Ortiz et al v. Universal Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Jose Alvarez and Mary Lou Ortiz
Defendant: QUINTANA HERMANOS, INC, DOES I-X, Victor Vazquez-Perez, Universal Insurance Company and XYZ Insurance Companies
Case Number: 3:2018cv01905
Filed: November 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Jay A Garcia-Gregory
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER (i) granting Attorney Miguel G. Laffitte's Motions for Leave to Appear at Docket Nos. #8 ; #12 ; and (ii) finding as moot Defendants' Motions for Extension of Time at Docket Nos. #9 ; #13 in light of this Court's Order at Docket No. 17. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 1/25/2019. (JG)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #11 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to substitute a party name in the Complaint and requesting issuance of summons. The Clerk of Court shall take notice. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 1/25/2019. (JG)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #14 Defendants' Motion for extension of time. Answer to the Complaint due by 2/1/2019. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 1/25/2019. (JG)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Plaintiffs' Motion to Withdraw Document filed at Docket No. 10. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 1/25/2019. (JG)
January 25, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Withdraw Document re: #10 MOTION for Default Entry as to Victor Vazquez-Perez filed by Mary Lou Ortiz, Jose Alvarez filed by Christopher A. Davila-Rodriguez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 2/8/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #10 ) (Davila-Rodriguez, Christopher)
January 24, 2019 Filing 14 Second MOTION for extension of time until February 1, 2019 to File Answer to the Complaint filed by Miguel G. Laffitte on behalf of Quintana Hermanos, Inc, Victor Vazquez-Perez Responses due by 2/7/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Laffitte, Miguel)
January 18, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time until January 24, 2019 to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, filed by Mary Lou Ortiz, Jose Alvarez filed by Miguel G. Laffitte on behalf of Victor Vazquez-Perez Responses due by 2/1/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Laffitte, Miguel)
January 18, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear filed by Miguel G. Laffitte on behalf of Victor Vazquez-Perez Responses due by 2/1/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Laffitte, Miguel)
January 17, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to File Document to Amend the Complaint to Substitute Party Name and Requesting Issuance of Summons filed by Christopher A. Davila-Rodriguez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 1/31/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Summons)(Davila-Rodriguez, Christopher)
January 16, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Default Entry as to Victor Vazquez-Perez filed by Christopher A. Davila-Rodriguez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 1/30/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Davila-Rodriguez, Christopher)
December 31, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time until January 24, 2019 to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, filed by Mary Lou Ortiz, Jose Alvarez filed by Miguel G. Laffitte on behalf of QUINTANA HERMANOS, INC Responses due by 1/14/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Laffitte, Miguel)
December 31, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear filed by Miguel G. Laffitte on behalf of QUINTANA HERMANOS, INC Responses due by 1/14/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Laffitte, Miguel)
December 20, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice Against Universal Insurance Company Pursusnt to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A) by Jose Alvarez, Mary Lou Ortiz (Davila-Rodriguez, Christopher)
December 18, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon QUINTANA HERMANOS, INC served on 12/5/2018, answer due 12/26/2018; Universal Insurance Company served on 12/5/2018, answer due 12/26/2018; Victor Vazquez-Perez served on 12/10/2018, answer due 12/31/2018. (Davila-Rodriguez, Christopher)
November 30, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Vanesa Vicens on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Vicens, Vanesa)
November 28, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to QUINTANA HERMANOS, INC, Universal Insurance Company, Victor Vazquez-Perez (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
November 28, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory (arg)
November 27, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher A. Davila-Rodriguez on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Davila-Rodriguez, Christopher)
November 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6159570.), filed by Jose Alvarez, Mary Lou Ortiz. Service due by 2/25/2019, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Universal Insurance Company, #4 Summons Quintana Hermanos, Inc., #5 Summons Victor Vazquez)(Indiano-Vicic, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortiz et al v. Universal Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Alvarez
Represented By: David C. Indiano-Vicic
Represented By: Christopher A. Davila-Rodriguez
Represented By: Vanesa Vicens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Lou Ortiz
Represented By: David C. Indiano-Vicic
Represented By: Christopher A. Davila-Rodriguez
Represented By: Vanesa Vicens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QUINTANA HERMANOS, INC
Represented By: Miguel G. Laffitte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES I-X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor Vazquez-Perez
Represented By: Miguel G. Laffitte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Insurance Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?