Rivera-Velazquez v. Wheeler

Plaintiff: Carlos M Rivera-Velazquez and Carlos M. Rivera-Velazquez
Defendant: Andrew Wheeler
Case Number: 3:2018cv01751
Filed: October 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Francisco A Besosa
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carlos M. Rivera-Velazquez upon Andrew Wheeler served on 11/5/2018, answer due 1/4/2019. (ab)
October 24, 2018 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Carlos M. Rivera-Velazquez.(Almodovar-Diaz, Maricarmen)
October 20, 2018 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Carlos M. Rivera-Velazquez.(Almodovar-Diaz, Maricarmen)
October 9, 2018 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Andrew Wheeler, U.S. Attorney General & U.S. Attorneys Office (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
October 9, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa (arg)
October 6, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits SUMMONS (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Almodovar-Diaz, Maricarmen)
October 5, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Maricarmen Almodovar-Diaz on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Almodovar-Diaz, Maricarmen)
October 5, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Complaint filed by Carlos M Rivera-Velazquez (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet) (Almodovar-Diaz, Maricarmen)
October 5, 2018 Filing 4 Payment of Electronic Filing Fee( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6089468.) re #1 Complaint filed by Carlos M Rivera-Velazquez, filed by Carlos M Rivera-Velazquez. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Carlos M Rivera-Velazquez.(Almodovar-Diaz, Maricarmen)
October 5, 2018 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING Civil Cover Sheet (JS44), and Category Sheet not included electronically pursuant to L.Civ.R. 3(a). Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 10/9/2018. (arg)
October 5, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE ELECTRONIC FILING as to 1 Andrew Wheeler COMPLAINT, filed by Carlos M. Rivera-Velazquez re: non-payment of filing fees Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 10/9/2018. (arg)
October 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Carlos M Rivera-Velazquez. Service due by 1/2/2019,(Almodovar-Diaz, Maricarmen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rivera-Velazquez v. Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos M Rivera-Velazquez
Represented By: Maricarmen Almodovar-Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos M. Rivera-Velazquez
Represented By: Maricarmen Almodovar-Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?