DLJ Mortgage Capital Inc v. Martinez Beltran

Plaintiff: DLJ Mortgage Capital Inc
Defendant: Maria Teresa Martinez Beltran
Case Number: 3:2018cv01655
Filed: September 5, 2018
Court: Puerto Rico District Court
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 27, 2018 6 Summons by Publication Issued as to Maria Teresa Martinez Beltran. (Attachments: #1 Summons by Publication) (rim)
September 26, 2018 5 Featured Case ORDER granting #4 Motion for Issuance of Summons Signed by Judge William G. Young on 9/26/2018. (EES)
September 25, 2018 4 MOTION for Issuance of Summons by publication as to Maria Teresa Martinez Beltran filed by Sergio A. Ramirez-De-Arellano on behalf of DLJ Mortgage Capital Inc Responses due by 10/9/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sworn Statement, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order for Service by Publication, #3 Exhibit Summons by Publication)(Ramirez-De-Arellano, Sergio)
September 6, 2018 3 Summons Issued as to Maria Teresa Martinez Beltran (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
September 6, 2018 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge William G. Young (arg)
September 5, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Maria Teresa Martinez Beltran ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6041385.), filed by DLJ Mortgage Capital Inc. Service due by 12/4/2018, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Summons, #3 Category Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ramirez-De-Arellano, Sergio)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DLJ Mortgage Capital Inc v. Martinez Beltran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DLJ Mortgage Capital Inc
Represented By: Sergio A. Ramirez-De-Arellano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Teresa Martinez Beltran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?