Condado 3 CFL, LLC v. Diaz-Vega et al

Plaintiff: Condado 3 CFL, LLC
Defendant: Hildred Mattei-Franceschini, Conjugal Partnership Diaz-Mattei and Esteban Diaz-Vega
Case Number: 3:2018cv01928
Filed: December 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Juan M Perez-Gimenez
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for extension of time. Answer deadline due by 2/14/2019. Signed by Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez on 2/1/2019. (PMA)
January 25, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for extension of time until 20 days to Answer Order filed by Esteban Diaz-Vega, Pro se. Responses due by 2/8/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (gav)
January 16, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Condado 3 CFL, LLC upon All Defendants. (Fernandez-Chiques, Francisco)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER RE COMMUNICATIONS WITH STAFF. Signed by Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez on 4/4/2014. (gav)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER RE COURTESY COPIES. Signed by Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez on 4/4/2014.(gav)
December 6, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Conjugal Partnership Diaz-Mattei, Esteban Diaz-Vega, Hildred Mattei-Franceschini (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez (arg)
December 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6172337.), filed by Condado 3 CFL, LLC. Service due by 3/5/2019, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Note, #2 Exhibit B - Mortgage Deed, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Category Sheet, #5 Summons)(Fernandez-Chiques, Francisco)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Condado 3 CFL, LLC v. Diaz-Vega et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hildred Mattei-Franceschini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Diaz-Mattei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esteban Diaz-Vega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Condado 3 CFL, LLC
Represented By: Francisco J. Fernandez-Chiques
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?