USA v. $7,600.00 in U.S. Currency

Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: $7,600.00 in U.S. Currency
Case Number: 3:2018cv01756
Filed: October 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Gustavo A Gelpi
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2018 Filing 8 Warrant of Arrest in Rem Issued to arrest property as to $7,600.00 in U.S. Currency. (Attachments: #1 Warrant in Rem) (vdm) Modified on 10/17/2018 to edit docket text (gmm).
October 15, 2018 Filing 7 JUDGMENT is hereby entered STAYING the proceedings until the criminal proceedings conclude. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 10/15/2018. (gmm)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Granting #3 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 10/15/2018. (MET)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Granting #2 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 10/15/2018. (MET)
October 10, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (arg)
October 9, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Stay Civil Forfeiture Proceedings filed by Maritza Gonzalez-Rivera on behalf of USA Responses due by 10/23/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Gonzalez-Rivera, Maritza)
October 9, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem filed by Maritza Gonzalez-Rivera on behalf of USA Responses due by 10/23/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gonzalez-Rivera, Maritza)
October 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture In Rem against $7,600.00 in U.S. Currency, filed by USA. Service due by 1/7/2019, (Attachments: #1 Unsworn Declaration, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Sheet)(Gonzalez-Rivera, Maritza)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. $7,600.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Maritza Gonzalez-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $7,600.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?