Osborn v. Mapfre Praico Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Shane Osborn
Defendant: Insurance Company XYZ, Mapfre Praico Insurance Company and Independent Adjuster Company ABC
Case Number: 3:2018cv01697
Filed: September 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Francisco A Besosa
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Roberto Abesada-Aguet on behalf of Mapfre Praico Insurance Company (Abesada-Aguet, Roberto)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #8 Motion for extension of time: GRANTED until November 20, 2018. No additional extensions will be allowed.Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 10/19/2018. (brc)
October 19, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for extension of time until November 19th, 2018 to File Responsive Pleading or Dispositive Motion filed by Rocio Del Mar Valentin-Colon on behalf of Mapfre Praico Insurance Company Responses due by 11/2/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Valentin-Colon, Rocio)
October 19, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Rocio Del Mar Valentin-Colon on behalf of Mapfre Praico Insurance Company (Valentin-Colon, Rocio)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #5 Motion for Leave to Appear: NOTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 10/19/2018. (brc)
October 19, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear filed by Jose A. Gutierrez on behalf of Shane Osborn Responses due by 11/2/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Gutierrez, Jose)
October 17, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Mapfre Praico Insurance Company served on 9/28/2018, answer due 10/19/2018. (Portilla-Skerrett, Angel) Modified on 10/18/2018 to remove restriction as per counsel's request (ab).
September 21, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Mapfre Praico Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
September 21, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa (arg)
September 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6065700.), filed by Shane Osborn. Service due by 12/19/2018, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Summons Mapfre Praico Insurance Company, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Portilla-Skerrett, Angel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Osborn v. Mapfre Praico Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance Company XYZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mapfre Praico Insurance Company
Represented By: Rocio Del Mar Valentin-Colon
Represented By: Roberto Abesada-Aguet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Independent Adjuster Company ABC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shane Osborn
Represented By: Angel E. Portilla-Skerrett
Represented By: Jose A. Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?