carlos R. Alvarado-Diaz, Heriberto Rosado-Figueroa, Steven Santiago-Santiago, Jose F. Santiago-Miranda, Angel D. Velasquez-Delgado, Carlos G. Rodriguez-Agosto, Marina Garcia-Nieves, Glorimar Valle-Iturralde, Jose D. Saez-Rodriguez, Marangely Zayas-Figueroa, Alba Reyes-Garcia, Mayra A. Flores-Fradera, Giovanny J. Lugo-Tirado, Kelvin Montes-Rivera, Juan J. Malave-Robles, Jaime Mendez-Ortiz, Angel J. Rivas-Sotomayor, Fernando N. De Jesus-Gonzalez, Cristhian A. Santiago-Santiago, Christian Rodriguez-Vidal, Josue C. Lopez-Negron, Jaret Rosario-Danzot, Michael Jordan-Lugo, Sabriel Rivera-Perez, Jose A. Rodriguez-David, Alejandro Laporte-Rivera, Ricardo Davila-Berrios, Rauly Cancel-Ramos, Jose L. Aponte-Mateo, Edward Quinones-Guzman, Anibal Castrello-Colon, Christopher J. Rojas, Abner Rodriguez-Rivera, Iris N. Castaner-Caraballo, Kevin Q. Ramos-Negron, Pamela Burgos-Arroyo, Charlie Oyola-Colon, Jose A. Ramos-Gonzalez, Nestor L. Rivera-Rivera, Ian J. Burgos-Maiz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Response Letter from Secretary of Labor)(Martinez, Karla)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #37 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. Reply (25 page limit) due by 1/17/2019. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 1/8/2019. (MQ)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #31 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply; granting #34 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 1/8/2019. (MQ)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #30 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint; finding as moot #24 Motion to Dismiss in light of the filing of an Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs shall file the Amended Complaint via separate docket entry for clarity of the record. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 1/8/2019. (MQ)
January 5, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Filing Signed Declarations by All Plaintiffs re #36 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Reyes Garcia, A. - Signed Declaration, #2 Affidavit Lugo Tirado, G. - Signed Declaration) (Martinez, Karla)
January 3, 2019 Filing 37 Joint Consent MOTION All Parties' Consent Motion Requesting Briefing Schedule for MTD Amended Complaint re #35 MOTION to dismiss as to All Plaintiffs filed by Country Fresh Carolina LLC filed by Karla Martinez on behalf of All Parties. Responses due by 1/17/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #35 ) (Martinez, Karla) Modified on 1/4/2019 to add filers. (mg).
January 3, 2019 Filing 36 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion to Dimiss filed by All Plaintiffs Re: #35 MOTION to dismiss as to All Plaintiffs filed by Country Fresh Carolina LLC filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Reyes Garcia Declaration, #2 Affidavit Lugo Tirado Declaration, #3 Affidavit Saez Rodriguez Declaration, #4 Exhibit)(Martinez, Karla)
December 20, 2018 Filing 35 MOTION to dismiss as to All Plaintiffs filed by Eric Perez-Ochoa on behalf of Country Fresh Carolina LLC Responses due by 1/3/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Appendix EXHIBIT A, #2 Appendix EXHIBIT B)(Perez-Ochoa, Eric)
December 4, 2018 Filing 34 MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply in Support of its Motion (DE 32) to Set a Briefing Schedule for Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint filed by Luis R. Perez-Giusti on behalf of Country Fresh Carolina LLC Responses due by 12/18/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Reply)(Perez-Giusti, Luis)
December 3, 2018 Filing 33 REPLY to Response to Motion by Defendant (Docket Entry #32 ) filed by All Plaintiffs Re: #30 First MOTION for Leave to File Document Amended Complaint, #31 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs. (Martinez, Karla) Modified on 12/4/2018 to edit docket text (rom).
