Vizcarrondo-Ramirez de Arellano et al v. Telecinco, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Mrs. Joni T Farris, Conjugal Partnership Vizcarrondo Farris and Mr. Jose Alberto Vizcarrondo-Ramirez de Arellano
Defendant: Jane Doe, Insurance Company B, Insurance Company C, Telecinco, Inc., Insurance Company A, Conjugal Partnership Hopgood-Doe, Andres Ramirez de Arellano-Paredes, Jorge Soltero, Conjugal Partnership Soltero-Ramirez de Arellano, Paul Hopgood, Mrs. Josefina Ramirez de Arellano, Hacienda Igualdad, Inc., Hacienda Tres Hermanos, Inc., ARA International, LLC and ERA International Corporation
Case Number: 3:2018cv01753
Filed: October 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Daniel R Dominguez
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2018 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Jorge Soltero served on 12/1/2018, answer due 12/24/2018. (Pico-Rodriguez, Jaime)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #27 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Additionally, the Court understands the preliminary injunction hearing should be held after the Defendants file a response to the Motion for Preliminary Injunction [Docket No. 11]. After all, the Court understands it is in the interest of all to hold the hearing after the opportunity to evaluate the stance of both parties. As such, the preliminary injunction hearing scheduled for December 6, 2018 is hereby vacated sine die. The Court will reschedule after Defendants respond to the Motion for Preliminary Injunction [Docket No. 11]. Answer to Amended Complaint and Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction due December 20, 2018. NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 11/21/2018. (MES)
November 20, 2018 Filing 27 MOTION for Extension of Time until December 20th, 2018 to File Answer to Amended Verified Complaint or Otherwise Plead filed by Reynaldo A. Quintana-Latorre on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 12/4/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Quintana-Latorre, Reynaldo)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: Due to an unforeseeable scheduling conference, the preliminary injunction hearing set for Wednesday, November 28, 2018 at 2:00PM is hereby RESET for Thursday, December 6, 2018 at 2:00PM. At which time, the Court orders that all litigants with decision-making authority be available by telephone. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 11/20/2018.(MES)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER noted #24 INFORMATIVE motion. Plaintiffs shall also make sure to comply with Court order requiring notification of the preliminary injunction hearing date to all Defendants. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 11/8/2018. (MES)
November 7, 2018 Filing 24 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Service of Process filed by Jaime E. Pico-Rodriguez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 11/21/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I)(Pico-Rodriguez, Jaime)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for November 28, 2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Daniel R. Dominguez. PLAINTIFF SHALL NOTIFY DEFENDANTS A COPY OF THE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION MOTION ALONG WITH THIS COURT ORDER. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 11/7/2018. (MES)
November 5, 2018 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Conjugal Partnership Hopgood-Doe served on 11/2/2018, answer due 11/26/2018. (Pico-Rodriguez, Jaime)
November 5, 2018 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Paul Hopgood served on 11/2/2018, answer due 11/26/2018. (Pico-Rodriguez, Jaime)
November 5, 2018 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Conjugal Partnership Soltero-Ramirez de Arellano served on 10/31/2018, answer due 11/21/2018. (Pico-Rodriguez, Jaime)
November 5, 2018 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Josefina Ramirez de Arellano served on 10/31/2018, answer due 11/21/2018. (Pico-Rodriguez, Jaime)
November 5, 2018 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Telecinco, Inc. served on 10/31/2018, answer due 11/21/2018. (Pico-Rodriguez, Jaime)
November 5, 2018 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Hacienda Tres Hermanos, Inc. served on 10/31/2018, answer due 11/21/2018. (Pico-Rodriguez, Jaime)
November 5, 2018 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Hacienda Igualdad, Inc. served on 10/31/2018, answer due 11/21/2018. (Pico-Rodriguez, Jaime)
November 5, 2018 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon ERA International Corporation served on 10/31/2018, answer due 11/21/2018. (Pico-Rodriguez, Jaime)
November 5, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon ARA International, LLC served on 10/31/2018, answer due 11/21/2018. (Pico-Rodriguez, Jaime)
