veras-hilario et al v. American Honda Motor Co., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: mrs. maria veras-rodriguez, mr. juan carlos veras-hilario, Juan Carlos Veras-Rodriguez and Maria Veras-Hilario
Defendant: American Honda Motor Co., Inc., honda of america mfg., inc. and Honda of America Mfg Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01658
Filed: September 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Jay A Garcia-Gregory
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion for extension of time. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 10/30/2018. (lir)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER noted #3 Motion In Compliance. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 1/23/2018. (lir)
October 22, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Bankruptcy Channeling Injunction by American Honda Motor Co., Inc. (Gnocchi-Franco, Antonio)
October 22, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for extension of time until November 12, 2018 to December 12, 2018 filed by Antonio Gnocchi-Franco on behalf of American Honda Motor Co., Inc. Responses due by 11/5/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Gnocchi-Franco, Antonio)
October 22, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Antonio Gnocchi-Franco on behalf of American Honda Motor Co., Inc. (Gnocchi-Franco, Antonio)
September 7, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory (arg)
September 6, 2018 Filing 3 Motion In Compliance of order of the clerk filed by Ivan Diaz-Lopez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 9/20/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Diaz-Lopez, Ivan)
September 6, 2018 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING Civil Cover Sheet (JS44), and Category Sheet not included electronically pursuant to L.Civ.R. 3(a). Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 9/7/2018. (arg)
September 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6042018.), filed by juan carlos veras-hilario. Service due by 12/4/2018,(Diaz-Lopez, Ivan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: veras-hilario et al v. American Honda Motor Co., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: mrs. maria veras-rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: mr. juan carlos veras-hilario
Represented By: Ivan Diaz-Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Carlos Veras-Rodriguez
Represented By: Ivan Diaz-Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Veras-Hilario
Represented By: Ivan Diaz-Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Honda Motor Co., Inc.
Represented By: Antonio Gnocchi-Franco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: honda of america mfg., inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honda of America Mfg Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?