November 30, 2018 Filing 32 RESPONSE to Motion (1) for Leave to File Amended Complaint, (2) Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time, and (3) Defendant's Motion to Set a Briefing Schedule filed by Country Fresh Carolina LLC Re: #30 First MOTION for Leave to File Document Amended Complaint filed by Alba Reyes-Garcia, Efren Coimbre-Lugo, Marangely Zayas-Figueroa, Juan J. Malave-Robles, Ruben A. Garay-Pomales, Randy Vazquez-Rivera, Jose F. Santiago-Miranda, Kelvin Montes-Rivera, Carlos G. Rodriguez-Agosto, Angel J. Rivas-Sotomayor, Angel D. Velasquez-Delgado, Peter Louis Santiago-Reyes, Jaime Mendez-Ortiz, Javier Colon-Rosario, Jaret Rosario-Danzot, Juan C. Vega-Rodriguez, Carlos R. Alvarado-Diaz, Giovanny J. Lugo-Tirado, Heriberto Rosado-Figueroa, Ricardo Davila-Berrios, Hector O. Padilla-Rivera, Steven Santiago-Santiago, Jonathan A. Santiago-Ruiz, Cristhian A. Santiago-Santiago, Jose A. Santiago-Lugo, Kevin Q. Ramos-Negron, Anibal Castrello-Colon, Ruben Ortiz-Cordero, Jose L. Aponte-Mateo, Marlene Mercado, Gregorio Rivera-Rosado, Christopher J. Rojas, Carmen D. Serrano-Ortiz, Alejandro Laporte-Rivera, Jose D. Saez-Rodriguez, Pamela Burgos-Arroyo, Iris N. Castaner-Caraballo, Jonathan A. Ostolaza-Laboy, Jose A. Rodriguez-Ruiz, Rauly Cancel-Ramos, Edgard M. Garcia-Vera, Charlie Oyola-Colon, Jose A. Rodriguez-David, Abner Rodriguez-Rivera, Jose A. Ramos-Gonzalez, Mayra A. Flores-Fradera, Ian J. Burgos-Maiz, Wilson Rivera, Christian Rodriguez-Vidal, Marina Garcia-Nieves, Sabriel Rivera-Perez, Orlando L. Vazquez-Perez, Jose A. Casanova-Figueroa, Josue M. Cora-Yeye, Rafael D. Rodriguez-Vega, Edward Quinones-Guzman, Sonny Maldonado-Hernandez, Luis R. Ortiz-Torres, Glorimar Valle-Iturralde, Fernando N. De Jesus-Gonzalez, Josue C. Lopez-Negron, Antonio Rios-Santiago, Ryan A. Martinez-Delgado, Alexis Huertas-Figueroa, Nestor L. Rivera-Rivera, Michael Jordan-Lugo, Johnny Figueroa-Guzman, #31 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss filed by Alba Reyes-Garcia, Efren Coimbre-Lugo, Marangely Zayas-Figueroa, Juan J. Malave-Robles, Ruben A. Garay-Pomales, Randy Vazquez-Rivera, Jose F. Santiago-Miranda, Kelvin Montes-Rivera, Carlos G. Rodriguez-Agosto, Angel J. Rivas-Sotomayor, Angel D. Velasquez-Delgado, Peter Louis Santiago-Reyes, Jaime Mendez-Ortiz, Javier Colon-Rosario, Jaret Rosario-Danzot, Juan C. Vega-Rodriguez, Carlos R. Alvarado-Diaz, Giovanny J. Lugo-Tirado, Heriberto Rosado-Figueroa, Ricardo Davila-Berrios, Hector O. Padilla-Rivera, Steven Santiago-Santiago, Jonathan A. Santiago-Ruiz, Cristhian A. Santiago-Santiago, Jose A. Santiago-Lugo, Kevin Q. Ramos-Negron, Ruben Ortiz-Cordero, Anibal Castrello-Colon, Marlene Mercado, Jose L. Aponte-Mateo, Gregorio Rivera-Rosado, Christopher J. Rojas, Carmen D. Serrano-Ortiz, Alejandro Laporte-Rivera, Jose D. Saez-Rodriguez, Iris N. Castaner-Caraballo, Pamela Burgos-Arroyo, Jonathan A. Ostolaza-Laboy, Jose A. Rodriguez-Ruiz, Edgard M. Garcia-Vera, Rauly Cancel-Ramos, Abner Rodriguez-Rivera, Jose A. Rodriguez-David, Charlie Oyola-Colon, Jose A. Ramos-Gonzalez, Mayra A. Flores-Fradera, Ian J. Burgos-Maiz, Christian Rodriguez-Vidal, Wilson Rivera, Marina Garcia-Nieves, Orlando L. Vazquez-Perez, Sabriel Rivera-Perez, Jose A. Casanova-Figueroa, Josue M. Cora-Yeye, Rafael D. Rodriguez-Vega, Edward Quinones-Guzman, Sonny Maldonado-Hernandez, Glorimar Valle-Iturralde, Luis R. Ortiz-Torres, Fernando N. De Jesus-Gonzalez, Josue C. Lopez-Negron, Antonio Rios-Santiago, Ryan A. Martinez-Delgado, Alexis Huertas-Figueroa, Nestor L. Rivera-Rivera, Michael Jordan-Lugo, Johnny Figueroa-Guzman filed by Country Fresh Carolina LLC. (Perez-Giusti, Luis)
November 30, 2018 Filing 31 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss filed by Karla Martinez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 12/14/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Martinez, Karla)
November 29, 2018 Filing 30 First MOTION for Leave to File Document Amended Complaint filed by Karla Martinez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 12/13/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Response Letter from Secretary of Labor)(Martinez, Karla)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 11/15/18. (lir)
October 30, 2018 Filing 28 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until November 30 to File Response/Reply as to #24 MOTION to dismiss as to All Plaintiffs filed by Country Fresh Carolina LLC, 26 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages, First MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Karla Martinez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 11/13/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #24 , 26 ) (Martinez, Karla) Modified on 11/16/2018 to terminate motion (mg).
