McCoy v. Caribbean Hotel Developers et al
Plaintiff: Ranea M. McCoy
Defendant: Insurance Company A, Caribbean Hotel Developers dba Hampton Inn & Suites San Juan, unknown corporation/entity dba Hampton Inn and Suites San Juan, unknown corporation by Hilton dba Hampton Inn & Suites San Juan, John Doe A-Z, unknown corporation by Hilton, Caribbean Hotel Developers S.E. and unknown Corporation/Entity
Case Number: 3:2018cv01599
Filed: August 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Gustavo A Gelpi
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Granting as requested #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 10/10/2018. (LE)
October 10, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time until November 9, 2018 to File Answer to the Complaint re: #1 Complaint, filed by Ranea M. McCoy filed by Rocio Ramos-Santiago on behalf of Caribbean Hotel Developers S.E. Responses due by 10/24/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Ramos-Santiago, Rocio)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Noted #6 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 10/9/2018. (LE)
October 5, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Amend/Correct docket entry No. 5 Re: #5 Summons Returned Executed filed by Ranea M. McCoy filed by Edgardo J. Hernandez-Oharriz on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 10/19/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Summons Executed as to Caribbean Hotel Developers, S.E.)(Related document(s) #5 ) (Hernandez-Oharriz, Edgardo)
October 5, 2018 Filing 5 ***FILED IN ERROR***SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Caribbean Hotel Developers S.E. served on 9/20/2018, answer due 10/11/2018. (Hernandez-Oharriz, Edgardo) Modified on 10/9/2018 to file in error. See Docket #6 (gmm).
October 4, 2018 Filing 4 STANDING ORDERS: (1) DISCOVERY DISPUTES, (2) COURTESY COPIES, (3) DEPOSITIONS IN CIVIL CASES, (4) CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, (5) COMMUNICATIONS BY COUNSEL OR THEIR STAFF WITH JUDGE GELPI'S CHAMBERS' STAFF, (6) CODE OF CIVILITY.(rom)
August 27, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Caribbean Hotel Developers dba Hampton Inn & Suites San Juan (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
August 27, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (arg)
August 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6024741.), filed by Ranea M. McCoy. Service due by 11/26/2018, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Hernandez-Oharriz, Edgardo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCoy v. Caribbean Hotel Developers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ranea M. McCoy
Represented By: Edgardo J. Hernandez-Oharriz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance Company A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caribbean Hotel Developers dba Hampton Inn & Suites San Juan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: unknown corporation/entity dba Hampton Inn and Suites San Juan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: unknown corporation by Hilton dba Hampton Inn & Suites San Juan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe A-Z
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: unknown corporation by Hilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caribbean Hotel Developers S.E.
Represented By: Rocio Ramos-Santiago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: unknown Corporation/Entity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?