Rivera-Rodriguez v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Adelina Rivera Rodriguez and Adelina Rivera-Rodriguez
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2018cv01843
Filed: November 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Silvia Carreno-Coll
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2018 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: By Order of Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (Docket No. 7), this case has been randomly assigned within the Case Assignment System to Magistrate Judge Silvia Carreno-Coll for all further proceedings, including the entry of judgment and all post-trial proceedings. All further pleadings shall bear only the initials of the Magistrate Judge next to the case number: Civil No. 18-1843(SCC). Judge Delgado-Colon is no longer assigned to this case. Signed by Clerk on 11/15/2018. (gr)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #4 Consent to Proceed before Magistrate Judge filed by Adelina Rivera-Rodriguez. In view of the parties' consent the case is referred to a U.S. Magistrate Judge to conduct all further proceedings including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings. Signed by U.S. District Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 11/14/2018.(wm)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by U.S. District Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 11/14/2018. (wm)
November 7, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to U.S. District Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (ad)
November 6, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Pedro G. Cruz-Sanchez on behalf of Adelina Rivera Rodriguez (Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro)
November 6, 2018 Filing 4 CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Adelina Rivera Rodriguez. (Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro)
November 6, 2018 Filing 3 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Adelina Rivera Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro)
November 6, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Pedro G. Cruz-Sanchez on behalf of Adelina Rivera Rodriguez Responses due by 11/20/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro)
November 6, 2018 Filing 1 **SELECTED PARTY** FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Adelina Rivera Rodriguez. (Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rivera-Rodriguez v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adelina Rivera Rodriguez
Represented By: Pedro G. Cruz-Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adelina Rivera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Pedro G. Cruz-Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?