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER noted #25 INFORMATIVE motion. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 10/30/2018. (lir)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 10/30/2018. (lir)
October 23, 2018 Filing 25 First INFORMATIVE Motion filed by Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 11/6/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Santiago-Lizardi, Carmen)
October 18, 2018 Filing 24 MOTION to dismiss as to All Plaintiffs filed by Eric Perez-Ochoa on behalf of Country Fresh Carolina LLC Responses due by 11/1/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Perez-Ochoa, Eric)
October 18, 2018 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Eric Perez-Ochoa on behalf of Country Fresh Carolina LLC Responses due by 11/1/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Perez-Ochoa, Eric)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 10/11/2018. (lir)
October 10, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time until October 18, 2018 to File Answer filed by Alejandro A. Santiago-Martinez on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 10/24/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Santiago-Martinez, Alejandro)
October 9, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #19 MOTION for Extension of Time until October 18, 2018 to File Answer . ***FILED IN ERROR. COUNSEL FILED USING ANOTHER COUNSEL'S LOGIN/PASSWORD. TO BE RE-FILED.*** (mg)
October 9, 2018 Filing 19 ***FILED IN ERROR. COUNSEL FILED USING ANOTHER COUNSEL'S LOGIN/PASSWORD. TO BE RE-FILED.*** MOTION for Extension of Time until October 18, 2018 to File Answer filed by Alejandro A. Santiago-Martinez on behalf of Country Fresh Carolina LLC Responses due by 10/23/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Santiago-Martinez, Alejandro) Modified on 10/10/2018 (mg).
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Appear PHV. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 09/17/18. (lir)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear PHV. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 09/17/18. (lir)
August 24, 2018 Filing 16 Motion to allow Gary D. Friedman to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6021211) filed by Eric Perez-Ochoa on behalf of Country Fresh Carolina LLC Responses due by 9/7/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Perez-Ochoa, Eric)
August 24, 2018 Filing 15 Motion to allow Thomas McCarthy to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6021183) filed by Eric Perez-Ochoa on behalf of Country Fresh Carolina LLC Responses due by 9/7/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Perez-Ochoa, Eric)
August 24, 2018 Filing 14 STIPULATION (JOINT STIPULATION) by Country Fresh Carolina LLC. & Plaintiffs (Perez-Ochoa, Eric) Modified on 8/27/2018 to add filers (mg).
August 24, 2018 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jonathan A. Ostolaza-Laboy, Luis R. Ortiz-Torres, Orlando L. Vazquez-Perez, Alexis Huertas-Figueroa, Jose A. Casanova-Figueroa, Sonny Maldonado-Hernandez, Ruben A. Garay-Pomales, Johnny Figueroa-Guzman, Gregorio Rivera-Rosado, Jose A. Santiago-Lugo, Ryan A. Martinez-Delgado, Peter Louis Santiago-Reyes, Carmen D. Serrano-Ortiz, Edgard M. Garcia-Vera, Efren Coimbre-Lugo, Ruben Ortiz-Cordero, Hector O. Padilla-Rivera, Javier Colon-Rosario, Jose A. Rodriguez-Ruiz, Juan C. Vega-Rodriguez, Marlene Mercado, Rafael D. Rodriguez-Vega, Antonio Rios-Santiago, Randy Vazquez-Rivera, Jonathan A. Santiago-Ruiz, Wilson Rivera, Josue M. Cora-Yeye, Carlos R. Alvarado-Diaz, Heriberto Rosado-Figueroa, Steven Santiago-Santiago, Jose F. Santiago-Miranda, Angel D. Velasquez-Delgado, Carlos