Ralat et al v. Real Legacy Assurance Company, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Kathryn A Troncoso, Miguel A Ralat, Kathryn A. Troncoso, Conjugal Partnerhsip Ralat-Troncoso and Miguel A. Ralat
Defendant: John Doe and Real Legacy Assurance Company, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01595
Filed: August 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Francisco A Besosa
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #9 Motion to Stay: GRANTED. This case is stayed until November 27, 2018. No later than November 28, 2018 defendant will provide the Court with a status of its rehabilitation proceedings. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 10/17/2018. (brc)
October 17, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Stay filed by Nestor J. Navas-D'Acosta on behalf of Real Legacy Assurance Company, Inc. Responses due by 10/31/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Navas-D'Acosta, Nestor)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #6 Memorandum in Opposition: NOTED. See Local Rule 6, which allows the Clerk to extend time for up to 30 days. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 09/17/2018. (brc)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: GRANTED. Answer deadline October 29, 2018. No additional extensions will be allowed. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 09/17/2018. (brc)
September 17, 2018 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to the Lengthy Extension of Time to Answer Complaint filed by Conjugal Partnerhsip Ralat-Troncoso, Miguel A. Ralat, Kathryn A. Troncoso Re: #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Real Legacy Assurance Company, Inc. filed by Conjugal Partnerhsip Ralat-Troncoso, Miguel A. Ralat, Kathryn A. Troncoso. (Troncoso-Cortes, Francisco)
September 14, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance, MOTION for Extension of Time until 10/29/2018 to File Answer to Complaint by Nestor J. Navas-D'Acosta on behalf of Real Legacy Assurance Company, Inc. (Navas-D'Acosta, Nestor) Modified on 9/17/2018 to add event and edit title (mcm).
September 12, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Miguel A. Ralat, Kathryn A. Troncoso, Conjugal Partnerhsip Ralat-Troncoso upon Real Legacy Assurance Company, Inc. served on 9/7/2018, answer due 9/28/2018. (Troncoso-Cortes, Francisco)
August 24, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Real Legacy Assurance Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
August 24, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa (arg)
August 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe, Real Legacy Assurance Company, Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6022082.), filed by Miguel A Ralat, Kathryn A Troncoso. Service due by 11/21/2018, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons)(Troncoso-Cortes, Francisco)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ralat et al v. Real Legacy Assurance Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn A Troncoso
Represented By: Francisco M. Troncoso-Cortes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel A Ralat
Represented By: Francisco M. Troncoso-Cortes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn A. Troncoso
Represented By: Francisco M. Troncoso-Cortes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnerhsip Ralat-Troncoso
Represented By: Francisco M. Troncoso-Cortes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel A. Ralat
Represented By: Francisco M. Troncoso-Cortes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Legacy Assurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: Nestor J. Navas-D'Acosta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?