David v. Social Security

Plaintiff: Lilliam David
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2018cv01653
Filed: September 5, 2018
Court: Puerto Rico District Court
Presiding Judge: Bruce J McGiverin
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 23, 2018 11 NOTICE of Appearance by David O. Martorani-Dale on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Martorani-Dale, David)
September 20, 2018 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lilliam David upon US Attorney's Office served on 9/19/2018, answer due 10/10/2018. (Colon-Flores, Rafael) Modified to edit served defendant on 9/21/2018 (idg).
September 17, 2018 9 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ad)
September 17, 2018 8 Featured Case ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 9/17/2018. (jm)
September 7, 2018 7 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: By Order of Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (Docket No. 6), this case has been assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin for all further proceedings, including entry of judgment as per 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636. All future pleadings shall bear only the initials of the Magistrate Judge next to the case number: Civil Case No. 18-1653 (BJM). Judge Gelpi is no longer assigned to this case. Signed by Clerk on 09/07/2018. (ft)
September 7, 2018 6 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE BRUCE J. MCGIVERIN: Given that Plaintiff has consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge, and the Commissioner has generically consented to do so in all social security appeals, this case is hereby referred to the Hon. Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin for all further proceedings; including entry of judgment as per 28 U.S.C. Sec 636. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 9/7/2018.(LE)
September 7, 2018 5 CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE dated 9/7/2018 by Lilliam David. (Colon-Flores, Rafael)
September 6, 2018 4 Featured Case ORDER: Plaintiff shall on, or before, September 13, 2018, inform the Court whether he consents to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. This will expedite proceedings given the undersigned's congested criminal docket. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 9/6/2018.(LE)
September 6, 2018 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (arg)
September 5, 2018 2 **CASE PARTICIPANTS** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis dated 9/5/2018 filed by Rafael Colon-Flores on behalf of Lilliam David Responses due by 9/19/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Colon-Flores, Rafael)
September 5, 2018 1 COMPLAINT dated 9/5/2018 against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Lilliam David. Service due by 12/4/2018, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Current Address Notice)(Colon-Flores, Rafael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: David v. Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lilliam David
Represented By: Rafael Colon-Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: David O. Martorani-Dale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?