November 5, 2018 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Andres Ramirez de Arellano-Paredes served on 10/31/2018, answer due 11/21/2018. (Pico-Rodriguez, Jaime)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Deadline to serve copy of the preliminary injunction motion is Tuesday, November 6, 2018. After the Court receives confirmation that the Defendants received notification of the motion, the preliminary injunction hearing will be scheduled. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 10/30/2018. (MES)
October 29, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Jaime E. Pico-Rodriguez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 11/13/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pico-Rodriguez, Jaime)
October 25, 2018 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to ARA International, LLC, Conjugal Partnership Hopgood-Doe, Conjugal Partnership Soltero-Ramirez de Arellano, ERA International Corporation, Hacienda Igualdad, Inc., Hacienda Tres Hermanos, Inc., Paul Hopgood, Josefina Ramirez de Arellano, Andres Ramirez de Arellano-Paredes, Jorge Soltero, Telecinco, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Issuance of Summons. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 10/25/2018. (MES)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Carlos A. Lazaro-Castro terminated. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 10/25/2018. (MES)
October 24, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Issuance of Summons on an Expedited Basis as to All Defendants filed by Jaime E. Pico-Rodriguez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 11/7/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Pico-Rodriguez, Jaime)
October 24, 2018 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Conjugal Partnership Vizcarrondo Farris, Joni T Farris, Jose Alberto Vizcarrondo-Ramirez de Arellano.(Paula, Carlos)
October 24, 2018 Filing 5 Joint MOTION to Withdraw from Legal Representation and Notifying New Attorneys for the Plaintiffs Attorney as to Carlos R. Paula filed by Carlos R. Paula on behalf of Jose Alberto Vizcarrondo-Ramirez de Arellano Responses due by 11/7/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Paula, Carlos)
October 11, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Conjugal Partnership Hopgood-Doe, Conjugal Partnership Soltero-Ramirez de Arellano, Paul Hopgood, Josefina Ramirez de Arellano, Andres Ramirez de Arellano-Paredes, Jorge Soltero, Telecinco, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
October 11, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Daniel R. Dominguez. (Filing Fee $400.00, Receipt Number 0104-6094618) (arg)
October 9, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE ELECTRONIC FILING as to 1 Telecinco, Inc., et.al., COMPLAINT, filed by Jose A. Vizcarrondo-Ramirez De Arrellano, et.al., re: non-payment of filing fees Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 10/10/2018. (arg)
October 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs, filed by Conjugal Partnership Vizcarrondo Farris, Joni T Farris, Jose Alberto Vizcarrondo-Ramirez de Arellano. Service due by 1/4/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet Category Sheet, #3 Summons Andres Ramirez de Arelllano, #4 Summons Conjugal Partnership Hopgood-Doe, #5 Summons Jorge Soltero, #6 Summons Josefina Ramirez de Arellano, #7 Summons Paul Hopgood, #8 Summons Conjugal Partnership Soltero-Ramirez de Arellano, #9 Summons Telecinco, Inc.)(Lazaro-Castro, Carlos)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vizcarrondo-Ramirez de Arellano et al v. Telecinco, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance Company B
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance Company C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Telecinco, Inc.
Represented By: Reynaldo A. Quintana-Latorre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance Company A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Hopgood-Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andres Ramirez de Arellano-Paredes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jorge Soltero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Soltero-Ramirez de Arellano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Hopgood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mrs. Josefina Ramirez de Arellano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hacienda Igualdad, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hacienda Tres Hermanos, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARA International, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERA International Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mrs. Joni T Farris
Represented By: Carlos A. Lazaro-Castro
Represented By: Carlos R. Paula
Represented By: Jaime E. Pico-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Vizcarrondo Farris
Represented By: Carlos A. Lazaro-Castro
Represented By: Carlos R. Paula
Represented By: Jaime E. Pico-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Jose Alberto Vizcarrondo-Ramirez de Arellano
Represented By: Carlos A. Lazaro-Castro
Represented By: Carlos R. Paula
Represented By: Jaime E. Pico-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?