United States v. Gonzalez-Alvarez

Plaintiff: United States and United States of America
Defendant: Sandro Gonzalez-Alvarez
Case Number: 3:2018cv01679
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Sandro Gonzalez-Alvarez (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
September 21, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge William G. Young (arg)
September 20, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE Civil Category Sheet by United States (Nash, Ann)
September 19, 2018 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING. Category Sheet not filled out electronically pursuant to L.Civ.R. 3(a). Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 9/20/2018. (ad)
September 18, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE Civil Category Sheet by United States (Nash, Ann)
September 17, 2018 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING.Category sheet not included electronically pursuant to L.Civ.R. 3(a). Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 9/18/2018. (arg)
September 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sandro Gonzalez-Alvarez, filed by United States. Service due by 12/13/2018, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Nash, Ann)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States v. Gonzalez-Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States
Represented By: Ann E. Nash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Ann E. Nash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandro Gonzalez-Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?