Reverse Mortgage Solutions, Inc. v. Cintron-Rios et al

Plaintiff: Reverse Mortgage Solutions, Inc.
Defendant: United States of America, Isabel Brunet-Cuevas, Eloy Cintron-Rios and Conjugal Partnership Cintron-Brunet
Case Number: 3:2018cv01852
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: Puerto Rico District Court
Presiding Judge: Pedro A Delgado-Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 12:191
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 26, 2018 6 Featured Case ORDER: Granting #3 "Motion requesting Order." The amended complaint shall be electronically filed forthwith. Foreclosures are brought in this district under diversity jurisdiction. Pursuant to Puerto Rico law, an estate does not have juridical personality, and all heirs must be included in suits against an estate. In par 2 of the motion at Docket No. 3, plaintiff informs that it has has identified alleged members of Estate of Eloy Cintron Rios, but will include in the Amended Complaint "John Doe" and "Jane Doe" as members of the Estate. The majority view is that John Does destroy diversity jurisdiction because courts cannot ascertain that complete diversity exists. Furthermore, plaintiff has not met its burden of showing that it has included all heirs by providing a will, or in the absence of a will, a judicial declaration of heirship, in order for the court to ascertain the identities of all the heirs, and whether it had jurisdiction over this case. Thus, not later than January 30, 2019, plaintiff shall either (1) submit a certified copy of a will, or a negative certification of will along with a judicial declaration of heirship, all in the English language, (2) show whether another source for jurisdiction exists, or otherwise (3) show cause why the case should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 12/26/2018. (LMR)
December 12, 2018 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Reverse Mortgage Solutions, Inc. upon USA served on 11/27/2018, answer due 1/28/2019. (Hernandez-Hernandez, Valerie) Modified on 12/13/2018 to correct docket text as to date/party served (mr).
December 12, 2018 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Reverse Mortgage Solutions, Inc. upon Isabel Brunet-Cuevas served on 11/27/2018, answer due 12/18/2018. (Hernandez-Hernandez, Valerie)
December 12, 2018 3 MOTION requesting Order for leave to amend complaint filed by Valerie N. Hernandez-Hernandez on behalf of Reverse Mortgage Solutions, Inc. Responses due by 12/26/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hernandez-Hernandez, Valerie)
November 13, 2018 2 Summons Issued as to Isabel Brunet-Cuevas, Eloy Cintron-Rios, Conjugal Partnership Cintron-Brunet, United States of America (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ad)
November 13, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to U.S. District Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (ad)
November 9, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6142400.), filed by Reverse Mortgage Solutions, Inc.. Service due by 2/7/2019, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Mortgage, #2 Exhibit Deed, #3 Exhibit Title, #4 Exhibit SCRA, #5 Exhibit SCRA, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Category Sheet, #8 Summons USA, #9 Summons Conjugal Partnership, #10 Summons Eloy, #11 Summons Isabel)(Hernandez-Hernandez, Valerie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reverse Mortgage Solutions, Inc. v. Cintron-Rios et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isabel Brunet-Cuevas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eloy Cintron-Rios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Cintron-Brunet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reverse Mortgage Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Valerie N. Hernandez-Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?