Rivera-Pina et al v. Luxury Hotels International of Puerto Rico
Plaintiff: Isaac V Lopez Diaz, Neydimar Oquendo Rodriguez, Jose L Escobar, Elsie Alvarez Rodriguez, Elizabeth Bruno Ortega, Gracelyn Proctor, Nestor Maldonado Cruzado, Wilfredo Rivera Vargas, Jose A Figueroa Encarnacion, Carol Rodriguez Sanchez, Zaida M Claudio Torres, Eduardo Martinez Rivera, Alexier Ramos Matos, Zinnia Jimenez, Anthony Vargas Medero, Braulio de Leon Rodriguez, Barbara Canales Maldonado, Ileana Acevedo, Carlos J Fontanez De Jesus, Santiago Perez Cruz, Gerardo Merced Otero, Javier Murati Rosa, Nomar Marquez Arroyo, Jose Rivera Rivera, Claudio Garcia Febles, Atreyu Rivera Osorio, Felipe J Nieves Santos, Edgardo Jimenez Quinones, Maria Serrano Rivera, Dionisio Diaz Suarez, Carla C Montalvo Anabitarte, William A Merced Narvaez, Howard de Leon Rodriguez, David de Jesus Sanchez, Mike Sosa, David Roman Rivera, Jose A Gonzalez Rios, Jaime Moux Gonzalez, Misael J Pagan, Eduvigis Hernandez Alberto, Denise Malave Fonseca, Emilio A Gabino Severino, Jose A Rivera Pina, Angel L Semidey Sepulveda, Juan C Lopez Rivera, Jose M Sanchez Agosto, Maria D Lopez Cosme, Mateo Cepeda Romero, William Izquierdo, Amarilis Ortiz Pacheco, Christian Santiago Rodriguez, Raul Delgado Pagan, Angelo Cuevas Tapia, Amanda Berrios Diaz, Luis Fernandez Souffron, Jocelyn Diaz Melendez, Ramona Santana Acosta, Samuel Torres Perez, Ruben Rodriguez Jimenez, Luz J Garcia Ortiz, Dolores Rodriguez Feliz, Lizalli Caceres Solis, Richard Rivera Canales, Ana S Toro Ortiz, Glendaly Hernandez Diaz, Belgica Bautista, Vanessa Rivera Carrion, Carlos A Diaz Muniz, Jessica Lucas Muoz, Maria E Acevedo Rivera, Aurea E Vargas Rodriguez, Ricardo Rivas Pimentel, Guillermo E de la Cruz Abreu, Rolando A Lopez Sosa, Camille Oquendo, Carlos R Arroyo Vega, Yaneuri Restituyo, Lisbeth de Leon Marquez, Juan C Romanacce Rodriguez, Milton Gines Ayuso, Salvador Baez Perez, Eva J Pesquera Rodriguez, Leomary Martinez Martinez, Marta Pacheco Arroyo, Enrique Rosa Esquilin, Jafed Escobar Ayala, Richard A Chong Valdes, Edwin Vazquez Gonzalez, Edwin E Sanchez Henriquez, Ernesto Middelhof, Yamillie Melendez Rivera, Myriam Garcia Viera, Iraida Rodriguez Soto, Manuel De La Rosa Meran, Rafael Lugo Cintron, Miguel A Cruz Medina, Lisa Y Soto Pena, Milagros Rivera Mercado, Junior J Cedano Nova, Eunice A Rosario Abreu, David Otero Rodriguez, Felix O Ramos Rivera, Daniel Nieves Munoz, Yazmin Pagan Loriga, Jose A Vega Cruz, Carlos M Nina Morban, Carmen F Bonilla Vallejo, Jaime R Cepeda Cruz, Francis J Brown Rivera, Danny A Gonzalez, Eimy Carrion Marquez, Carmen L Ruiz, Javier Rodriguez Rodriguez, Jennifer Marrero Colon, Cesar R Merced Torres, Catherine Andino Sanchez, Jennifer Gonzalez Martinez, Roman Herrera Gonzalez, Jennifer Rodriguez Martinez, Esteban G Rios Santana, Yajaira Velez Guzman, Luis F Maldonado Flores, Giovanna Vargas, Carlos J Del Valle Maldonado, Yanira Davila Gonzalez, Wilfredo Garcia Boy, Migdalia Nieves Figueroa, Yesenia Montes Colon, Sara Muniz Carasquillo, Samuel Rivera Lebron, Cristian Crisostomo, Magdalis Gonzalez, James Higginshotham Padilla, Luis A Alicea Santos, Bernard I Sanchez Bisbal, Juan G Borrero Escalera, Marisela Figueroa Vega, Giovanni Martinez Rios, Jose M Martinez Torres, Jesus G Crespo Vargas, Nubia M Polania Martinez, Maria Rondon, Letty Zayas Matta, Michael Diaz Colon, Annette Marcano Betancourt, Zulin Villanueva Orellano, Maribel Mendoza Munayco, Wanda M Ortiz Ojeda, Elizabeth Rodriguez Acosta, Noemi Matos Rivera, Iris N Flores Caraballo, Edwin Ramos Serrano, America Soriano Gonzalez, Jeremy Baptiste, Jose A. Rivera-Pina, Denise Malave-Fonseca, Elizabeth Bruno-Ortega, Eunice A. Rosario-Abreu, Guillermo E. De la Cruz-Abreu, Iris N. Flores-Caraballo, Javier Rodriguez-Rodriguez, Juan C. Romanacce-Rodriguez, Lisbeth De Leon-Marquez, Luz J. Garcia-Ortiz, Marisela Figueroa-Vega, Richard Rivera-Canales, Rolando A. Lopez-Sosa, Ruben Rodriguez-Jimenez, Howard De Leon-Rodriguez, Emilio A. Gabino-Severino, Francis J. Brown-Rivera, Luis F. Maldonado-Flores, Maribel Mendoza-Munayco, Rafael Lugo-Cintron, Ricardo Rivas-Pimentel, Salvador Baez-Perez, Sara Muniz-Carasquillo, Wanda M. Ortiz-Ojeda, Aurea E. Vargas-Rodriguez, Carlos J. Del Valle-Maldonado, Claudio Garcia-Febles, Daniel Nieves-Munoz, David De Jesus-Sanchez, Dolores Rodriguez-Feliz, Braulio De Leon-Rodriguez, Santiago Perez-Cruz, Noemi Matos-Rivera, Myriam Garcia-Viera, Mateo Cepeda-Romero, Luis Fernandez-Souffron, Lisa Y. Soto-Pena, Letty Zayas-Matta, Jose Rivera-Rivera, Jesus G. Crespo-Vargas, Felix O. Ramos-Rivera, Enrique Rosa-Esquilin, America Soriano-Gonzalez, David Roman-Rivera, Edgardo Jimenez-Quinones, Bernard I. Sanchez-Bisbal, Catherine Andino-Sanchez, Dionisio Diaz-Suarez, Eduvigis Hernandez-Alberto, Gerardo Merced-Otero, Isaac V. Lopez-Diaz, Javier Murati-Rosa, Jose A. Gonzalez-Rios, Maria Serrano-Rivera, Neydimar Oquendo-Rodriguez, Vanessa Rivera-Carrion, William A. Merced-Narvaez, Yesenia Montes-Colon, Samuel Torres-Perez, Roman Herrera-Gonzalez, Raul Delgado-Pagan, Carlos M. Nina-Morban, David Otero-Rodriguez, Esteban G. Rios-Santana, Jaime R. Cepeda-Cruz, Manuel De La Rosa-Meran, Ana S. Toro-Ortiz, Carmen F. Bonilla-Vallejo, Edwin Vazquez-Gonzalez, Jaime Moux-Gonzalez, Jose M. Martinez-Torres, Marta Pacheco-Arroyo, Annette Marcano-Betancourt, Carlos A. Diaz-Muniz, Carol Rodriguez-Sanchez, Cesar R. Merced-Torres, Eimy Carrion-Marquez, Jennifer Marrero-Colon, Jose L. Escobar, Maria D. Lopez-Cosme, Maria E. Acevedo-Rivera, Milagros Rivera-Mercado, Milton Gines-Ayuso, Zaida M. Claudio-Torres, Angel L. Semidey-Sepulveda, Carlos R. Arroyo-Vega, Danny A. Gonzalez, Edwin E. Sanchez-Henriquez, Elizabeth Rodriguez-Acosta, James Higginshotham-Padilla, Jennifer Rodriguez-Martinez, Jose A. Figueroa-Encarnacion, Jose A. Vega-Cruz and Juan G. Borrero-Escalera
Defendant: Luxury Hotels International of Puerto Rico d/b/a Ritz-Carlton Hotel Spa & Casino and Luxury Hotels International of Puerto Rico doing business as Ritz-Carlton Hotel Spa & Casino
Case Number: 3:2018cv01719
Filed: September 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Pedro A Delgado-Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 120 USCCA Case Number 22-1377 for #116 Notice of Appeal, filed by All Plaintiffs. (mcm)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 119 Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #116 Notice of Appeal [Docket Entries 111, 112, 113 & 116] (mcm)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER: Denying without prejudice #114 "Bill of Costs." The motion may be refiled within 14 days after issuance of the First Circuit's mandate, in accordance with Local Civil Rule 54(a). Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 5/3/2022. (LM)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 117 RESPONSE in Opposition to Defendants Bill of Costs filed by All Plaintiffs Re: #114 Bill of Costs,,, filed by Luxury Hotels International of Puerto Rico filed by All Plaintiffs. (Marchand-Heredia, Jorge)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 116 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #112 Judgment, #111 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Strike, by All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $505, receipt number APRDC-7735594. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel should register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at #http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf/. Counsel should also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/cmecf (Marchand-Heredia, Jorge) Modified on 5/2/2022 to edit plaintiff's name list (mcm).
