Ortiz-Ramos v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Angel D Ortiz Ramos and Angel D. Ortiz-Ramos
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2018cv01712
Filed: September 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Silvia Carreno-Coll
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Silvia Carreno-Coll on 10/15/2018. (mcv)
September 26, 2018 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: By Order of Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (Docket No. 6), this case has been randomly reassigned within the Case Assignment System to Magistrate Judge Silvia Carreno-Coll to conduct all further proceedings, including the entry of judgment. All further pleadings shall bear only the initials of the Magistrate Judge next to the case number: Civil No. 18-1712(SCC). Judge Delgado-Hernandez is no longer assigned to this case. Signed by Clerk on 09/26/2018. (gr)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge. The Commissioner of Social Security has consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge in all cases involving judicial review of a final order denying disability benefits under the Social Security Act. Upon plaintiff's consent (Docket No. 3) the case is referred to a U.S. Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings, including entry of judgment. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 9/25/2018.(LMR)
September 25, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (arg)
September 24, 2018 Filing 4 CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Angel D Ortiz Ramos. (Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro)
September 24, 2018 Filing 3 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Angel D Ortiz Ramos. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement, #3 Category Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro)
September 24, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Pedro G. Cruz-Sanchez on behalf of Angel D Ortiz Ramos Responses due by 10/9/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro)
September 24, 2018 Filing 1 **SELECTED PARTY** FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Angel D Ortiz Ramos. (Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortiz-Ramos v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel D Ortiz Ramos
Represented By: Pedro G. Cruz-Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel D. Ortiz-Ramos
Represented By: Pedro G. Cruz-Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?