MSO of Puerto Rico LLC v. Med Scan, PSC et al
Plaintiff: MSO of Puerto Rico LLC
Defendant: Med Scan, PSC, William Cruz Medina, Mediscan, PSC and Medscan MRI & CT Scan, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv01683
Filed: September 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION Submitting CORRECTED CERTIFIED TRANSLATIONS OF SPANISH LANGUAGE DOCUMENTS re: #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Medscan MRI & CT Scan, LLC, William Cruz Medina, Mediscan, PSC, Med Scan, PSC, #10 MOTION Submitting Certified Translations of Spanish Language Documents and for a Brief Extension of Time to File Certified Translations of Spanish Documents re: #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Medscan MRI & CT Scan, LLC, William Cruz Med filed by Medscan MRI & CT Scan, LLC, William Cruz Medina, Mediscan, PSC, Med Scan, PSC, #7 MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/9/18 to file Spanish Language Documents filed by Medscan MRI & CT Scan, LLC, William Cruz Medina, Mediscan, PSC, Med Scan, PSC, #2 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents and MOTION for Extension of Time until 10/16/2018 to file certified English translations filed by Medscan MRI & CT Scan, LLC, William Cruz Medina, Mediscan, PSC, Med Scan, PSC filed by Anibal J. Nunez-Gonzalez on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 11/26/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified translation of Docket 1-1, #2 Exhibit Certified translation of Docket 1-2, #3 Exhibit Certified translation of Docket 1-3, #4 Exhibit Certified translation of Docket 1-4, #5 Exhibit Certified translation of Docket 1-5, #6 Exhibit Certified translation of Docket 1-6, #7 Exhibit Certified translation of Docket 1-7, #8 Exhibit Certified translation of Docket 1-8)(Related document(s) #1 , #10 , #7 , #2 ) (Nunez-Gonzalez, Anibal)
November 9, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION Submitting Certified Translations of Spanish Language Documents and for a Brief Extension of Time to File Certified Translations of Spanish Documents re: #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Medscan MRI & CT Scan, LLC, William Cruz Medina, Mediscan, PSC, Med Scan, PSC, #7 MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/9/18 to file Spanish Language Documents filed by Medscan MRI & CT Scan, LLC, William Cruz Medina, Mediscan, PSC, Med Scan, PSC, #2 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents and MOTION for Extension of Time until 10/16/2018 to file certified English translations filed by Medscan MRI & CT Scan, LLC, William Cruz Medina, Mediscan, PSC, Med Scan, PSC filed by Anibal J. Nunez-Gonzalez on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 11/26/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified translation of Docket 1-3, #2 Exhibit Certified translation of Docket 1-4, #3 Exhibit Certified translation of Docket 1-5, #4 Exhibit Certified translation of Docket 1-6, #5 Exhibit Certified translation of Docket 1-7, #6 Exhibit Certified translation of Docket 1-8)(Related document(s) #1 , #7 , #2 ) (Nunez-Gonzalez, Anibal)
November 1, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for extension of time to To Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint and to Respond to Motion to Remand filed by Anibal J. Nunez-Gonzalez on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 11/15/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Nunez-Gonzalez, Anibal)
October 30, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Ivan Llado-Rodriguez on behalf of MSO of Puerto Rico LLC Responses due by 11/13/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Llado-Rodriguez, Ivan)
October 16, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/9/18 to file Spanish Language Documents filed by Anibal J. Nunez-Gonzalez on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 10/30/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Nunez-Gonzalez, Anibal)
October 11, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Ramon E. Dapena on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Dapena, Ramon)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Answer deadline due by 11/1/2018. Signed by Judge William G. Young on 10/4/2018. (EES)
October 2, 2018 Filing 4 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Anibal J. Nunez-Gonzalez on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 10/16/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Nunez-Gonzalez, Anibal)
September 17, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge William G. Young (arg)
September 16, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents and, MOTION for Extension of Time until 10/16/2018 to file certified English translations filed by Anibal J. Nunez-Gonzalez on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 10/1/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Nunez-Gonzalez, Anibal)
September 16, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Court of First Instance Superior Court of San Juan, case number SJ2018cv06497. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0104-6058037), filed by Medscan MRI & CT Scan, LLC, Mediscan, PSC, Med Scan, PSC, William Cruz Medina. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Demanda, #2 Exhibit Mocion 8-21-18, #3 Exhibit Mocion 8-23-18, #4 Exhibit Primera Orden 8-28-18, #5 Exhibit Segunda Orden 8-28-18, #6 Exhibit Mocion Emplazamientos 9-11-18, #7 Exhibit Docket report print out, #8 Exhibit Notice to State Court of Notice of Removal, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Category Sheet)(Nunez-Gonzalez, Anibal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MSO of Puerto Rico LLC v. Med Scan, PSC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Med Scan, PSC
Represented By: Anibal J. Nunez-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Cruz Medina
Represented By: Anibal J. Nunez-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mediscan, PSC
Represented By: Anibal J. Nunez-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medscan MRI & CT Scan, LLC
Represented By: Anibal J. Nunez-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSO of Puerto Rico LLC
Represented By: Ivan Llado-Rodriguez
Represented By: Ramon E. Dapena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?