Sears Roebuck & Company et al

Plaintiff: Sears Roebuck & Company, Sears Roebuck de Puerto Rico, Atlas Roofing Contractors, Inc., John Doe, Sears Holdings Corporation and Sears Holdings Management Corporation
Case Number: 3:2018cv01649
Filed: September 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Jay A Garcia-Gregory
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time until November 12, 2018 to File Answer to complaint re: #1 Complaint, filed by Sears Roebuck & Company, Sears Roebuck de Puerto Rico, Sears Holdings Management Corporation, Sears Holdings Corporation filed by Luis G. Martinez-Llorens on behalf of Atlas Roofing Contractors, Inc. Responses due by 10/24/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Martinez-Llorens, Luis)
September 21, 2018 Filing 5 Motion to allow Robert E. Wilens to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number PRX100058026) filed by Hector F. Oliveras-Delgado on behalf of Sears Holdings Corporation, Sears Holdings Management Corporation, Sears Roebuck & Company, Sears Roebuck de Puerto Rico Responses due by 10/5/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Oliveras-Delgado, Hector)
September 20, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Exhibit 2(b) to the Complaint - Bid Book Part 2 re #1 Complaint, filed by Sears Roebuck & Company, Sears Roebuck de Puerto Rico, Sears Holdings Management Corporation, Sears Holdings Corporation (Lopez, Jeannette)
September 5, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Atlas Roofing Contractors, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
September 5, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory (arg)
September 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Atlas Roofing Contractors, Inc., John Doe ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6039962.), filed by Sears Roebuck de Puerto Rico, Sears Roebuck & Company, Sears Holdings Management Corporation, Sears Holdings Corporation. Service due by 12/3/2018, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Exhibit Contract, #5 Exhibit Bid Book, #6 Exhibit Warranty)(Lopez, Jeannette)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sears Roebuck & Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sears Roebuck & Company
Represented By: Jeannette M. Lopez
Represented By: Hector F. Oliveras-Delgado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sears Roebuck de Puerto Rico
Represented By: Jeannette M. Lopez
Represented By: Hector F. Oliveras-Delgado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atlas Roofing Contractors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sears Holdings Corporation
Represented By: Jeannette M. Lopez
Represented By: Hector F. Oliveras-Delgado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sears Holdings Management Corporation
Represented By: Jeannette M. Lopez
Represented By: Hector F. Oliveras-Delgado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?