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 115 Order re: #114 "Bill of Costs." Plaintiffs shall respond not later than May 3, 2022. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 4/18/2022.(LM)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 114 BILL OF COSTS and Brief in Support of Defendant's Bill of Costs by Luxury Hotels International of Puerto Rico. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Brief in Support of Bill of Costs, #2 Exhibit 1: Filing Fee Receipt, #3 Exhibit 2: Invoice 6545 dated October 11, 2019 Deposition Transcripts, #4 Exhibit 3: Invoice 6677 dated December 3,2019 Deposition Transcripts, #5 Exhibit 4: Invoice 6781 dated January 8, 2020 Deposition Transcripts, #6 Exhibit 5: Invoice 6852 dated February 10, 2020 Deposition Transcripts, #7 Exhibit 6: Invoice 6890 dated February 21, 2020 Deposition Transcripts, #8 Exhibit 7: Invoices 798038 and 798382 Digitizing Services, #9 Exhibit 8: Letter to Plaintiffs' Counsel dated April 17, 2019, #10 Exhibit 9: Case Management Order) (Mercado-Ramos, Ivy) Modified on 4/18/2022 to replace capital letters (mcm).
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 113 Errata Sheet: See attached. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 4/1/2022. (LM) (Modified to add additional attachment(s) on 4/1/2022: #1 Opinion and Order, #2 Appendix I, #3 Appendix II) (mcm).
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 112 JUDGMENT: See attached. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 3/31/2022. (LM)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 111 OPINION AND ORDER: The motion for summary judgment (Docket No. 86) is GRANTED the motion to strike exhibits of defendant's proposed statement of uncontested facts (Docket No. 92) is DENIED, and the case is DISMISSED. See attached. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 3/31/2022.(LM)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 110 SURREPLY to Reply to Opposition to Motion For Summary Judgment re: #86 Motion for Summary Judgment, REPLY to Response to Motion re: #92 Motion to Strike filed by All Plaintiffs. (Marchand-Heredia, Jorge) Modified on 9/7/2021 to add docket relationship and edit docket text (mcm).
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER: Granting #108 "Motion Requesting Extension of Time to File Surreply to Reply to Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment." Surreply due September 3, 2021. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 8/19/2021. (MPL)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 108 MOTION for Extension of Time until 9/3/2021 to File Response/Reply filed by Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 9/2/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit COVID TEST)(Marchand-Heredia, Jorge)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER: Granting #105 "Motion for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof in Excess of Ten (10) Pages." The court notes defendant filed the reply brief at Docket No. 106. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 8/12/2021. (MPL)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 106 REPLY to Response to Motion for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof filed by Luxury Hotels International of Puerto Rico Re: #86 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof filed by Luxury Hotels International of Puerto Rico filed by Luxury Hotels International of Puerto Rico. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A: Statement of Uncontested Facts' Cross-Reference Appendix, #2 Exhibit 239: Unsworn Declaration A. Villapol, #3 Exhibit 239a: Email from I. Mercado to J. Marchand October 21 2020, #4 Exhibit 240: Certified Translation of Audio Transcript (March 19 2018))(Mercado-Ramos, Ivy)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof in Excess of Ten (10) Pages filed by Ivy Mercado-Ramos on behalf of Luxury Hotels International of Puerto Rico Responses due by 8/26/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Mercado-Ramos, Ivy)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 104 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion to Strike Exhibit filed by Luxury Hotels International of Puerto Rico Re: #92 MOTION to Strike a Exhibit from Defendant's Proposed Statement of Uncontested Facts Re: #87 MOTION for Summary Judgment Statement of Uncontested Facts filed by Luxury Hotels International of Puerto Rico filed by All Plaintiffs filed by Luxury Hotels International of Puerto Rico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 238: Unsworn Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury - J. Volkart)(Mercado-Ramos, Ivy) Modified on 8/13/2021 to edit docket text (mcm).
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 103 RESPONSE to Motion Plaintiffs' Additional Relevant Facts filed by Luxury Hotels International of Puerto Rico Re: #92 MOTION to Strike a Exhibit from Defendant's Proposed Statement of Uncontested Facts Re: #87 MOTION for Summary Judgment Statement of Uncontested Facts filed by Luxury Hotels International of Puerto Rico filed by All Plaintiffs filed by Luxury Hotels International of Puerto Rico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 236: Email from J. Marchand to I. Mercado dated September 4 2020, #2 Exhibit 237: RCSJ General Assembly Audio Transcript (October 7, 2017))(Mercado-Ramos, Ivy) Modified on 8/13/2021 to edit docket text (mcm).
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER: Granting #101 "Request for Extension of Time." Responses due August 12, 2021. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 8/4/2021. (MPL)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 101 MOTION for Extension of Time until August 12, 2021 to File Response/Reply filed by Ivy Mercado-Ramos on behalf of Luxury Hotels International of Puerto Rico Responses due by 8/17/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Mercado-Ramos, Ivy)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER: Granting #99 "Request for Extension of Time." Responses due August 5, 2021. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 7/14/2021. (MPL)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 99 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time until August 5, 2021 to File Response/Reply filed by Ivy Mercado-Ramos on behalf of Luxury Hotels International of Puerto Rico Responses due by 7/28/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Mercado-Ramos, Ivy)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #98 MOTION for Extension of Time until August 5, 2021 to File Response/Reply . ***FILED IN ERROR - Counsel filed the PDF in "legal format". PDF shall be corrected to a 8.5 x 11 "letter format" and re-file.*** (mcm)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ***FILED IN ERROR - Counsel filed the PDF in "legal format". PDF shall be corrected to a 8.5 x 11 "letter format" and re-file.*** MOTION for Extension of Time until August 5, 2021 to File Response/Reply filed by Ivy Mercado-Ramos on behalf of Luxury Hotels International of Puerto Rico Responses due by 7/27/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Mercado-Ramos, Ivy) Modified on 7/14/2021 (mcm).
