Encore Benefit Management, Inc. v. Phoenix Benefits Management, LLC

Petitioner: Encore Benefit Management, Inc.
Respondent: Phoenix Benefits Management, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv01821
Filed: November 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Jay A Garcia-Gregory
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Strike Incorrect filing at Re: #5 MOTION to Dismiss Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendant Phoenix Benefit Management LLCS Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Consolidate as to Phoenix Benefits Management, LLC filed by Raul S. Mariani-Franco on behalf of Phoenix Benefits Management, LLC Responses due by 12/5/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #5 ) (Mariani-Franco, Raul) Modified on 11/26/2018 to correct all caps text. (mg).
November 21, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendant Phoenix Benefit Management LLCS Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Consolidate as to Encore Benefit Management, Inc. filed by Raul S. Mariani-Franco on behalf of Phoenix Benefits Management, LLC Responses due by 12/5/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Mariani-Franco, Raul) Modified on 11/26/2018 to correct all caps text. (mg).
November 21, 2018 Filing 5 ***FILED IN ERROR. Incomplete pdf. Document was re-filed in D.E. #[6 ].***. MOTION to Dismiss Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendant Phoenix Benefit Management LLCS Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Consolidate as to Phoenix Benefits Management, LLC filed by Raul S. Mariani-Franco on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 12/5/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Mariani-Franco, Raul) Modified on 11/26/2018 to correct all caps text & filed in error. (mg).
November 2, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory (arg)
November 1, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Amended) (Mariani-Franco, Raul)
November 1, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents filed by Raul S. Mariani-Franco on behalf of Phoenix Benefits Management, LLC Responses due by 11/15/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Mariani-Franco, Raul)
November 1, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from First Instance of San Juan, case number SJ2018Cv07069. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0104-6129092), filed by Phoenix Benefits Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Sheet)(Mariani-Franco, Raul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Encore Benefit Management, Inc. v. Phoenix Benefits Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Phoenix Benefits Management, LLC
Represented By: Raul S. Mariani-Franco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Encore Benefit Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?