Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB v. Perez-Cortes et al
Plaintiff: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, D/B/A Christiana Trust, As Indenture Trustee, for the CSMC 2016-PR1 Trust, Mortgage Backed Notes, Series 2016-PR1 and Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB
Defendant: Joshua Nathaniel Bas Pedregueira, Daniel Bas Pedregueira, Jose Rafael Bas Ortiz, Eduardo Bas Ortiz, Fabian Ignacio Aponte Bas, Elvira Bas Ortiz, Wanda Perez Cortes, Danila Sofia Bas Vargas, Jose Antonio Aponte Bas, Wanda Perez-Cortes, Jose Antonio Aponte-Bas, Jose Rafael Bas-Ortiz, Fabian Ignacio Aponte-Bas, Daniel Bas-Pedregueira, Danila Sofia Bas-Vargas, Eduardo Bas-Ortiz, Elvira Bas-Ortiz and Joshua Nathaniel Bas-Pedregueira
Case Number: 3:2018cv01723
Filed: September 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Aida M Delgado-Colon
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2018 Filing 6 Summons by Publication issued as to Fabian Ignacio Aponte-Bas, Jose Antonio Aponte-Bas, Eduardo Bas-Ortiz, Elvira Bas-Ortiz, Jose Rafael Bas-Ortiz, Daniel Bas-Pedregueira, Joshua Nathaniel Bas-Pedregueira, Danila Sofia Bas-Vargas. (Attachments: #1 Summons By publication) (vdm)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Issuance of Summons. Clerk of Court shall issue the proposed summons at ECF No. 4-3. Signed by U.S. District Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 11/6/2018. (wm)
October 31, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Issuance of Summons by publication as to Fabian Ignacio Aponte-Bas, Jose Antonio Aponte-Bas, Eduardo Bas-Ortiz, Elvira Bas-Ortiz, Jose Rafael Bas-Ortiz, Daniel Bas-Pedregueira, Joshua Nathaniel Bas-Pedregueira, Danila Sofia Bas-Vargas filed by Sergio A. Ramirez-De-Arellano on behalf of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB Responses due by 11/14/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sworn Statement, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order for Service by Publication, #3 Exhibit Summons by Publication)(Ramirez-De-Arellano, Sergio)
September 27, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Fabian Ignacio Aponte Bas, Jose Antonio Aponte Bas, Eduardo Bas Ortiz, Elvira Bas Ortiz, Jose Rafael Bas Ortiz, Daniel Bas Pedregueira, Joshua Nathaniel Bas Pedregueira, Danila Sofia Bas Vargas, Wanda Perez Cortes (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
September 27, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (arg)
September 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Fabian Ignacio Aponte Bas, Jose Antonio Aponte Bas, Eduardo Bas Ortiz, Elvira Bas Ortiz, Jose Rafael Bas Ortiz, Daniel Bas Pedregueira, Joshua Nathaniel Bas Pedregueira, Danila Sofia Bas Vargas, Wanda Perez Cortes ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6073956.), filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, D/B/A Christiana Trust, As Indenture Trustee, for the CSMC 2016-PR1 Trust, Mortgage Backed Notes, Series 2016-PR1. Service due by 12/26/2018, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit mortgage note, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Civil Cover Sheet, #12 Category Sheet)(Ramirez-De-Arellano, Sergio)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB v. Perez-Cortes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Nathaniel Bas Pedregueira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Bas Pedregueira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Rafael Bas Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eduardo Bas Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fabian Ignacio Aponte Bas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elvira Bas Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wanda Perez Cortes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danila Sofia Bas Vargas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Antonio Aponte Bas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wanda Perez-Cortes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Antonio Aponte-Bas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Rafael Bas-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fabian Ignacio Aponte-Bas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Bas-Pedregueira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danila Sofia Bas-Vargas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eduardo Bas-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elvira Bas-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Nathaniel Bas-Pedregueira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, D/B/A Christiana Trust, As Indenture Trustee, for the CSMC 2016-PR1 Trust, Mortgage Backed Notes, Series 2016-PR1
Represented By: Sergio A. Ramirez-De-Arellano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB
Represented By: Sergio A. Ramirez-De-Arellano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?