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER: Granting #96 "Request for Extension of Time." Motions due July 21, 2021. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 6/28/2021. (MPL)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #93 Objection to,, filed by All Plaintiffs, #92 MOTION to Strike a Exhibit from Defendant's Proposed Statement of Uncontested Facts Re: #87 MOTION for Summary Judgment Statement of Uncontested Facts filed by Luxury Hotels International of Puerto Rico filed by All Plaintiffs, #94 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by All Plaintiffs filed by Raquel Roman-Morales on behalf of Luxury Hotels International of Puerto Rico Responses due by 7/12/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #93 , #92 , #94 ) (Roman-Morales, Raquel) Modified on 6/29/2021 to edit docket text (mcm).
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER re: #92 "Motion to Strike Exhibit of Defendant's Proposed Statement of Uncontested Facts." Defendant shall respond not later than July 12, 2021. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 6/28/2021.(MPL)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 94 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment filed by All Plaintiffs Re: #87 MOTION for Summary Judgment Statement of Uncontested Facts filed by Luxury Hotels International of Puerto Rico, #86 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof filed by Luxury Hotels International of Puerto Rico filed by All Plaintiffs. (Marchand-Heredia, Jorge)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 93 RESPONSE and OBJECTION to Defendant's Proposed Statement of Uncontested Facts filed by All Plaintiffs Re: #87 MOTION for Summary Judgment Statement of Uncontested Facts filed by Luxury Hotels International of Puerto Rico filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit exhibit 6)(Marchand-Heredia, Jorge) Modified on 6/25/2021 to edit title (mcm).
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MOTION to Strike a Exhibit from Defendant's Proposed Statement of Uncontested Facts Re: #87 MOTION for Summary Judgment Statement of Uncontested Facts filed by Luxury Hotels International of Puerto Rico filed by Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 7/8/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #87 ) (Marchand-Heredia, Jorge)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER: Granting #90 "Motion Requesting Short and Last Extension of Time to File Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment." Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment due June 24, 2021. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 6/15/2021. (MPL)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 90 Final MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 89 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, filed by Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 6/29/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Hearing, #2 Appendix hearing)(Related document(s) 89 ) (Marchand-Heredia, Jorge)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER: Granting #88 "Motion Requesting Extension of Time to File Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment." Opposition to motion for summary judgment due June 16, 2021. As previously discussed (Docket No. 81), the case is reaching the 3-year benchmark. Plaintiffs are advised that the court is not inclined to grant additional extensions of time. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 5/7/2021. (MPL)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MOTION for Extension of Time until 6/16/2021 to File Response/Reply to Motion For Summary Judgment filed by Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 5/21/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Marchand-Heredia, Jorge)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MOTION for Summary Judgment Statement of Uncontested Facts filed by Ivy Mercado-Ramos on behalf of Luxury Hotels International of Puerto Rico Suggestions in Opposition to Summary Judgment due by 5/14/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit Master List, #2 Exhibit 1: Second Modified Joint Partial Statement of Uncontested Facts, #3 Exhibit 2: Deposition Transcript for Plaintiff Daniel Nieves Muoz, #4 Exhibit 3: Deposition Transcript for Plaintiff Richard Rivera Canales, #5 Exhibit 4: Deposition Transcript for Plaintiff Santiago Prez Cruz, #6 Exhibit 5: Deposition Transcript for Plaintiff Guillermo E. De La Cruz Abreu, #7 Exhibit 6: Deposition Transcript for Plaintiff Ricardo Rivas Pimentel, #8 Exhibit 7: Deposition Transcript for Plaintiff Nomar Mrquez Arroyo, #9 Exhibit 8: Deposition Transcript for Plaintiff Claudio Garca Febles, #10 Exhibit 9: Deposition Transcript for Plaintiff Milton Gins Ayuso, #11 Exhibit 10: Deposition Transcript for Plaintiff Rafael Lugo Cintrn, #12 Exhibit 11: Deposition Transcript for Plaintiff Alexier Ramos Matos, #13 Exhibit 12: Deposition Transcript for Plaintiff David De Jess Snchez, #14 Exhibit 13: Deposition Transcript for Plaintiff Jaime Moux Gonzlez, #15 Exhibit 14: Deposition Transcript for Plaintiff Angelo Cuevas Tapia, #16 Exhibit 15: Deposition Transcript for Plaintiff Gerardo Merced Otero, #17 Exhibit 16: Deposition Transcript for Plaintiff Jos A. Vega Cruz, #18 Exhibit 17: Deposition Transcript for Plaintiff Manuel De La Rosa Mern, #19 Exhibit 18: Deposition Transcript for Plaintiff Rolando Lpez Sosa, #20 Exhibit 19: Deposition Transcript for Plaintiff Javier Rodrguez Rodrguez, #21 Exhibit 20: Deposition Transcript for Plaintiff David Otero Rodrguez, #22 Exhibit 21: Deposition Transcript for Plaintiff Jos M. Martnez Torres, #23 Exhibit 22: Deposition Transcript for Plaintiff Mara A. Lpez Cosme, #24 Exhibit 23: Deposition Transcript for Plaintiff Carlos A. Daz Muiz, #25 Exhibit 24: Deposition Transcript for Plaintiff Jos Figueroa Encarnacin, #26 Exhibit 25: Deposition Transcript for Plaintiff Carlos Arroyo Vega, #27 Exhibit 26: Deposition Transcript for Plaintiff Migdalia Nieves Figueroa, #28 Exhibit 27: Deposition Transcript for Plaintiff Ramona Santana Acosta, #29 Exhibit 28: Deposition Transcript for Plaintiff Juan Carlo Romanacce Rodrguez, #30 Exhibit 29: Deposition Transcript for Plaintiff Esteban Guillermo Ros Santana, #31 Exhibit 30: Deposition Transcript for Plaintiff Ana Silvia Toro Ortiz, #32 Exhibit 31: Deposition Transcript for Plaintiff Flix O. Ramos Rivera, #33 Exhibit 32: Deposition Transcript for Plaintiff Howard De Len Rodrguez, #34 Exhibit 33: Deposition Transcript for Plaintiff Emilio Gabino Severino, #35 Exhibit 34: Deposition Transcript for Plaintiff Jennifer Gonzlez Martnez, #36 Exhibit 35: Deposition Transcript for Plaintiff Edwin Vzquez Gonzlez, #37 Exhibit 36: Deposition Transcript for Plaintiff Bernard I. Snchez Bisbal, #38 Exhibit 37: Deposition Transcript for Plaintiff Samuel I. Rivera Lebrn, #39 Exhibit 38: Deposition Transcript for Plaintiff Lisa Y. Soto Pea, #40 Exhibit 39: Deposition Transcript for Plaintiff Yazmn Pagn Loriga, #41 Exhibit 40: Deposition Transcript for Plaintiff Eduardo Martnez Rivera, #42 Exhibit 41: Deposition Transcript for Plaintiff Iris Flores Caraballo, #43 Exhibit 42: Deposition Transcript for Plaintiff Amrica Soriano Gonzlez, #44 Exhibit 43: Deposition Transcript for Plaintiff Mara E. Acevedo Rivera, #45 Exhibit 44: Deposition Transcript for Plaintiff Jess G. Crespo Vargas, #46 Exhibit 45: Deposition Transcript for Plaintiff Felipe J. Nieves Santos, #47 Exhibit 46: Deposition Transcript for Plaintiff Jos A. Rivera Pia, #48 Exhibit 47: Deposition Transcript for Plaintiff Samuel Torres Prez, #49 Exhibit 48: Deposition Transcript for Plaintiff Csar E. Merced Torres, #50 Exhibit 49: Deposition Transcript for Plaintiff Jos M. Snchez Agosto, #51 Exhibit 50: Deposition Transcript for Plaintiff Misael J. Pagn, #52 Exhibit 51: Deposition Transcript for Plaintiff William Izquierdo Cintrn, #53 Exhibit 52: Deposition Transcript for Plaintiff ngel L. Semidey Seplveda, #54 Exhibit 53: Deposition Transcript for Plaintiff Aliana I. Acevedo Bermdez, #55 Exhibit 54: Deposition Transcript for Plaintiff Yanira Dvila Gonzlez, #56 Exhibit 55: Deposition Transcript for Plaintiff Giovanni A. Martnez Ros, #57 Exhibit 56: Deposition Transcript for Plaintiff David Romn Rivera, #58 Exhibit 57: Deposition Transcript for Plaintiff William Merced Narvez, #59 Exhibit 58: Deposition Transcript for Plaintiff