Mayaguez Economic Development Inc. v. Federkiewicz et al
Plaintiff: Mayaguez Economic Development Inc.
Defendant: Trevor Federkiewicz and Know Limits Private Lending Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01692
Filed: September 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Juan M Perez-Gimenez
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION Submitting Exhibits to Complaint re #1 Complaint, filed by Mayaguez Economic Development Inc. filed by Patricia Rivera-MacMurray on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 11/27/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Rivera-MacMurray, Patricia)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER RE COMMUNICATIONS WITH STAFF.Signed by Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez on 4/4/2014.(gav)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER RE COURTESY COPIES.Signed by Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez on 4/4/2014.(gav)
September 20, 2018 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: By Order of Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (Docket No. 4), this case has been transferred to the docket of Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez. Signed by Clerk on 09/20/2018.(gr)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This case is reassigned to the docket of Senior U.S. District Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez, who has consented to said transfer. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 9/20/2018. (gr)
September 20, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Trevor Federkiewicz, Know Limits Private Lending Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
September 20, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (arg)
September 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6064190.), filed by Mayaguez Economic Development Inc.. Service due by 12/18/2018, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Rivera-MacMurray, Patricia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mayaguez Economic Development Inc. v. Federkiewicz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mayaguez Economic Development Inc.
Represented By: Patricia Rivera-MacMurray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trevor Federkiewicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Know Limits Private Lending Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?