G. Rodriguez-Agosto, Marina Garcia-Nieves, Glorimar Valle-Iturralde, Jose D. Saez-Rodriguez, Marangely Zayas-Figueroa, Alba Reyes-Garcia, Mayra A. Flores-Fradera, Giovanny J. Lugo-Tirado, Kelvin Montes-Rivera, Juan J. Malave-Robles, Jaime Mendez-Ortiz, Angel J. Rivas-Sotomayor, Fernando N. De Jesus-Gonzalez, Cristhian A. Santiago-Santiago, Christian Rodriguez-Vidal, Josue C. Lopez-Negron, Jaret Rosario-Danzot, Michael Jordan-Lugo, Sabriel Rivera-Perez, Jose A. Rodriguez-David, Alejandro Laporte-Rivera, Ricardo Davila-Berrios, Rauly Cancel-Ramos, Jose L. Aponte-Mateo, Edward Quinones-Guzman, Anibal Castrello-Colon, Christopher J. Rojas, Abner Rodriguez-Rivera, Iris N. Castaner-Caraballo, Kevin Q. Ramos-Negron, Pamela Burgos-Arroyo, Charlie Oyola-Colon, Jose A. Ramos-Gonzalez, Nestor L. Rivera-Rivera, Ian J. Burgos-Maiz. All Defendants. (Santiago-Lizardi, Carmen)
August 23, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Luis R. Perez-Giusti on behalf of Country Fresh Carolina LLC (Perez-Giusti, Luis)
August 22, 2018 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #10 Motion to allow Thomas McCarthy to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6021183), #11 Motion to allow Gary D. Friedman to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6021211). Local counsel to re-file PHV applications. (mg)
August 22, 2018 Filing 11 ***FILED IN ERROR INCORRECT PDF.*** Motion to allow Gary D. Friedman to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6021211) filed by Eric Perez-Ochoa on behalf of Country Fresh Carolina LLC Responses due by 9/5/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Perez-Ochoa, Eric) Modified on 8/24/2018 (mg).
August 22, 2018 Filing 10 ***FILED IN ERROR INCORRECT PDF.*** . Motion to allow Thomas McCarthy to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6021183) filed by Eric Perez-Ochoa on behalf of Country Fresh Carolina LLC Responses due by 9/5/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Perez-Ochoa, Eric) Modified on 8/24/2018 (mg).
August 22, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Alejandro A. Santiago-Martinez on behalf of Country Fresh Carolina LLC (Santiago-Martinez, Alejandro)
August 22, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Perez-Ochoa on behalf of Country Fresh Carolina LLC (Perez-Ochoa, Eric)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER noted #5 Motion requesting Order. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 8/09/2018. (lir)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear PHV. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 8/09/2018. (lir)
August 7, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION requesting Order filed by Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 8/21/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Santiago-Lizardi, Carmen)
July 31, 2018 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #2 First Motion to allow Karla Martinez to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-5971808), #1 Complaint. ***MODIFIED TO REMOVE RESTRICTION. STANDING ORDER NO. 9 STATES THAT THE MOTION TO RESTRICT... "SHALL BE OPEN TO PUBLIC INSPECTION..."*** (mg)
July 24, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Country Fresh Carolinas LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
July 24, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory (arg)
July 23, 2018 Filing 2 First Motion to allow Karla Martinez to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-5971808) filed by Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 8/6/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Santiago-Lizardi, Carmen) Modified on 7/31/2018 to remove restrictions (mg).