Carmen F. Bonilla Vallejo, #60 Exhibit 59: Deposition Transcript for Plaintiff Annette Marcano Betancourt, #61 Exhibit 60: Deposition Transcript for Plaintiff Mara A. Rondn Ortiz, #62 Exhibit 61: Deposition Transcript for Plaintiff Elizabeth Rodrguez Acosta, #63 Exhibit 62: Deposition Transcript for Plaintiff Nubia Magdalena Polania Martnez, #64 Exhibit 63: Deposition Transcript for Plaintiff Armanda Berros Daz, #65 Exhibit 64: Deposition Transcript for Plaintiff Camille Oquendo Alemar, #66 Exhibit 65: Deposition Transcript for Plaintiff Brbara Canales Maldonado, #67 Exhibit 66: Deposition Transcript for Plaintiff Lizbeth De Len Mrquez, #68 Exhibit 67: Deposition Transcript for Plaintiff Ral Delgado Pagn, #69 Exhibit 68: Deposition Transcript for Plaintiff Lizally Cceres Sols, #70 Exhibit 69: Deposition Transcript for Plaintiff Braulio De Len Rodrguez, #71 Exhibit 70: Deposition Transcript for Plaintiff Catherine Andino Snchez, #72 Exhibit 71: Corporate Deposition Transcript for Jacqueline Volkart, #73 Exhibit 72: Corporate Deposition Transcript for Adele Villapol, #74 Exhibit 73: Corporate Deposition Transcript for Anneliesse Cooper, #75 Exhibit 74: Corporate Deposition Transcript for Jay Galindo, #76 Exhibit 75: Request for Production of Documents & Answer to First Request for Production of Documents for Daniel Nieves Muoz, #77 Exhibit 76: Request for Production of Documents & Answer to First Request for Production of Documents for Richard Rivera Canales, #78 Exhibit 77: Request for Production of Documents & Answer to First Request for Production of Documents for Santiago Prez Cruz, #79 Exhibit 78: Request for Production of Documents & Answer to First Request for Production of Documents for Guillermo E. De La Cruz Abreu, #80 Exhibit 79: Request for Production of Documents & Answer to First Request for Production of Documents for Ricardo Rivas Pimentel, #81 Exhibit 80: Request for Production of Documents & Answer to First Request for Production of Documents for Nomar Mrquez Arroyo, #82 Exhibit 81: Request for Production of Documents & Answer to First Request for Production of Documents for Claudio Garca Febles, #83 Exhibit 82: Request for Production of Documents & Answer to First Request for Production of Documents for Milton Gins Ayuso, #84 Exhibit 83: Request for Production of Documents & Answer to First Request for Production of Documents for Rafael Lugo Cintrn, #85 Exhibit 84: Request for Production of Documents & Answer to First Request for Production of Documents for Alexier Ramos Matos, #86 Exhibit 85: Request for Production of Documents & Answer to First Request for Production of Documents for David De Jess Snchez, #87 Exhibit 86: Request for Production of Documents & Answer to First Request for Production of Documents for Jaime Moux Gonzlez, #88 Exhibit 87: Request for Production of Documents & Answer to First Request for Production of Documents for Angelo Cuevas Tapia, #89 Exhibit 88: Request for Production of Documents & Answer to First Request for Production of Documents for Gerardo Merced Otero, #90 Exhibit 89: Request for Production of Documents & Answer to First Request for Production of Documents for Jos A. Vega Cruz, #91 Exhibit 90: Request for Production of Documents & Answer to First Request for Production of Documents for Manuel De La Rosa Mern, #92 Exhibit 91: Request for Production of Documents & Answer to First Request for Production of Documents for Rolando Lpez Sosa, #93 Exhibit 92: Request for Production of Documents & Answer to First Request for Production of Documents for Javier Rodrguez Rodrguez, #94 Exhibit 93: Request for Production of Documents & Answer to First Request for Production of Documents for David Otero Rodrguez, #95 Exhibit 94: Request for Production of Documents & Answer to First Request for Production of Documents for Jos M. Martnez Torres, #96 Exhibit 95: Request for Production of Documents & Answer to First Request for Production of Documents for Mara A. Lpez Cosme, #97 Exhibit 96: Request for Production of Documents & Answer to First Request for Production of Documents for Carlos A. Daz Muiz, #98 Exhibit 97: Request for Production of Documents & Answer to First Request for Production of Documents for Jos Figueroa Encarnacin, #99 Exhibit 98: Request for Production of Documents & Answer to First Request for Production of Documents for Carlos Arroyo Vega, #100 Exhibit 99: Request for Production of Documents & Answer to First Request for Production of Documents for Migdalia Nieves Figueroa, #101 Exhibit 100: Request for Production of Documents & Answer to First Request for Production of Documents for Ramona Santana Acosta, #102 Exhibit 101: Request for Production of Documents & Answer to First Request for Production of Documents for Juan Carlo Romanacce Rodrguez, #103 Exhibit 102: Request for Production of Documents & Answer to First Request for Production of Documents for Esteban G. Ros Santana, #104 Exhibit 103: Request for Production of Documents & Answer to First Request for Production of Documents for Ana Silvia Toro Ortiz, #105 Exhibit 104: Request for Production of Documents & Answer to First Request for Production of Documents for Flix O. Ramos Rivera, #106 Exhibit 105: Request for Production of Documents & Answer to First Request for Production of Documents for Howard De Len Rodrguez, #107 Exhibit 106: Request for Production of Documents & Answer to First Request for Production of Documents for Emilio Gabino Severino, #108 Exhibit 107: Request for Production of Documents & Answer to First Request for Production of Documents for Jen
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 86 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof filed by Ivy Mercado-Ramos on behalf of Luxury Hotels International of Puerto Rico Suggestions in Opposition to Summary Judgment due by 5/14/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Mercado-Ramos, Ivy)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 85 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez:Telephone Conference held on 3/16/2021. See attached. Any motion for summary judgment shall be filed not later than April 30, 2021. Opposition(s) shall be filed not later than May 17, 2020. Replies and sur-replies will be allowed. They shall be submitted without further court authorization not later than seven (7) days after the filing of the motion they are responding to (i.e. opposition or reply). No additional motions on the subject referred to in those filings are to be tendered or filed without prior court approval. (LMR)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 84 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez:Telephone Conference held on 3/11/2021. See attached. Further Telephone Conference set for 3/16/2021 at 4:30 p.m. (LMR)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER: In consultation with the parties, the telephone conference set for today at 4:45pm is hereby reset for March 11, 2021, at 4:30pm. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 3/10/2021. (MPL)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 82 Minute of Proceedings held before Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez:Telephone Conference held on 3/1/2021. See attached. A follow up telephone conference was set for March 10, 2021, at 4:45pm. (MPL)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 81 Minute of Proceedings held before Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez: Telephone Conference held on 2/19/2021. See attached. Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 2/26/2021. A follow up telephone conference was set for March 1, 2021 at 4:45 p.m. Hearing set for 04:30.Hearing held at 04:24.Hearing ended at 05:23. (LMR)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER: Upon consultation with the parties, a telephone conference is hereby set for February 19, 2021, at 4:30pm. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 2/12/2021. (MPL)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER: Noting #78 "Joint Motion in Compliance with Order Informing Case Status." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 2/12/2021. (MPL)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Joint Motion In Compliance with Order Informing Case Status filed by Ivy Mercado-Ramos on behalf of All Parties. Responses due by 2/26/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Mercado-Ramos, Ivy) Modified on 2/12/2021 to add filers (mcm).
