USA v. One (1) 2012 Honda Motorcycle, Color: Red, Model: XR650L, VIN JH2RD0605CK900864, Plate No. 244045, Registered to the name of Javier Rodriguez-Villegas

Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: One (1) 2012 Honda Motorcycle, Color: Red, Model: XR650L, VIN JH2RD0605CK900864, Plate No. 244045, Registered to the name of Javier Rodriguez-Villegas
Case Number: 3:2018cv01536
Filed: August 1, 2018
Court: Puerto Rico District Court
Office: San Juan Office
County: San Juan
Presiding Judge: Jay A Garcia-Gregory
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
August 9, 2018 8 Warrant of Arrest in Rem Issued to arrest property: One (1) 2012 Honda Motorcycle, Color: Red, Model: XR650L, VIN JH2RD0605CK900864, Plate No. 244045, Registered to the name of Javier Rodriguez-Villegas. (Attachments: #1 Warrant of Arrest in Rem) (rim)
August 8, 2018 7 JUDGMENT staying case. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 8/8/2018. (MQ)
August 8, 2018 6 Featured Case ORDER granting #2 Motion to Stay. Judgment of Stay shall be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 8/8/2018. (MQ)
August 8, 2018 5 Featured Case ORDER granting #3 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 8/8/2018. (MQ)
August 2, 2018 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory (arg)
August 1, 2018 3 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem filed by Maritza Gonzalez-Rivera on behalf of USA Responses due by 8/15/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gonzalez-Rivera, Maritza)
August 1, 2018 2 MOTION to Stay Civil Forfeiture Proceedings filed by Maritza Gonzalez-Rivera on behalf of USA Responses due by 8/15/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Gonzalez-Rivera, Maritza)
August 1, 2018 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture In Rem against One (1) 2012 Honda Motorcycle, Color: Red, Model: XR650L, VIN JH2RD0605CK900864, Plate No. 244045, Registered to the name of Javier Rodriguez-Villegas, filed by USA. Service due by 10/30/2018, (Attachments: #1 Unsworn Declaration, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Sheet)(Gonzalez-Rivera, Maritza)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. One (1) 2012 Honda Motorcycle, Color: Red, Model: XR650L, VIN JH2RD0605CK900864, Plate No. 244045, Registered to the name of Javier Rodriguez-Villegas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One (1) 2012 Honda Motorcycle, Color: Red, Model: XR650L, VIN JH2RD0605CK900864, Plate No. 244045, Registered to the name of Javier Rodriguez-Villegas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Maritza Gonzalez-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?