Mercado-Castillo v. Department of Veterans Affairs et al

Plaintiff: Wilfredo Mercado-Castillo
Defendant: Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of Justice and David J. Shulkin
Case Number: 3:2018cv01828
Filed: November 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Carmen C Cerezo
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon All Defendants. (Cobo-Estrella, Humberto)
November 30, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs as to US Attorney's Office on 11/15/2018. (Cobo-Estrella, Humberto) Modified event on 12/4/2018 (idg).
November 5, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of Justice & U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
November 5, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Carmen C. Cerezo (arg)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6131231.), filed by Wilfredo Mercado-Castillo. Service due by 1/31/2019, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons US Attorney General, #4 Summons PR Office US Attorney General, #5 Summons US Department of Veterans Affairs)(Cobo-Estrella, Humberto)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mercado-Castillo v. Department of Veterans Affairs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilfredo Mercado-Castillo
Represented By: Humberto F. Cobo-Estrella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Veterans Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David J. Shulkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?