Vogel et al v. Universal Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Juanita Vogel, Casa La Roca, LLC and Chuck Vogel
Defendant: Ramon Enrique Ramos-Coll, ABC Insurance Companies and Universal Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2018cv01706
Filed: September 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Pedro A Delgado-Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time until Dec. 13, 2018 to File Answer to re: #12 Amended Complaint, filed by Chuck Vogel, Casa La Roca, LLC, Juanita Vogel, #13 Brief, filed by Chuck Vogel, Casa La Roca, LLC, Juanita Vogel filed by Sofia Rosado-Wojna on behalf of Universal Insurance Company Responses due by 11/29/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #12 , #13 ) (Rosado-Wojna, Sofia)
November 9, 2018 Filing 13 BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Section II - Property Coverage Part of Policy UNPK018079 for the period of 2016-2017, page 1, #2 Exhibit 2017-2018 Insurance Policy Property Coverage Declarations Page, #3 Exhibit January 2nd, 2018 Denial Letter by Universal Insurance Company, #4 Exhibit Itemization of repairs and amounts claimed and adjusted) (Vicens, Vanesa)
November 9, 2018 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT AND REQUEST FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against All Defendants, filed by Chuck Vogel, Casa La Roca, LLC, Juanita Vogel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Insurance Policy 2017-2018, #2 Exhibit Definitions Section, #3 Exhibit Denial Letter)(Vicens, Vanesa)
November 2, 2018 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, on behalf of Defendant Ramon Enrique Ramos-Coll, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(mr)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Noting and Granting #8 "Notice of Appearance and Request of Extension of Time to Answer Complaint or Otherwise Plead." Appearing defendant shall answer the complaint or otherwise plead by 11/16/2018. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/16/2018. (LMR)
October 16, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance of Additional Counsel by Sofia Rosado-Wojna on behalf of Universal Insurance Company (Rosado-Wojna, Sofia)
October 16, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Counsel, MOTION for Extension of Time until November 16, 2018 to File Answer to Complaint or Otherwise Plead re: #1 Complaint, filed by Chuck Vogel, Casa La Roca, LLC, Juanita Vogel filed by Juan J. Casillas-Ayala on behalf of Universal Insurance Company Responses due by 10/30/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Casillas-Ayala, Juan)
October 15, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Ramon Enrique Ramos-Coll served on 10/12/2018, answer due 11/2/2018. (Cardona-Fernandez, Ileana)
September 28, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Universal Insurance Company served on 9/26/2018, answer due 10/17/2018. (Vicens, Vanesa)
September 21, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Ileana C. Cardona-Fernandez on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Cardona-Fernandez, Ileana)
September 21, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Ramon Enrique Ramos-Coll, Universal Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
September 21, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (arg)
September 20, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Vanesa Vicens on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Vicens, Vanesa)
September 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6066556.), filed by Chuck Vogel, Casa La Roca, LLC, Juanita Vogel. Service due by 12/19/2018, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Universal Insurance Company, #4 Summons Ramon E. Ramos Coll)(Indiano-Vicic, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vogel et al v. Universal Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juanita Vogel
Represented By: Vanesa Vicens
Represented By: David C. Indiano-Vicic
Represented By: Ileana C. Cardona-Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casa La Roca, LLC
Represented By: Vanesa Vicens
Represented By: David C. Indiano-Vicic
Represented By: Ileana C. Cardona-Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chuck Vogel
Represented By: Vanesa Vicens
Represented By: David C. Indiano-Vicic
Represented By: Ileana C. Cardona-Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramon Enrique Ramos-Coll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Insurance Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Insurance Company
Represented By: Sofia Rosado-Wojna
Represented By: Juan J. Casillas-Ayala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?