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER: Not later than February 12, 2021, the parties shall jointly inform the court of the status of the case. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 2/5/2021. (MPL)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER: Noting #75 "Notice of Appearance," as to ALL PLAINTIFFS. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 11/13/2020. (ebb)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance by Luis M. Pavia-Vidal on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Pavia-Vidal, Luis)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER: Granting #73 "Second Modified Joint Partial Statement of Uncontested Facts." The items stipulated on at pages 2-15 of the motion shall be considered uncontested and therefore binding upon the parties. Accordingly, Docket No. 57 is hereby superseded. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 11/12/2020. (MPL)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Joint MOTION to Deem Facts as Uncontested filed by Ivy Mercado-Ramos on behalf of Luxury Hotels International of Puerto Rico Responses due by 11/30/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Sample WARN Letter)(Mercado-Ramos, Ivy)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER: Noting #71 "Motion in Compliance with Order Informing Protocol and New Dates for the Corporate Depositions." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/9/2020. (MPL)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 Motion In Compliance with Order Informing Protocol and New Dates for the Corporate Depositions filed by Ivy Mercado-Ramos on behalf of Luxury Hotels International of Puerto Rico Responses due by 10/23/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Mercado-Ramos, Ivy)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER: Granting #69 "Request for Extension of Time to Inform Protocol and Announce New Dates for the Corporate Depositions." Motion in compliance due October 9, 2020. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 9/30/2020. (MPL)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MOTION for extension of time until October 9, 2020 to Inform Protocol and Announce New Dates for the Corporate Depositions filed by Ivy Mercado-Ramos on behalf of Luxury Hotels International of Puerto Rico Responses due by 10/14/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Mercado-Ramos, Ivy)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER: At Docket No. 66, the parties informed the dates for the taking of the corporate depositions. By September 30, 2020 at 3:00 p.m. they shall inform the court of the protocol they will follow for the taking of those depositions. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 09/28/2020.(LMR)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER: Noting #66 "Joint Motion in Compliance with Order Informing Possible Dates for Corporate Depositions." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 7/17/2020. (MPL)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Joint Motion In Compliance with Order Informing Possible Dates for Corporate Depositions filed by Ivy Mercado-Ramos on behalf of Luxury Hotels International of Puerto Rico Responses due by 7/31/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Mercado-Ramos, Ivy)
July 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER: Noting #64 "Third Joint Motion in Compliance with Order Submitting Status Report." The recent easement in the lockdown orders allows for the parties to move the case forward. Not later than July 17, 2020, the parties shall confer and inform the court of possible dates for the taking of the corporate depositions, either by video teleconferencing or any other method that safeguards the health of the parties and counsel. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 7/3/2020. (MPL)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Joint Motion In Compliance with Order Submitting Status Report filed by Ivy Mercado-Ramos on behalf of Luxury Hotels International of Puerto Rico & All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 7/15/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Mercado-Ramos, Ivy) Modified on 7/2/2020 to add filers (rom).
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER: Noting #62 "Second Joint Motion in Compliance with Order Submitting Status Report." Given that the situation related to COVID-19 is ongoing, the parties shall file a further status report on July 1, 2020. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 6/1/2020. (MPL)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Joint Motion In Compliance with Order Submitting Status Report filed by Ivy Mercado-Ramos on behalf of All Parties Responses due by 6/15/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Mercado-Ramos, Ivy) Modified on 6/2/2020 to add filers (mcm).
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER: Noting #60 "Joint Motion in Compliance with Order Submitting Status Report." Given that the situation related to COVID-19 is ongoing, the parties shall file a further status report on June 1, 2020. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 5/4/2020. (MPL)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Joint Motion In Compliance with Order Submitting Status Report filed by Ivy Mercado-Ramos on behalf of Luxury Hotels International of Puerto Rico, All Plaintiffs Responses due by 5/15/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Mercado-Ramos, Ivy) Modified on 5/4/2020 to add filers (rom).
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER: Granting in part #58 "Joint Request for Extension of Time to Conclude Corporate Depositions and File Dispositive Motions." The court cannot anticipate at this time when the situation related to COVID-19 might be more stable, and therefore, when the 30 day period could commence. Instead, the parties shall file a status report on May 1, 2020, informing if any progress has been made as to the corporate depositions and any other advancement in the case. The court will assess the parties' request at that time. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 4/6/2020. (MPL)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Joint MOTION for extension of time until 30 days, to be counted once the lockdown and curfew orders are discontinued, to to conclude corporate depositions and 30 additional days thereafter to file motions for summary judgment filed by Ivy Mercado-Ramos on behalf of Luxury Hotels International of Puerto Rico Responses due by 4/16/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Mercado-Ramos, Ivy)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER: Granting #56 "Modified Joint Partial Statement of Uncontested Facts." The items stipulated on at pages 2-15 of the motion shall be considered uncontested and therefore binding upon the parties. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 3/10/2020. (MPL)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Joint MOTION to Deem Modified Facts as Uncontested filed by Ivy Mercado-Ramos on behalf of Luxury Hotels International of Puerto Rico Responses due by 3/24/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Mercado-Ramos, Ivy)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER: Granting in part and denying in part #54 "Joint Request for Extension of Time to Conclude Corporate Depositions and File Dispositive Motions." See attached. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 02/19/2020. (LMR)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Joint MOTION for extension of time until March 31, 2020 and May 15, 2020 to Conclude Corporate Depositions and File Dispositive Motions filed by Ivy Mercado-Ramos on behalf of Luxury Hotels International of Puerto Rico and All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 3/4/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Mercado-Ramos, Ivy) Modified on 2/20/2020 to add filers (rom).
