Burstein et al

Plaintiff: Estate of Nancy Burstein, Eve Burstein, Noah Burstein, Michael Burstein and William Burstein
Defendant: Real Legacy Assurance, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01701
Filed: September 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Pedro A Delgado-Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Real Legacy Assurance, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm)
October 10, 2018 Filing 7 Noting #6 "Informative Motion Concerning Filing of Form of Summons." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/10/2018. (EMJ)
October 6, 2018 Filing 6 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding filing of form of summons filed by Juan H. Saavedra-Castro on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 10/22/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Saavedra-Castro, Juan)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Noting #3 "Informative Motion Concerning Filing of Civil cover..." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 9/24/2018. (LMR)
September 24, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (arg)
September 21, 2018 Filing 3 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding filing of Cover Sheet and Category Sheet filed by Juan H. Saavedra-Castro on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 10/5/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Saavedra-Castro, Juan)
September 21, 2018 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING Civil Cover Sheet (JS44), and Category Sheet not included electronically pursuant to L.Civ.R. 3(a). (arg)
September 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Real Legacy Assurance, Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6066057.), filed by William Burstein, Eve Burstein, Noah Burstein, Estate of Nancy Burstein, Michael Burstein. Service due by 12/19/2018,(Saavedra-Castro, Juan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burstein et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Nancy Burstein
Represented By: Juan H. Saavedra-Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eve Burstein
Represented By: Juan H. Saavedra-Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noah Burstein
Represented By: Juan H. Saavedra-Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Burstein
Represented By: Juan H. Saavedra-Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Burstein
Represented By: Juan H. Saavedra-Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Legacy Assurance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?