Asencio Plaza v. Monsanto Caribe, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Jessica Asencio Plaza
Defendant: Monsanto Caribe, LLC and Advance Services Professional, Inc
Case Number: 3:2018cv01778
Filed: October 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2018 Filing 12 Supplemental Motion Tendering Additional Certified Translations re: #10 MOTION Submitting Certified Translation re: #8 Motion In Compliance with 28 U.S.C. sec. 1446(d) filed by Monsanto Caribe, LLC, #1 Notice of Removal filed by Monsanto Caribe, LLC filed by Aurivette Deliz-Delgado on behalf of Monsanto Caribe, LLC Responses due by 12/4/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified English Translation)(Related document(s) #10 ) (Deliz-Delgado, Aurivette) Modified on 11/21/2018 edit text (gav).
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER noted #10 Motion submitting Signed by Judge William G. Young on 11/15/2018. (EES)
November 9, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION Submitting Certified Translation re: #8 Motion In Compliance with 28 U.S.C. sec. 1446(d) filed by Monsanto Caribe, LLC, #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,, filed by Monsanto Caribe, LLC filed by Aurivette Deliz-Delgado on behalf of Monsanto Caribe, LLC Responses due by 11/26/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified English Translation Docket 1-1, #2 Exhibit Certified English Translation Docket 1-2, #3 Exhibit Certified English Translation Docket 1-3, #4 Exhibit Certified English Translation Docket 1-4, #5 Exhibit Certified English Translation Docket 1-5, #6 Exhibit Certified English Translation Docket 1-6, #7 Exhibit Certified English Translation Docket 1-7, #8 Exhibit Certified English Translation Docket 1-8, #9 Exhibit Certified English Translation Docket 1-9, #10 Exhibit Certified English Translation Docket 1-10, #11 Exhibit Certified English Translation Docket 1-11, #12 Exhibit Certified English Translation Docket 1-12, #13 Exhibit Certified English Translation Docket 1-13, #14 Exhibit Certified English Translation Docket 1-14, #15 Exhibit Certified English Translation Docket 1-15, #16 Exhibit Certified English Translation Docket 1-16, #17 Exhibit Certified English Translation Docket 1-17, #18 Exhibit Certified English Translation Docket 1-18, #19 Exhibit Certified English Translation Docket 1-19, #20 Exhibit Certified English Translation Docket 1-20, #21 Exhibit Certified English Translation Docket 1-21, #22 Exhibit Certified English Translation Docket 1-22, #23 Exhibit Certified English Translation Docket 1-24, #24 Exhibit Certified English Translation Docket 8-6)(Related document(s) #8 , #1 ) (Deliz-Delgado, Aurivette)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Joinder; noted #8 Motion In Compliance Signed by Judge William G. Young on 11/6/2018. (EES)
October 23, 2018 Filing 8 Motion In Compliance with 28 U.S.C. sec. 1446(d) filed by Aurivette Deliz-Delgado on behalf of Monsanto Caribe, LLC Responses due by 11/6/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice to Plaintiff's local counsel, #2 Exhibit Notice to co-defendant's local counsel, #3 Exhibit Notice to co-defendant's local counsel, #4 Exhibit Evidence of receipt, #5 Exhibit Evidence of receipt, #6 Exhibit SUMAC Filing receipt)(Deliz-Delgado, Aurivette)
October 17, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Joinder MONSANTO CARIBE LLC REQUEST FOR REMOVAL Re: #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,, filed by Monsanto Caribe, LLC filed by Jessica E. Mendez-Colberg on behalf of Advance Services Professional, Inc Responses due by 10/31/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Mendez-Colberg, Jessica)
October 17, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica E. Mendez-Colberg on behalf of Advance Services Professional, Inc (Mendez-Colberg, Jessica)
October 17, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Rolando Emmanuelli-Jimenez on behalf of Advance Services Professional, Inc (Emmanuelli-Jimenez, Rolando)
October 17, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge William G. Young (arg)
October 16, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Aurivette Deliz-Delgado on behalf of Monsanto Caribe, LLC (Deliz-Delgado, Aurivette)
October 16, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents filed by Elaine Marie Maldonado-Matias on behalf of Monsanto Caribe, LLC Responses due by 10/30/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Maldonado-Matias, Elaine)
October 16, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Puerto Rico Court of First Instance in Ponce, case number PO2018CV00955. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0104-6103910), filed by Monsanto Caribe, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Commonwealth Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit Informative Motion filed before the Commonwealth Court, #3 Exhibit Summons Commonwealth Court Monsanto Caribe, LLC, #4 Exhibit Summons Commonwealth Court Advance Services Professional, Inc., #5 Exhibit Informative Motion regarding Service of Summons Commonwealth Court, #6 Exhibit Answer to the Complaint filed by Advance Services Professional, Inc., #7 Exhibit Notice of Appearance E. Maldonado, #8 Exhibit Motion requesting denial of expedited process, #9 Exhibit Answer to the Complaint filed by Monsanto Caribe, LLC, #10 Exhibit Notice of Appearance A.Deliz, #11 Exhibit Notice of Appearance J. Mndez, #12 Exhibit Notice of Appearance R. Emmanuelli, #13 Exhibit Notification, #14 Exhibit Notification, #15 Exhibit Notification, #16 Exhibit Notification, #17 Exhibit Notification, #18 Exhibit Notification, #19 Exhibit Notification, #20 Exhibit Notification, #21 Exhibit Commonwealth Case Electronic Docket Report, #22 Exhibit Service of Process Monsanto Caribe, LLC, #23 Exhibit Email regarding Advance Services Professional, Inc. consent to remove the Commonwealth Case, #24 Exhibit Motion to the Commonwealth Court regarding the Notice of Removal, #25 Civil Cover Sheet, #26 Category Sheet)(Maldonado-Matias, Elaine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Asencio Plaza v. Monsanto Caribe, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Caribe, LLC
Represented By: Elaine Marie Maldonado-Matias
Represented By: Aurivette Deliz-Delgado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advance Services Professional, Inc
Represented By: Jessica E. Mendez-Colberg
Represented By: Rolando Emmanuelli-Jimenez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Asencio Plaza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?