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER: Granting #52 "Joint Partial Statement of Uncontested Facts." The items stipulated on at pages 2-16 of the motion shall be considered uncontested and therefore binding upon the parties. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 2/4/2020. (MPL)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Joint MOTION to Deem Facts as Uncontested filed by Ivy Mercado-Ramos on behalf of Luxury Hotels International of Puerto Rico d/b/a Ritz-Carlton Hotel Spa & Casino Responses due by 2/18/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Sample WARN Act Letter)(Mercado-Ramos, Ivy)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Minute Entry for Proceedings held before Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez:Telephone Conference held on January 30, 2020. See attached. (MPL)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Joint MOTION Requesting Approval of Stipulations filed by Ivy Mercado-Ramos on behalf of Luxury Hotels International of Puerto Rico d/b/a Ritz-Carlton Hotel Spa & Casino Responses due by 2/12/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Mercado-Ramos, Ivy)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER: Noting #48 "Notice of Appearance." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 11/18/2019. (ebb)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MOTION for Leave to Appear as counsel filed by Raquel Roman-Morales on behalf of Luxury Hotels International of Puerto Rico d/b/a Ritz-Carlton Hotel Spa & Casino Responses due by 12/2/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Roman-Morales, Raquel)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER: Granting #46 "Motion Requesting Leave to Withdraw Legal Representation." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 11/13/2019. (MPL)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney as to Daniel Molina-Lopez filed by Daniel Molina-Lopez on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 11/27/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Molina-Lopez, Daniel)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER: Granting #44 "Joint Request for Extension of Time to Conclude Discovery and File Dispositive Motions." The CMO is modified accordingly: Conclusion of all discovery, except for corporate depositions: January 31, 2020; Corporate depositions: February 28, 2020; Dispositive Motions: March 31, 2020; Oppositions to Dispositive Motions: April 30, 2020; Replies: May 10, 2020; Sur-replies: May 20, 2020. Unless extreme circumstances beyond the parties' reasonable control dictate otherwise, the court is not inclined to grant further extensions. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 11/1/2019. (MPL)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Joint MOTION for extension of time until January 31, 2020 to Conclude Discovery, Except for Corporate Depositions filed by Ivy Mercado-Ramos on behalf of Luxury Hotels International of Puerto Rico d/b/a Ritz-Carlton Hotel Spa & Casino Responses due by 11/15/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Mercado-Ramos, Ivy)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez: Telephone Conference held on 9/25/2019. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 9/25/2019.(EMJ)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER: Granting #41 "Motion Requesting Correction and/or Amendment of Minutes of Emergency Conference." The Minutes of Proceeding shall be amended accordingly. A revised document is attached. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 9/18/2019. (EMJ)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MOTION to Amend/Correct Minutes of Emergency Conference at Dkt. No. 40 Re: #40 Minutes,, filed by Ivy Mercado-Ramos on behalf of Luxury Hotels International of Puerto Rico d/b/a Ritz-Carlton Hotel Spa & Casino Responses due by 10/2/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #40 ) (Mercado-Ramos, Ivy)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez: Emergency Conference held on 9/13/2019. September 24, 2019: Depositions begin; November 15, 2019: Last day for depositions; November 18-23, 2019: Rule 30(b)(6) deposition; January 31, 2020: Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment with supporting materials, including certified English-language translations; March 2, 2020: Plaintiffs' response to Motion for Summary Judgment; March 16, 2020: Defendant's reply; March 30, 2020: Plaintiffs' surreply. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 9/16/2019.(EMJ)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER: An Emergency Conference to discuss the motion filed at Docket No. #38 , its implications, and the measures to be taken to deal with this problem immediately, is hereby set for 9/13/2019 at 4:00 p.m. in Courtroom 3 before Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 09/12/2019.(LMR)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Status of Discovery Proceedings filed by Ivy Mercado-Ramos on behalf of Luxury Hotels International of Puerto Rico d/b/a Ritz-Carlton Hotel Spa & Casino Responses due by 9/25/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Email to Plaintiffs counsel dated April 4, 2019, #2 Exhibit 2, Email to Plaintiffs counsel dated April 11, 2019, #3 Exhibit 3, Email to Plaintiffs counsel dated May 3, 2019, #4 Exhibit 4, Email to Plaintiffs counsel dated August 9, 2019, #5 Exhibit 5, Email to Plaintiffs counsel dated August 13, 2019, #6 Exhibit 6, Email to Plaintiffs counsel dated August 15, 2019, #7 Exhibit 7, Email to Plaintiffs counsel dated August 19, 2019, #8 Exhibit 8, Email from Plaintiffs counsel dated August 19, 2019, #9 Exhibit 9, Email to Plaintiffs counsel dated August 19, 2019, at 10:13 a.m., #10 Exhibit 10, Email to Plaintiffs counsel dated August 19, 2019, at 4:54 p.m., #11 Exhibit 11, Email from Plaintiffs counsel dated August 20, 2019)(Mercado-Ramos, Ivy)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER: Granting #30 "Motion for Protective Order." See Protective Order attached. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 6/5/2019. (LMR)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez:Motion Hearing held on 6/4/2019 re #31 "Urgent Motion to Compel, Reset Discovery and Dispositive Motion Deadlines, and Request for Sanctions." See attached for rulings and deadlines. (LMR)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion to Compel filed by All Plaintiffs Re: #31 Emergency MOTION to Compel , Reset Discovery and Dispositive Motions Deadlines and Request for Sanctions MOTION for Sanctions as to filed by Luxury Hotels International of Puerto Rico d/b/a Ritz-Carlton Hotel Spa & Casino filed by All Plaintiffs. (Marchand-Heredia, Jorge)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER: Granting #33 "Motion for Rescheduling of Hearing." The hearing is hereby reset for Tuesday, June 4, 2019 at 05:00 PM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez.Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 5/30/2019.(EMJ)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MOTION for Hearing Rescheduling filed by Ivy Mercado-Ramos on behalf of Luxury Hotels International of Puerto Rico d/b/a Ritz-Carlton Hotel Spa & Casino Responses due by 6/13/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Mercado-Ramos, Ivy)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER: A hearing to discuss the "Urgent Motion to Compel, Reset Discovery and Dispositive Motion Deadlines, and Request for Sanctions" (Docket No. 31) is hereby set for 6/3/2019 at 5:00 p.m. in Courtroom 3 before Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 5/29/2019.(LMR)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Emergency MOTION to Compel , Reset Discovery and Dispositive Motions Deadlines and MOTION Requesting Sanctions filed by Ivy Mercado-Ramos on behalf of Luxury Hotels International of Puerto Rico d/b/a Ritz-Carlton Hotel Spa & Casino Responses due by 6/7/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Email to Plaintiffs counsel dated April 4, 2019, #2 Exhibit 2: Email to Plaintiffs counsel dated April 11, 2019, #3 Exhibit 3: Email to Plaintiffs counsel dated April 24, 2019, #4 Exhibit 4: Email to Plaintiffs counsel dated May 1, 2019, #5 Exhibit 5: Email to Plaintiffs counsel dated May 3, 2019, #6 Exhibit 6: Email to Plaintiffs counsel dated May 16, 2019, #7 Exhibit 7: Email from Plaintiffs counsel dated May 20, 2019, #8 Exhibit 8: Email to Plaintiffs counsel dated May 21, 2019)(Mercado-Ramos, Ivy). Added MOTION for Sanctions as to on 5/28/2019 (mcm).
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Joint MOTION for Protective Order Approving Stipulation Restricting Disclosure of Confidential and/or Privileged Information filed by Daniel Molina-Lopez on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 5/28/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Confidentiality Agreement and Proposed Order)(Molina-Lopez, Daniel)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER: Granting in part and denying in part #28 "Joint Request for Extension of Time to Conclude Discovery." Plaintiffs' responses to Defendant's Request for Production of Documents due by May 15, 2019. Conclusion of discovery on the issue of liability: August 30, 2019. Dispositive motions: September 30, 2019. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 5/3/2019. (EMJ)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Joint MOTION for extension of time until August 30, 2019 and October 14, 2019 to Conclude Discovery and File Dispositive Motions, respectively filed by Ivy Mercado-Ramos on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 5/17/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Mercado-Ramos, Ivy)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez: Motion Hearing held on 3/22/2019. The motion at Docket No. 17 is DENIED. The motion at Docket No. 18 is GRANTED IN PART. The motion at Docket No. 24, p.3 is DENIED. The motion at Docket NO. 25 is DENIED as MOOT. See attached for deadlines and details. (LMR) Modified on 3/25/2019 to correct date held/filed to 3/22 (mr).
