Lopez-Correa v. USA

Petitioner: Jennisse Lopez-Correa
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 3:2018cv01930
Filed: December 5, 2018
Court: Puerto Rico District Court
Presiding Judge: Gustavo A Gelpi
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order 5 ORDER: Granting as requested #4 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply until March 1, 2019. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 1/31/2019. (LE)
January 30, 2019 4 MOTION for Extension of Time until March 1, 2019 to File Response/Reply as to #1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) (Criminal Number 09-cr-00233-02) filed by Jennisse Lopez-Correa filed by Mariana E. Bauza on behalf of USA Responses due by 2/13/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Bauza, Mariana)
December 11, 2018 3 STANDING ORDERS: (1) DISCOVERY DISPUTES, (2) COURTESY COPIES, (3) DEPOSITIONS IN CIVIL CASES, (4) CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, (5) COMMUNICATIONS BY COUNSEL OR THEIR STAFF WITH JUDGE GELPI'S CHAMBERS' STAFF, (6) CODE OF CIVILITY. (gmm)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order 2 ORDER: The United States shall respond to #1 Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) (Criminal Number 09-cr-00233-02) filed by Jennisse Lopez-Correa, on or before January 30, 2019. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 12/6/2018. (LE)
December 5, 2018 1 **CASE PARTICIPANTS** MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) (Criminal Number 09-cr-00233-02) filed by Linda Backiel on behalf of Jennisse Lopez-Correa. Responses due by 12/19/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of counsel in support, #2 Exhibit to affirmation of counsel, #3 Affidavit of movant, #4 Exhibit 1 117-1 (Romey Report) translations, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit 3 translation LGC statement, #7 Exhibit 4 ROI 5.28, #8 Exhibit 5, prescriptions, #9 Exhibit TSI, #10 Exhibit SJC IP, #11 Exhibit Power & Control wheel)(gmm) Document filed restricted as per docket #273 Order filed in criminal case 09-233 (GAG) (gmm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez-Correa v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Mariana E. Bauza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jennisse Lopez-Correa
Represented By: Linda Backiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?