Ortiz v. The Cogar Group LTD

Plaintiff: Ana Ortiz
Defendant: The Cogar Group LTD
Case Number: 3:2018cv01761
Filed: October 10, 2018
Court: Puerto Rico District Court
Presiding Judge: Daniel R Dominguez
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:754
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 21, 2018 7 Featured Case ORDER: Initial Scheduling Conference set for Tuesday, January 25, 2019 at 2:00 PM in DRDs Chambers before Judge Daniel R. Dominguez. The Initial Scheduling Conference Memoranda is due by January 5, 2019. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 11/21/2018. (MES)
November 21, 2018 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Maria Elisa Echenique-Arana on behalf of Defendant The Cogar Group LTD.(Echenique-Arana, Maria)
November 6, 2018 5 Featured Case ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer deadline due by November 21, 2018. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 11/6/2018. (MES)
November 6, 2018 4 MOTION for Extension of Time until November 21, 2018 to File Answer to the Complaint or Otherwise Plead re: #1 Complaint filed by Ana Ortiz filed by Ana B. Rosado-Frontanes on behalf of The Cogar Group LTD Responses due by 11/20/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Rosado-Frontanes, Ana)
October 11, 2018 3 Summons Issued as to The Cogar Group LTD. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm)
October 11, 2018 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Daniel R. Dominguez (arg)
October 10, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against The Cogar Group LTD ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6094758.), filed by Ana Ortiz. Service due by 1/8/2019, (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Sheet)(Duran-Rodriguez, Manuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortiz v. The Cogar Group LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Ortiz
Represented By: Manuel Duran-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cogar Group LTD
Represented By: Ana B. Rosado-Frontanes
Represented By: Maria Elisa Echenique-Arana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?