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: The Motion Hearing set for 3/22/2019 at 3:00 p.m. is RESET for 4:00 p.m. in Courtroom 3 before Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez.Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 3/19/2019.(LMR)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION to dismiss with Prejudice Act No. 100 as to All Plaintiffs filed by Ivy Mercado-Ramos on behalf of Luxury Hotels International of Puerto Rico d/b/a Ritz-Carlton Hotel Spa & Casino Responses due by 4/2/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Mercado-Ramos, Ivy)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 REPLY to RESPONSE to Motion to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs Re: #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Luxury Hotels International of Puerto Rico d/b/a Ritz-Carlton Hotel Spa & Casino filed by All Plaintiffs. (Marchand-Heredia, Jorge) Modified on 3/12/2019 as to event (mr).
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: Noting and Granting #22 "Motion In Compliance with Order." The hearing to discuss the motions at Docket Nos. 17 and 18 is RESET for 3/22/2019 at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 3. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 3/4/2019. (LMR)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Motion In Compliance with Order as to 21 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, filed by Ivy Mercado-Ramos on behalf of Luxury Hotels International of Puerto Rico d/b/a Ritz-Carlton Hotel Spa & Casino Responses due by 3/18/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) 21 ) (Mercado-Ramos, Ivy)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: Denying without prejudice #20 "Motion Requesting to Reschedule Argumentative Hearing." Attorney Mercado-Ramos shall confer with opposing counsel to confirm whether the suggested date (March 13, 2019) is an option for all parties. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 2/28/2019. (LMR)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION to Reschedule Hearing filed by Ivy Mercado-Ramos on behalf of Luxury Hotels International of Puerto Rico d/b/a Ritz-Carlton Hotel Spa & Casino Responses due by 3/14/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Mercado-Ramos, Ivy)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re: #17 "Motion to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6)" and #18 "Motion Requesting Modification of Discovery Deadlines." Plaintiffs shall respond by 3/11/2019. The deadline shall be strictly complied with. A hearing to discuss the motions at Docket Nos. 17 and 18 is hereby set for 3/12/2019 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 3 before Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez.Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 2/26/2019.(LMR)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION for Setting Modified Discovery Deadlines filed by Ivy Mercado-Ramos on behalf of Luxury Hotels International of Puerto Rico d/b/a Ritz-Carlton Hotel Spa & Casino Responses due by 3/11/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Mercado-Ramos, Ivy)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Ivy Mercado-Ramos on behalf of Luxury Hotels International of Puerto Rico d/b/a Ritz-Carlton Hotel Spa & Casino Responses due by 3/11/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Mercado-Ramos, Ivy)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #16 MOTION for Setting Modified Discovery Deadlines. ***FILED IN ERROR - Counsel filed the PDF in "legal format". PDF shall be corrected to a 8.5 x 11 "letter format" and re-file.*** (mr)
February 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ***FILED IN ERROR - Counsel filed the PDF in "legal format".*** MOTION for Setting Modified Discovery Deadlines filed by Ivy Mercado-Ramos on behalf of Luxury Hotels International of Puerto Rico d/b/a Ritz-Carlton Hotel Spa & Casino Responses due by 3/11/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Mercado-Ramos, Ivy) Modified on 2/25/2019 (mr).
February 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ***FILED IN ERROR - Counsel filed the PDF in "legal format".*** MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Ivy Mercado-Ramos on behalf of Luxury Hotels International of Puerto Rico d/b/a Ritz-Carlton Hotel Spa & Casino Responses due by 3/11/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Mercado-Ramos, Ivy) Modified on 2/25/2019 (mr).
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: See attached. Deadline for Rule 26 disclosures: February 7, 2019. Deadline to amend the pleadings and to add parties: February 18, 2019. Motion(s) to dismiss or for judgment on the pleadings: February 25, 2019. Conclusion of all discovery (including third party, factual and expert): July 31, 2019. Every 60 days, beginning on March 11, 2019, the parties shall file a Joint Motion informing the court of the status of discovery. Deadline to file motion(s) for summary judgment: August 30, 2019. Opposition(s) thereto: September 30, 2019. Replies and sur-replies will be allowed. They should be submitted without further court authorization not later than five (5) days after filing of the motion they are responding to (i.e. opposition or reply). See Instructions pertaining to documents not in the English Language and courtesy copies. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 1/24/2019. (ebb)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Joint Motion In Compliance with Court Order as to #12 Order, Set Deadlines filed by Ivy Mercado-Ramos on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 2/7/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #12 ) (Mercado-Ramos, Ivy)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: See attached. Joint Proposed Schedule due by 1/24/2019. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 1/14/2019. (ebb)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Denying #10 "Motion Requesting Scheduling Conference." An order for the parties to submit a Joint Proposed Schedule will follow. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 1/14/2019. (EMJ)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION Requesting Scheduling Conference filed by Ivy Mercado-Ramos on behalf of Luxury Hotels International of Puerto Rico d/b/a Ritz-Carlton Hotel Spa & Casino Responses due by 1/25/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Mercado-Ramos, Ivy)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Noting #2 "Rule 7.1 Statement." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/26/2018. (AM)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Marchand-Heredia, Jorge)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Molina-Lopez on behalf of All Defendants (Molina-Lopez, Daniel)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Noting #5 "Motion Submitting Certified Translation of Exhibit B of the Notice of Removal." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/10/2018. (EMJ)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION Submitting Certified Translation of Exhibit B of the Notice of Removal re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Luxury Hotels International of Puerto Rico d/b/a Ritz-Carlton Hotel Spa & Casino filed by Ivy Mercado-Ramos on behalf of Luxury Hotels International of Puerto Rico d/b/a Ritz-Carlton Hotel Spa & Casino Responses due by 10/23/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B: Certified Translation Responsive Pleading)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Mercado-Ramos, Ivy)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Luxury Hotels International of Puerto Rico d/b/a Ritz-Carlton Hotel Spa & Casino re Notice of Docket Text Modification, #1 Notice of Removal, (Mercado-Ramos, Ivy)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order NOTICE re: #1 Notice of Removal. Attorney Mercado was notified via email of the need to notify plaintiffs by regular mail and to file a separate Certificate of Service once notification was completed. (gav)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (arg)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Disclosure Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure filed by Ivy Mercado-Ramos on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 10/9/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Mercado-Ramos, Ivy)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of First Instance of Puerto Rico, Superior Part of Carolina, case number CA2018CV01684. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0104-6072628), filed by Luxury Hotels International of Puerto Rico d/b/a Ritz-Carlton Hotel Spa & Casino. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Complaint and Summons, #2 Exhibit B: Answer to the Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Supplement to Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Category Sheet)(Mercado-Ramos, Ivy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rivera-Pina et al v. Luxury Hotels International of Puerto Rico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isaac V Lopez Diaz
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neydimar Oquendo Rodriguez
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose L Escobar
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elsie Alvarez Rodriguez
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Bruno Ortega
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gracelyn Proctor
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nestor Maldonado Cruzado
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilfredo Rivera Vargas
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose A Figueroa Encarnacion
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Rodriguez Sanchez
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zaida M Claudio Torres
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eduardo Martinez Rivera
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexier Ramos Matos
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zinnia Jimenez
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Vargas Medero
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Braulio de Leon Rodriguez
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Canales Maldonado
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ileana Acevedo
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos J Fontanez De Jesus
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santiago Perez Cruz
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerardo Merced Otero
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javier Murati Rosa
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nomar Marquez Arroyo
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Rivera Rivera
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudio Garcia Febles
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atreyu Rivera Osorio
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felipe J Nieves Santos
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edgardo Jimenez Quinones
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Serrano Rivera
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dionisio Diaz Suarez
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carla C Montalvo Anabitarte
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William A Merced Narvaez
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard de Leon Rodriguez
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David de Jesus Sanchez
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Sosa
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Roman Rivera
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose A Gonzalez Rios
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaime Moux Gonzalez
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Misael J Pagan
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eduvigis Hernandez Alberto
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Malave Fonseca
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emilio A Gabino Severino
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose A Rivera Pina
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel L Semidey Sepulveda
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan C Lopez Rivera
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose M Sanchez Agosto
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria D Lopez Cosme
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mateo Cepeda Romero
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Izquierdo
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amarilis Ortiz Pacheco
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Santiago Rodriguez
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raul Delgado Pagan
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelo Cuevas Tapia
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Berrios Diaz
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Fernandez Souffron
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jocelyn Diaz Melendez
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramona Santana Acosta
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Torres Perez
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruben Rodriguez Jimenez
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luz J Garcia Ortiz
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dolores Rodriguez Feliz
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lizalli Caceres Solis
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Rivera Canales
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana S Toro Ortiz
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glendaly Hernandez Diaz
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Belgica Bautista
