Guzman v. Jackson Furniture Industries d/b/a Jackson Manufacturing Catnapper

Plaintiff: Maria Guzman
Defendant: Jackson Furniture Industries d/b/a Jackson Manufacturing Catnapper
Case Number: 3:2018cv01664
Filed: September 7, 2018
Court: Puerto Rico District Court
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 23, 2018 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Hector F. Oliveras-Delgado on behalf of Jackson Furniture Industries d/b/a Jackson Manufacturing Catnapper (Oliveras-Delgado, Hector)
October 9, 2018 6 MOTION for Extension of Time until November 9, 2018 to File Answer and/or Responsive Pleading re: #1 Complaint, filed by Maria Guzman filed by Jeannette M. Lopez on behalf of Jackson Furniture Industries d/b/a Jackson Manufacturing Catnapper Responses due by 10/23/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Lopez, Jeannette)
October 9, 2018 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear filed by Jeannette M. Lopez on behalf of Jackson Furniture Industries d/b/a Jackson Manufacturing Catnapper Responses due by 10/23/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Lopez, Jeannette)
September 19, 2018 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maria Guzman upon Jackson Furniture Industries d/b/a Jackson Manufacturing Catnapper served on 9/18/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. (Iguina-Gonzalez, Antonio)
September 10, 2018 3 Summons Issued as to Jackson Furniture Industries d/b/a Jackson Manufacturing Catnapper (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
September 10, 2018 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge William G. Young (arg)
September 7, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Jackson Furniture Industries d/b/a Jackson Manufacturing Catnapper ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6045353.), filed by Maria Guzman. Service due by 12/6/2018, (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Iguina-Gonzalez, Antonio)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guzman v. Jackson Furniture Industries d/b/a Jackson Manufacturing Catnapper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson Furniture Industries d/b/a Jackson Manufacturing Catnapper
Represented By: Hector F. Oliveras-Delgado
Represented By: Jeannette M. Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Guzman
Represented By: Antonio Iguina-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?