Colon Torres v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: William Colon Torres and William Colon-Torres
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2018cv01850
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Bruce J McGiverin
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2018 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: By Order of Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (Docket No. 6), this case has been reassigned within the Case Assignment System to Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin to conduct all further proceedings, including the entry of judgment. All further pleadings shall bear only the initials of the Magistrate Judge next to the case number: Civil No. 18-1850(BJM). Judge Gelpi is no longer assigned to this case. Signed by Clerk on 11/14/2018. (gr)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Plaintiff and the commissioner have consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. Accordingly, this case is hereby referred to Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin for all further proceedings, including entry of judgment as per 28 U.S. Code 636. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 11/13/2018. (AGF)
November 13, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to U.S. District Chief Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (ad)
November 9, 2018 Filing 5 CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE by William Colon Torres. (Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro)
November 9, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Pedro G. Cruz-Sanchez on behalf of William Colon Torres (Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro)
November 9, 2018 Filing 3 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by William Colon Torres. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro)
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Pedro G. Cruz-Sanchez on behalf of William Colon Torres Responses due by 11/26/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 **SELECTED PARTY** FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by William Colon Torres. (Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colon Torres v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Colon Torres
Represented By: Pedro G. Cruz-Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Colon-Torres
Represented By: Pedro G. Cruz-Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?