Air-Con, Inc. v. Daikin Applied Latin America LLC

Plaintiff: Air-Con, Inc.
Defendant: Daikin Applied Latin America LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv01800
Filed: October 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Gustavo A Gelpi
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Noted #15 Motion Submitting. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 12/21/2018. (LE)
December 20, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION Submitting Certified Translation of Exhibits to Notice of Removal (Docket No. 1) filed by Mauricio O. Muniz-Luciano on behalf of Daikin Applied Latin America LLC Responses due by 1/3/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certified Translation, #2 Exhibit B - Certified Translation, #3 Exhibit C - Certified Translation, #4 Exhibit D - Certified Translation, #5 Exhibit E - Certified Translation, #6 Exhibit F - Certified Translation, #7 Exhibit G - Certified Translation, #8 Exhibit H - Certified Translation, #9 Exhibit I - Certified Translation, #10 Exhibit J - Certified Translation, #11 Exhibit K - Certified Translation, #12 Exhibit L - Certified Translation, #13 Exhibit M - Certified Translation, #14 Exhibit N - Certified Translation, #15 Exhibit O - Certified Translation, #16 Exhibit P - Certified Translation, #17 Exhibit Q - Certified Translation, #18 Exhibit R - Certified Translation, #19 Exhibit S - Certified Translation, #20 Exhibit T - Certified Translation, #21 Exhibit U - Certified Translation, #22 Exhibit V - Certified Translation, #23 Exhibit W - Certified Translation, #24 Exhibit X - Certified Translation, #25 Exhibit Y - Certified Translation, #26 Exhibit Z - Certified Translation, #27 Exhibit AA - Certified Translation, #28 Exhibit BB - Certified Translation, #29 Exhibit CC - Certified Translation, #30 Exhibit DD - Certified Translation, #31 Exhibit EE - Certified Translation, #32 Exhibit FF - Certified Translation, #33 Exhibit GG - Certified Translation, #34 Exhibit HH - Certified Translation, #35 Exhibit II - Certified Translation, #36 Exhibit JJ - Certified Translation, #37 Exhibit KK - Certified Translation, #38 Exhibit LL - Certified Translation, #39 Exhibit MM - Certified Translation, #40 Exhibit NN - Certified Translation, #41 Exhibit OO - Certified Translation, #42 Exhibit PP - Certified Translation, #43 Exhibit QQ - Certified Translation, #44 Exhibit RR - Certified Translation, #45 Exhibit SS - Certified Translation)(Related document(s) 14 ) (Muniz-Luciano, Mauricio) Modified on 12/21/2018 to edit docket text (ab).
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Granting as requested #12 Motion for extension of time. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 12/17/2018. (AGF)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Granting as requested #11 Motion for extension of time. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 12/17/2018. (AGF)
December 14, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for extension of time until December 26, 2018 to submit certified translations of exhibits of Docket No. 1 filed by Mauricio O. Muniz-Luciano on behalf of Daikin Applied Latin America LLC Responses due by 12/28/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Muniz-Luciano, Mauricio)
December 14, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for extension of time until December 31, 2018 to reply to Motion to Dismiss to Compel Arbitration filed by Vanessa Medina-Romero on behalf of Air-Con, Inc. Responses due by 12/28/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Medina-Romero, Vanessa)
December 3, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss to Compel Arbitration as to Air-Con, Inc. filed by Mauricio O. Muniz-Luciano on behalf of Daikin Applied Latin America LLC Responses due by 12/17/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Muniz-Luciano, Mauricio) Modified on 12/4/2018 to edit docket text and remove duplicated event (gmm).
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Granting as requested #8 Motion for extension of time. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 11/20/2018. (AGF)
November 14, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for extension of time until December 14, 2018 to submit certified translations of exhibits to Docket No. 1 filed by Mauricio O. Muniz-Luciano on behalf of Daikin Applied Latin America LLC Responses due by 11/28/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Muniz-Luciano, Mauricio)
November 5, 2018 Filing 7 STANDING ORDERS: (1) DISCOVERY DISPUTES, (2) COURTESY COPIES, (3) DEPOSITIONS IN CIVIL CASES, (4) CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, (5) COMMUNICATIONS BY COUNSEL OR THEIR STAFF WITH JUDGE GELPI'S CHAMBERS' STAFF, (6) CODE OF CIVILITY.(gmm)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Granting as requested #5 Motion for extension of time. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 11/5/2018. (AGF)
November 2, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for extension of time until Monday, December 3, 2018 to answer the Second Amended Complaint or otherwise plead filed by Mauricio O. Muniz-Luciano on behalf of Daikin Applied Latin America LLC Responses due by 11/16/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Muniz-Luciano, Mauricio)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Granting #2 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Granted until November 15, 2018. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 10/25/2018. (MET)
October 25, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (arg)
October 24, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Extension of Time until December 1, 2018 to file certified translation of exhibits to Notice of Removal filed by Mauricio O. Muniz-Luciano on behalf of Daikin Applied Latin America LLC Responses due by 11/7/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Muniz-Luciano, Mauricio)
October 24, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Commonwealth of PR, Court of First Instance, San Juan Part, case number SJ2018CV05593. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0104-6115912), filed by Daikin Applied Latin America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit O, #18 Exhibit P, #19 Exhibit Q, #20 Exhibit R, #21 Exhibit S, #22 Exhibit T, #23 Exhibit U, #24 Exhibit V, #25 Exhibit W, #26 Exhibit X, #27 Exhibit Y, #28 Exhibit Z, #29 Exhibit AA, #30 Exhibit BB, #31 Exhibit CC, #32 Exhibit DD, #33 Exhibit EE, #34 Exhibit FF, #35 Exhibit GG, #36 Exhibit HH, #37 Exhibit II, #38 Exhibit JJ, #39 Exhibit KK, #40 Exhibit LL, #41 Exhibit MM, #42 Exhibit NN, #43 Exhibit OO, #44 Exhibit PP, #45 Exhibit QQ, #46 Exhibit RR, #47 Exhibit SS)(Muniz-Luciano, Mauricio)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Air-Con, Inc. v. Daikin Applied Latin America LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daikin Applied Latin America LLC
Represented By: Mauricio O. Muniz-Luciano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Air-Con, Inc.
Represented By: Rafael M. Santiago-Rosa
Represented By: Vanessa Medina-Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?