July 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-5971803.), filed by Ian J Burgos. Service due by 10/22/2018, (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Santiago-Lizardi, Carmen) Modified on 7/31/2018 to remove restrictions (mg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lugo et al v. Country Fresh Carolinas LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr Giovanny J Lugo
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Quinonez-Guzman
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose A Santiago-Lugo
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan J Malave-Robles
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose A Rodriguez-Ruiz
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javier Colon
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fernando N De Jesus-Gonzalez
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabriel Rivera-Perez
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Represented By: Karla Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan A Martinez-Delgado
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edgard M Garcia-Vera
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan A Ostolaza-Laboy
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cristian Rodriguez-Vidal
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexis Huertas-Figueroa
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Represented By: Karla Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose A Ramos-Gonzalez
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose D Saez-Rodriguez
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Burgos
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heriberto Rosado-Figueroa
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Represented By: Karla Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonny Maldonado-Hernandez
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Represented By: Karla Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glorimar Valle-Iturralde
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Represented By: Karla Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos G Rodriguez-Agosto
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose A Rodriguez-David
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose A Casanova
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher J Rojas
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Efren Coimbre
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Louis Santiago-Reyes
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Represented By: Karla Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel J Rivas-Sotomayor
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan A Santiago-Ruiz
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruben Ortiz-Cordero
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Represented By: Karla Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josue M Cora-Yeye
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelvin Montes-Rivera
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Represented By: Karla Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Figueroa-Guzman
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Represented By: Karla Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaime Mendez-Ortiz
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Represented By: Karla Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Davila-Berrios
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Represented By: Karla Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan C Vega-Rodriguez
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael D Rodriguez-Vega
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlene Mercado
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Represented By: Karla Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Rios-Santiago
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Represented By: Karla Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rauly Cancel
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Vazquez-Rivera
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Represented By: Karla Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregorio Rivera-Rosado
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Represented By: Karla Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ian J Burgos
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alejandro Laporte-Rivera
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Represented By: Karla Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iris N Castaner
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector O Padilla-Rivera
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alba Reyes-Garcia
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Represented By: Karla Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marangely Zayas-Figueroa
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Represented By: Karla Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Jordan-Lugo
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Represented By: Karla Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orlando L Vazquez-Perez
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mayra A Flores-Fradera
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruben A Garay-Pomales
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nestor L Rivera-Rivera
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaret Rosario-Danzot
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Represented By: Karla Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Q Ramos-Negron
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josue C Lopez-Negron
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose L Aponte
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlie Oyola-Colon
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Represented By: Karla Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Santiago-Santiago
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Represented By: Karla Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose F Santiago-Miranda
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilson Rivera
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Represented By: Karla Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anibal Castrello
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen D Serrano-Ortiz
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel D Velasquez-Delgado
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cristhian A Santiago-Santiago
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis R Ortiz-Torres
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abner Rodriguez-Rivera
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Represented By: Karla Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos R Alvarado-Diaz
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marina Garcia-Nieves
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Represented By: Karla Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan A. Ostolaza-Laboy
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Represented By: Karla Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iris N. Castaner-Caraballo
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Represented By: Karla Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan C. Vega-Rodriguez
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Represented By: Karla Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose D. Saez-Rodriguez
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Represented By: Karla Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anibal Castrello-Colon
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Represented By: Karla Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Quinones-Guzman
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Represented By: Karla Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Burgos-Arroyo
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Represented By: Karla Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josue M. Cora-Yeye
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Represented By: Karla Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nestor L. Rivera-Rivera
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Represented By: Karla Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josue C. Lopez-Negron
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Represented By: Karla Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos G. Rodriguez-Agosto
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Represented By: Karla Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis R. Ortiz-Torres
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Represented By: Karla Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mayra A. Flores-Fradera
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Represented By: Karla Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan J. Malave-Robles
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Represented By: Karla Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen D. Serrano-Ortiz
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Represented By: Karla Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose L. Aponte-Mateo
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Represented By: Karla Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose A. Casanova-Figueroa
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Represented By: Karla Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael D. Rodriguez-Vega
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Represented By: Karla Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orlando L. Vazquez-Perez
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Represented By: Karla Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ian J. Burgos-Maiz
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Represented By: Karla Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel D. Velasquez-Delgado
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Represented By: Karla Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel J. Rivas-Sotomayor
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Represented By: Karla Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Rodriguez-Vidal
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Represented By: Karla Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edgard M. Garcia-Vera
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Represented By: Karla Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose A. Santiago-Lugo
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Represented By: Karla Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose A. Rodriguez-Ruiz
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Represented By: Karla Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Efren Coimbre-Lugo
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Represented By: Karla Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fernando N. De Jesus-Gonzalez
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Represented By: Karla Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Q. Ramos-Negron
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Represented By: Karla Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector O. Padilla-Rivera
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Represented By: Karla Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rauly Cancel-Ramos
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Represented By: Karla Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruben A. Garay-Pomales
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Represented By: Karla Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher J. Rojas
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Represented By: Karla Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javier Colon-Rosario
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Represented By: Karla Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose F. Santiago-Miranda
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Represented By: Karla Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos R. Alvarado-Diaz
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Represented By: Karla Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Giovanny J. Lugo-Tirado
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Represented By: Karla Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cristhian A. Santiago-Santiago
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Represented By: Karla Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose A. Ramos-Gonzalez
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Represented By: Karla Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan A. Martinez-Delgado
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Represented By: Karla Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan A. Santiago-Ruiz
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Represented By: Karla Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose A. Rodriguez-David
Represented By: Carmen Sofia Santiago-Lizardi
Represented By: Karla Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Country Fresh Carolinas LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Country Fresh Carolina LLC
Represented By: Gary D. Friedman
Represented By: Thomas McCarthy
Represented By: Eric Perez-Ochoa
Represented By: Alejandro A. Santiago-Martinez
Represented By: Luis R. Perez-Giusti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?