Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, Subscribing to Unplanned Infrastructure Event Insurance, Policy No. B0400W711081 v. OPG Technology Corp.
Plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, Subscribing to Unplanned Infrastructure Event Insurance, Policy No. B0400W711081
Defendant: OPG Technonlogy Corp. and OPG Technology Corp.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01736
Filed: September 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Gustavo A Gelpi
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION to dismiss or to stay proceedings as to Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, Subscribing to Unplanned Infrastructure Event Insurance, Policy No. B0400W711081 filed by Natalia Del Mar Morales-Echeverria on behalf of OPG Technology Corp. Responses due by 12/4/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit D-1, #6 Exhibit D-2, #7 Exhibit D-3, #8 Exhibit D-4, #9 Exhibit E, #10 Exhibit F, #11 Exhibit G, #12 Exhibit H, #13 Exhibit I, #14 Exhibit J, #15 Exhibit K, #16 Exhibit L, #17 Exhibit M)(Morales-Echeverria, Natalia)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Granting as requested #11 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 10/22/2018. (LE)
October 19, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for extension of time until November 22, 2018 to answer the complaint or otherwise plead filed by Natalia Del Mar Morales-Echeverria on behalf of OPG Technology Corp. Responses due by 11/2/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Morales-Echeverria, Natalia)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 10/17/2018. (LE)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 10/17/2018. (LE)
October 17, 2018 Filing 8 Motion to allow Nicholas R. Novak to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number PRX100059568) filed by Francisco J. Colon-Pagan on behalf of Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, Subscribing to Unplanned Infrastructure Event Insurance, Policy No. B0400W711081 Responses due by 10/31/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Colon-Pagan, Francisco)
October 17, 2018 Filing 7 Motion to allow Kari A. Timm to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number PRX100059569) filed by Francisco J. Colon-Pagan on behalf of Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, Subscribing to Unplanned Infrastructure Event Insurance, Policy No. B0400W711081 Responses due by 10/31/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Colon-Pagan, Francisco)
October 4, 2018 Filing 6 STANDING ORDERS: (1) DISCOVERY DISPUTES, (2) COURTESY COPIES, (3) DEPOSITIONS IN CIVIL CASES, (4) CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, (5) COMMUNICATIONS BY COUNSEL OR THEIR STAFF WITH JUDGE GELPI'S CHAMBERS' STAFF, (6) CODE OF CIVILITY.(rom)
October 3, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, Subscribing to Unplanned Infrastructure Event Insurance, Policy No. B0400W711081 upon OPG Technology Corp. served on 10/3/2018, answer due 10/24/2018. (Colon-Pagan, Francisco)
October 2, 2018 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #4 Summons Returned Executed. ***FILED IN ERROR. Counsel to re-file correct PDF.*** (gmm)
October 2, 2018 Filing 4 ***FILED IN ERROR***SUMMONS Returned Executed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, Subscribing to Unplanned Infrastructure Event Insurance, Policy No. B0400W711081 upon OPG Technonlogy Corp. served on 10/2/2018, answer due 10/23/2018. (Colon-Pagan, Francisco) Modified on 10/3/2018 (gmm).
October 1, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to OPG Technonlogy Corp. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm)
October 1, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (arg)
September 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against OPG Technology Corp. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6079661.), filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, Subscribing to Unplanned Infrastructure Event Insurance, Policy No. B0400W711081. Service due by 12/27/2018, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Category Sheet, #6 Summons, #7 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Colon-Pagan, Francisco) Modified on 10/1/2018 to edit text (xi).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, Subscribing to Unplanned Infrastructure Event Insurance, Policy No. B0400W711081 v. OPG Technology Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OPG Technonlogy Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OPG Technology Corp.
Represented By: Natalia Del Mar Morales-Echeverria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, Subscribing to Unplanned Infrastructure Event Insurance, Policy No. B0400W711081
Represented By: Francisco J. Colon-Pagan
Represented By: Kari A. Timm
Represented By: Nicholas R. Novak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?