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa Rivera Carrion
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos A Diaz Muniz
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Lucas Muoz
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria E Acevedo Rivera
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aurea E Vargas Rodriguez
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Rivas Pimentel
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guillermo E de la Cruz Abreu
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rolando A Lopez Sosa
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Camille Oquendo
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos R Arroyo Vega
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yaneuri Restituyo
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisbeth de Leon Marquez
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan C Romanacce Rodriguez
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milton Gines Ayuso
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salvador Baez Perez
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eva J Pesquera Rodriguez
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leomary Martinez Martinez
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marta Pacheco Arroyo
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enrique Rosa Esquilin
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jafed Escobar Ayala
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard A Chong Valdes
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Vazquez Gonzalez
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin E Sanchez Henriquez
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernesto Middelhof
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yamillie Melendez Rivera
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myriam Garcia Viera
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iraida Rodriguez Soto
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel De La Rosa Meran
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Lugo Cintron
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel A Cruz Medina
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Y Soto Pena
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milagros Rivera Mercado
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Junior J Cedano Nova
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eunice A Rosario Abreu
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Otero Rodriguez
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felix O Ramos Rivera
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Nieves Munoz
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yazmin Pagan Loriga
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose A Vega Cruz
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos M Nina Morban
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen F Bonilla Vallejo
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaime R Cepeda Cruz
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis J Brown Rivera
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny A Gonzalez
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eimy Carrion Marquez
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen L Ruiz
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javier Rodriguez Rodriguez
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Marrero Colon
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cesar R Merced Torres
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Andino Sanchez
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Gonzalez Martinez
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roman Herrera Gonzalez
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Rodriguez Martinez
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esteban G Rios Santana
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yajaira Velez Guzman
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis F Maldonado Flores
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Giovanna Vargas
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos J Del Valle Maldonado
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yanira Davila Gonzalez
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilfredo Garcia Boy
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Migdalia Nieves Figueroa
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yesenia Montes Colon
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Muniz Carasquillo
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Rivera Lebron
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cristian Crisostomo
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Magdalis Gonzalez
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Higginshotham Padilla
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis A Alicea Santos
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernard I Sanchez Bisbal
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan G Borrero Escalera
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marisela Figueroa Vega
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Giovanni Martinez Rios
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose M Martinez Torres
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus G Crespo Vargas
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nubia M Polania Martinez
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Rondon
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Letty Zayas Matta
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Diaz Colon
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette Marcano Betancourt
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zulin Villanueva Orellano
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maribel Mendoza Munayco
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda M Ortiz Ojeda
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Rodriguez Acosta
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noemi Matos Rivera
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iris N Flores Caraballo
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Ramos Serrano
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: America Soriano Gonzalez
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Baptiste
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose A. Rivera-Pina
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Malave-Fonseca
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Bruno-Ortega
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eunice A. Rosario-Abreu
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guillermo E. De la Cruz-Abreu
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iris N. Flores-Caraballo
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javier Rodriguez-Rodriguez
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan C. Romanacce-Rodriguez
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisbeth De Leon-Marquez
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luz J. Garcia-Ortiz
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marisela Figueroa-Vega
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Rivera-Canales
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rolando A. Lopez-Sosa
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruben Rodriguez-Jimenez
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard De Leon-Rodriguez
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emilio A. Gabino-Severino
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis J. Brown-Rivera
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis F. Maldonado-Flores
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maribel Mendoza-Munayco
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Lugo-Cintron
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Rivas-Pimentel
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salvador Baez-Perez
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Muniz-Carasquillo
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda M. Ortiz-Ojeda
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aurea E. Vargas-Rodriguez
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos J. Del Valle-Maldonado
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudio Garcia-Febles
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Nieves-Munoz
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David De Jesus-Sanchez
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dolores Rodriguez-Feliz
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Braulio De Leon-Rodriguez
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santiago Perez-Cruz
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noemi Matos-Rivera
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myriam Garcia-Viera
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mateo Cepeda-Romero
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Fernandez-Souffron
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Y. Soto-Pena
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Letty Zayas-Matta
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Rivera-Rivera
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus G. Crespo-Vargas
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felix O. Ramos-Rivera
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enrique Rosa-Esquilin
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: America Soriano-Gonzalez
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Roman-Rivera
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edgardo Jimenez-Quinones
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernard I. Sanchez-Bisbal
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Andino-Sanchez
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dionisio Diaz-Suarez
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eduvigis Hernandez-Alberto
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerardo Merced-Otero
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isaac V. Lopez-Diaz
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javier Murati-Rosa
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose A. Gonzalez-Rios
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Serrano-Rivera
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neydimar Oquendo-Rodriguez
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa Rivera-Carrion
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William A. Merced-Narvaez
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yesenia Montes-Colon
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Torres-Perez
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roman Herrera-Gonzalez
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raul Delgado-Pagan
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos M. Nina-Morban
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Otero-Rodriguez
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esteban G. Rios-Santana
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaime R. Cepeda-Cruz
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel De La Rosa-Meran
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana S. Toro-Ortiz
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen F. Bonilla-Vallejo
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Vazquez-Gonzalez
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaime Moux-Gonzalez
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose M. Martinez-Torres
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marta Pacheco-Arroyo
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette Marcano-Betancourt
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos A. Diaz-Muniz
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Rodriguez-Sanchez
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cesar R. Merced-Torres
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eimy Carrion-Marquez
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Marrero-Colon
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose L. Escobar
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria D. Lopez-Cosme
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria E. Acevedo-Rivera
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milagros Rivera-Mercado
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milton Gines-Ayuso
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zaida M. Claudio-Torres
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel L. Semidey-Sepulveda
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos R. Arroyo-Vega
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny A. Gonzalez
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin E. Sanchez-Henriquez
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Rodriguez-Acosta
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Higginshotham-Padilla
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Rodriguez-Martinez
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose A. Figueroa-Encarnacion
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose A. Vega-Cruz
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan G. Borrero-Escalera
Represented By: Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia
Represented By: Luis M. Pavia-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luxury Hotels International of Puerto Rico d/b/a Ritz-Carlton Hotel Spa & Casino
Represented By: Ivy Mercado-Ramos
Represented By: Daniel Molina-Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luxury Hotels International of Puerto Rico doing business as Ritz-Carlton Hotel Spa & Casino
Represented By: Daniel Molina-Lopez
Represented By: Raquel Roman-Morales
Represented By: Ivy Mercado-Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?