J&W Grading, Inc. et al v. Barges Unlimited, Inc.

Plaintiff: Cornelius J Tabor and J&W Grading, Inc.
Defendant: Barges Unlimited, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01663
Filed: September 7, 2018
Court: Puerto Rico District Court
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 18, 2018 21 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge William G. Young on 10/18/2018.(jg)
October 16, 2018 19 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by J&W Grading, Inc. (Rivera-Ortiz, Carlos)
October 11, 2018 20 Minute Order. Proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Motion Hearing held on 10/11/2018 re #3 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by J&W Grading, Inc. The Court hears arguments and enters an order denying #3 Motion to Remand to State Court. Counsel shall notify the Court within two weeks re trial date. If the case were to settle counsel are instructed to notify the clerk. (Court Reporter Richard Romanow (bulldog@richromanow.com).)Hearing set for 03:00.Hearing held at 03:09.Hearing ended at 03:28. (jg)
October 3, 2018 18 REPLY to Response to Motion to Remand filed by J&W Grading, Inc. Re: #3 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by J&W Grading, Inc. filed by J&W Grading, Inc.. (Rivera-Ortiz, Carlos)
October 2, 2018 17 Featured Case ORDER re #3 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by J&W Grading, Inc.., Set Deadlines/Hearing as to #3 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court : Motion Hearing set for 10/11/2018 03:00 PM in Courtroom 5 before Judge William G. Young by video conference.Signed by Judge William G. Young on 10/2/2018.(jg)
October 2, 2018 16 Featured Case ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief. Reply brief due on or before October 4, 2018. Signed by Judge William G. Young on 10/2/2018. (jg)
October 1, 2018 15 MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply to Opposition to Remand filed by Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz on behalf of J&W Grading, Inc. Responses due by 10/15/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rivera-Ortiz, Carlos)
September 27, 2018 14 MOTION Submitting Certified Translations re: #2 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents and for a term until September 27, 2018 to submit English Translations filed by Barges Unlimited, Inc. filed by Juan M. Frontera-Suau on behalf of Barges Unlimited, Inc. Responses due by 10/11/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Translation of Docket 1-3, #2 Exhibit Certified Translation of Docket 1-4, #3 Exhibit Certified Translation of Docket 1-6, #4 Exhibit Certified Translation of Docket 1-5)(Related document(s) #2 ) (Frontera-Suau, Juan)
September 27, 2018 13 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion to Remand filed by Barges Unlimited, Inc. Re: #3 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by J&W Grading, Inc. filed by Barges Unlimited, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-List of Equipment, #2 Exhibit 2-Master Time Charter Agreement, #3 Exhibit 3-Amendment 1 to Time Charter Agreement, #4 Exhibit 4-Agreement to Release and Deliver Equipment, #5 Exhibit 5-Minutes of September 5 2018 Injunction Hearing)(Frontera-Suau, Juan)
September 26, 2018 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth Colon on behalf of Barges Unlimited, Inc. (Colon, Kenneth)
September 19, 2018 11 Emergency Supplemental Motion Petitioning Expedited Briefing re: #7 MOTION for Reconsideration re 6 Order, 5 Order on Motion for Leave to File Spanish language documents, #10 Emergency MOTION to Expedite Briefing Schedule on Motion to Remand filed by Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz on behalf of J&W Grading, Inc. Responses due by 10/3/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #7 , #10 ) (Rivera-Ortiz, Carlos)
September 12, 2018 10 Emergency MOTION to Expedite Briefing Schedule on Motion to Remand filed by Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz on behalf of J&W Grading, Inc. Responses due by 9/26/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rivera-Ortiz, Carlos)
September 12, 2018 9 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: This case is hereby reassigned to the docket of Judge William G. Young, who has consented to said transfer and presides over related Case Number 18-cv-1263-WGY. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 09/12/2016.(gr)
September 11, 2018 8 Emergency MOTION Submitting Certified Translation of the Complaint re: #7 MOTION for Reconsideration re 6 Order, 5 Order on Motion for Leave to File Spanish language documents filed by J&W Grading, Inc. filed by Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz on behalf of J&W Grading, Inc. Responses due by 9/25/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #7 ) (Rivera-Ortiz, Carlos)
September 10, 2018 7 MOTION for Reconsideration re 6 Order, 5 Order on Motion for Leave to File Spanish language documents filed by Zarel J. Soto-Acaba on behalf of J&W Grading, Inc. Responses due by 9/24/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) 6 , 5 ) (Soto-Acaba, Zarel)
September 10, 2018 6 Featured Case ORDER: Removing defendants shall on or before September 27, 2018 respond to the remand motion #3 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 9/10/2018.(MET)
September 10, 2018 5 Featured Case ORDER: Granting #2 Motion for Leave to File Spanish language documents. Granted as requested. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 9/10/2018. (MET)
September 10, 2018 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (arg)
September 7, 2018 3 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez-de-V on behalf of J&W Grading, Inc. Responses due by 9/21/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Arizmendi-Lopez-de-V, Sylvia)
September 7, 2018 2 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents and for a term until September 27, 2018 to submit English Translations filed by Juan M. Frontera-Suau on behalf of Barges Unlimited, Inc. Responses due by 9/21/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Frontera-Suau, Juan)
September 7, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Juan Court of First Instance, case number SJ2018CV06956. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0104-6045095), filed by Barges Unlimited, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A-Complaint and attached Exhibit Service upon BUI, #4 Exhibit B-Minutes of hearing Held September 5, 2018, #5 Exhibit C-Motion to Show Cause, #6 Exhibit D-Order Denying TRO and Scheduling Hearing)(Frontera-Suau, Juan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J&W Grading, Inc. et al v. Barges Unlimited, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cornelius J Tabor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J&W Grading, Inc.
Represented By: Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez-de-V
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Represented By: Zarel J. Soto-Acaba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barges Unlimited, Inc.
Represented By: Juan M. Frontera-Suau
Represented By: Kenneth Colon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?