Spears et al v. American Airlines, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Stephen E. Spears, Luisa F. Diaz, Conjugal Partnership Spears Diaz and Conjugal Partnership Spears-Diaz
Defendant: Iberia Lineas Aereas de Espana Sociedad Anonima Operadora, John Richard Maldonado Miranda, Jane Does D, E, F, Insurance Companies ABC, DEF, John Does A, B and C, Ana Feliciano, American Airlines, Inc., Melissa Rodriguez, Peter Does G, H, I, GMD Airline Services, Inc. and John Richard Maldonado-Miranda
Case Number: 3:2018cv01633
Filed: August 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Gustavo A Gelpi
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 49:1471
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Granting as requested #18 Motion for extension of time. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 10/26/2018. (AGF)
October 25, 2018 Filing 18 Joint MOTION for extension of time until December 4, 2018 to file Defendants' respective responsive pleading or dispositive motion filed by Maria E. Pico on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 11/8/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Pico, Maria)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: noted #16 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding execution of summonses, noted MOTION Submitting. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 10/5/2018. (gmm)
October 5, 2018 Filing 16 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding execution of summonses, MOTION Submitting executed summonses filed by Carlos E. Cardona-Fernandez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 10/19/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Summons EXHIBIT 1 - EXECUTED SUMMONSES, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT 2 - EMAILS)(Cardona-Fernandez, Carlos)
October 4, 2018 Filing 15 STANDING ORDERS: (1) DISCOVERY DISPUTES, (2) COURTESY COPIES, (3) DEPOSITIONS IN CIVIL CASES, (4) CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, (5) COMMUNICATIONS BY COUNSEL OR THEIR STAFF WITH JUDGE GELPI'S CHAMBERS' STAFF, (6) CODE OF CIVILITY.(rom)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time until 11/1/2018 . Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 10/02/2018.(AGF)
October 2, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer the Complaint or Otherwise Plead re: #1 Complaint filed by Conjugal Partnership Spears-Diaz, Stephen E. Spears, Luisa F. Diaz filed by Jose L. Ramirez-Coll on behalf of American Airlines, Inc. Responses due by 10/16/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Ramirez-Coll, Jose)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Granting as requested #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 9/28/2018. (LE)
September 28, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint filed by Maria E. Pico on behalf of Iberia Lineas Aereas de Espana Sociedad Anonima Operadora Responses due by 10/12/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Pico, Maria)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Granting as requested #7 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 9/25/2018. (LE)
September 25, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Roberto Abesada-Aguet on behalf of Ana Feliciano, GMD Airline Services, Inc., John Richard Maldonado-Miranda, Melissa Rodriguez (Abesada-Aguet, Roberto)
September 25, 2018 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement byGMD Airline Services, Inc.. (Perez-Garcia, Noelia)
September 25, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for extension of time until October 29, 2018 to file responsive pleading or dispositive motion. filed by Noelia Perez-Garcia on behalf of Ana Feliciano, GMD Airline Services, Inc., John Richard Maldonado-Miranda, Melissa Rodriguez Responses due by 10/9/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Perez-Garcia, Noelia)
September 25, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Noelia Perez-Garcia on behalf of GMD Airline Services, Inc. (Perez-Garcia, Noelia)
September 5, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to American Airlines, Inc., Ana Feliciano, GMD Airline Services, Inc., Iberia Lineas Aereas de Espana Sociedad Anonima Operadora, John Richard Maldonado Miranda, Melissa Rodriguez (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
September 5, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (arg)
September 4, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits re #1 Complaint filed by Stephen E. Spears, Conjugal Partnership Spears Diaz, Luisa F. Diaz, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Stephen E. Spears, Conjugal Partnership Spears Diaz, Luisa F. Diaz (Attachments: #1 Summons AMERICAN AIRLINES, #2 Summons IBERIA, #3 Summons GMD, #4 Summons JOHN RICHARD MALDONADO, #5 Summons ANA FELICIANO, #6 Summons MELISSA RODRIGUEZ, #7 Category Sheet, #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (Cardona-Fernandez, Carlos)
August 31, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance Plaintiffs by Carlos E. Cardona-Fernandez on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Cardona-Fernandez, Carlos)
August 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6036260.), filed by Conjugal Partnership Spears Diaz, Luisa F. Diaz, Stephen E. Spears. Service due by 11/29/2018,(Cardona-Fernandez, Carlos)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spears et al v. American Airlines, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen E. Spears
Represented By: Carlos E. Cardona-Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luisa F. Diaz
Represented By: Carlos E. Cardona-Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Spears Diaz
Represented By: Carlos E. Cardona-Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Spears-Diaz
Represented By: Carlos E. Cardona-Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iberia Lineas Aereas de Espana Sociedad Anonima Operadora
Represented By: Maria E. Pico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Richard Maldonado Miranda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does D, E, F
Represented By: Maria E. Pico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance Companies ABC, DEF
Represented By: Maria E. Pico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does A, B and C
Represented By: Maria E. Pico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ana Feliciano
Represented By: Maria E. Pico
Represented By: Roberto Abesada-Aguet
Represented By: Noelia Perez-Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Jose L. Ramirez-Coll
Represented By: Maria E. Pico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Rodriguez
Represented By: Maria E. Pico
Represented By: Roberto Abesada-Aguet
Represented By: Noelia Perez-Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Does G, H, I
Represented By: Maria E. Pico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GMD Airline Services, Inc.
Represented By: Maria E. Pico
Represented By: Roberto Abesada-Aguet
Represented By: Noelia Perez-Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Richard Maldonado-Miranda
Represented By: Maria E. Pico
Represented By: Roberto Abesada-Aguet
Represented By: Noelia Perez-Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?