Siembra Finca Carmen, LLC

Plaintiff: Siembra Finca Carmen, LLC
Defendant: Carlos Flores-Ortega and Jesus Santiago-Olivero
Case Number: 3:2018cv01783
Filed: October 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Carmen C Cerezo
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:2321
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for extension of time until December 18, 2018 to Answer Amended Complaint or otherwise plead and file response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Idza Diaz-Rivera on behalf of Carlos Flores-Ortega, Jesus Santiago-Olivero Responses due by 11/26/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Diaz-Rivera, Idza)
November 1, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Siembra Finca Carmen, LLC upon Jesus Santiago-Olivero served on 10/25/2018, answer due 11/15/2018. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Cruz-Maisonave, Liz)
November 1, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Siembra Finca Carmen, LLC upon Carlos Flores-Ortega served on 10/25/2018, answer due 11/15/2018. (Cruz-Maisonave, Liz)
October 18, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Herman G. Colberg-Guerra on behalf of Siembra Finca Carmen, LLC (Colberg-Guerra, Herman)
October 18, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance filed by Nestor Mendez-Gomez on behalf of Siembra Finca Carmen, LLC. Responses due by 11/1/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Mendez-Gomez, Nestor) Modified event on 10/19/2018 (idg).
October 18, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Carlos Flores-Ortega, Jesus Santiago-Olivero. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm)
October 18, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Carmen C. Cerezo (arg)
October 17, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Liz Arelis Cruz-Maisonave on behalf of Siembra Finca Carmen, LLC Responses due by 10/31/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Cruz-Maisonave, Liz)
October 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Carlos Flores-Ortega, Jesus Santiago-Olivero ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6106037.), filed by Siembra Finca Carmen, LLC. Service due by 1/15/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Summons Carlos Flores-Ortega, #18 Summons Jesus Santiago-Olivero, #19 Summons Wanda Vazquez)(Cruz-Maisonave, Liz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Siembra Finca Carmen, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Flores-Ortega
Represented By: Idza Diaz-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesus Santiago-Olivero
Represented By: Idza Diaz-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Siembra Finca Carmen, LLC
Represented By: Liz Arelis Cruz-Maisonave
Represented By: Nestor Mendez-Gomez
Represented By: Herman G. Colberg-Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?