United States v. Aerco Broadcasting Corporation

Plaintiff: United States and United States of America
Defendant: Aerco Broadcasting Corporation
Case Number: 3:2018cv01671
Filed: September 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Francisco A Besosa
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1355
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2018 Filing 6 CONSENT JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 9/19/18.(mcm)
September 18, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION Submitting Proposed Consent Judgment re: 4 Order,, Set Deadlines, filed by Maritza Gonzalez-Rivera on behalf of United States Responses due by 10/2/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 4 ) (Gonzalez-Rivera, Maritza)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #2 Joint Motion to Approve Consent Judgment. No later than September 18, 2018 a proposed consent judgment shall be tendered for the Court's consideration. See, Fed.R.Civ.P. 54(a) ("A judgment should not include recitals of pleadings, a master's report, or a record of prior proceedings.") Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 09/12/2018. (brc)
September 12, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa (arg)
September 11, 2018 Filing 2 Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment filed by Maritza Gonzalez-Rivera on behalf of United States Responses due by 9/25/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gonzalez-Rivera, Maritza)
September 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Aerco Broadcasting Corporation, filed by United States. Service due by 12/10/2018, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -Notice of Liability, #2 Exhibit B- Forfeiture Order, #3 Exhibit C- Memorandum 08-2014, #4 Exhibit D- Memorandum 12-2014, #5 Exhibit E- Order on Reconsideration, #6 Exhibit F-Certificate of Forfeiture)(Gonzalez-Rivera, Maritza) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/12/2018: #7 Category Sheet, #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (mcm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States v. Aerco Broadcasting Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aerco Broadcasting Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States
Represented By: Maritza Gonzalez-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Maritza Gonzalez-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?