Castrillon v. Wyndham Hotels and Resorts, LLC, et al

Plaintiff: Daniel Castrillon
Defendant: DEF Corporation, arbnwk, Prime Janitorial Service Corp., Richard Roe 1-5, Wyndham Hotels and Resorts, LLC, ABC Corporation, John Doe 1-5 and WHM Carib, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv01931
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: Puerto Rico District Court
Presiding Judge: Gustavo A Gelpi
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 29 JUDGMENT is hereby entered DISMISSING Daniel Castrillon's claims against Wyndham Hotel and Resorts LLC, et al. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 2/1/2019. (AGF) Modified on 2/1/2019 to edit docket text (gmm). (Main Document 29 replaced on 2/1/2019 to correct date) (gmm).
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order 28 ORDER: Granting #22 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 2/1/2019. (AGF) Modified on 2/1/2019 to edit docket text and add PDF as per Chamber's request (gmm). (gmm). (Main Document 28 replaced on 2/1/2019 to correct date) (gmm).
January 31, 2019 27 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion filed by Daniel Castrillon Re: #22 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Wyndham Hotels and Resorts, LLC filed by Daniel Castrillon. (Fleming, Robert)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order 26 ORDER: Noted #25 Motion for Leave to Appear. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 1/28/2019. (AGF)
January 25, 2019 25 MOTION for Leave to Appear filed by Christian M. Echavarri-Junco on behalf of Wyndham Hotels and Resorts, LLC Responses due by 2/8/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Echavarri-Junco, Christian)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order 24 ORDER: Denying #19 Motion for Entry of Default. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 1/25/2019. (AGF)
January 24, 2019 23 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion filed by Wyndham Hotels and Resorts, LLC Re: #19 MOTION for Default Entry as to Wyndham Hotels and Resorts, LLC filed by Daniel Castrillon filed by Wyndham Hotels and Resorts, LLC. (Perez-Refojos, Daniel)
January 24, 2019 22 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Daniel Perez-Refojos on behalf of Wyndham Hotels and Resorts, LLC Responses due by 2/7/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Perez-Refojos, Daniel)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order 21 ORDER: Defendant Wyndham Hotels and Resorts, LLC must file an answer to Docket No. 19 on/or before February 10, 2019. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 1/23/2019. (AGF)
January 22, 2019 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daniel Castrillon upon Prime Janitorial Service Corp. served on 1/11/2019, answer due 2/1/2019. (Fleming, Robert)
January 11, 2019 19 MOTION for Default Entry as to Wyndham Hotels and Resorts, LLC filed by Robert A. Fleming on behalf of Daniel Castrillon Responses due by 1/25/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Fleming, Robert)
January 3, 2019 18 Summons Issued as to Prime Janitorial Service Corp., WHM Carib, LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order 17 ORDER: Granting #16 Motion for Issuance of Summons. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 1/3/2019. (AGF)
January 2, 2019 16 MOTION for Issuance of Summons as to Prime Janitorial Service Corp., WHM Carib, LLC filed by Robert A. Fleming on behalf of Daniel Castrillon Responses due by 1/16/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Summons Prime Janitorial Services Corp., #2 Summons WHM Carib, LLC.)(Fleming, Robert)
December 19, 2018 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Daniel Castrillon.(Fleming, Robert)
December 19, 2018 14 NOTICE of Filing of Amended Complaint by Daniel Castrillon (Fleming, Robert)
December 12, 2018 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert A. Fleming on behalf of Daniel Castrillon (Fleming, Robert)
December 11, 2018 12 STANDING ORDERS: (1) DISCOVERY DISPUTES, (2) COURTESY COPIES, (3) DEPOSITIONS IN CIVIL CASES, (4) CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, (5) COMMUNICATIONS BY COUNSEL OR THEIR STAFF WITH JUDGE GELPI'S CHAMBERS' STAFF, (6) CODE OF CIVILITY. (gmm)
December 6, 2018 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re: case transferred from the District of New Jersey. Signed by Clerk on 12/6/2018. (gmm)
December 6, 2018 10 Case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 2:18-cv-11392. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order 9 OPINION AND ORDER ON MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE #8 is Granted, the Clerk of the Court shall transfer this action to the District of Puerto Rico. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 10/26/2018. (sm) [Transferred from njd on 12/6/2018.]
September 26, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #8 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Puerto Rico . Motion set for 11/5/2018 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm) [Transferred from njd on 12/6/2018.]
September 24, 2018 8 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Puerto Rico by WYNDHAM HOTELS AND RESORTS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification of C. Brian Kornbrek, #3 Certification of N. Stolzlechner, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(KORNBREK, CLIFFORD) [Transferred from njd on 12/6/2018.]
August 27, 2018 Answer Due Deadline Update - The document submitted by WYNDHAM HOTELS AND RESORTS, LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 9/24/2018. (sm) [Transferred from njd on 12/6/2018.]
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order 7 CONSENT ORDER that the time for defendant Wyndham Hotels and Resorts to respond to plaintiff's Complaint is extended to 9/24/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 8/24/2018. (sm) [Transferred from njd on 12/6/2018.]
August 23, 2018 6 Letter from C. Brian Kornbrek. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order extending the time for Wyndham Hotels and Resorts, LLC, to respond to plaintiff's complaint)(KORNBREK, CLIFFORD) [Transferred from njd on 12/6/2018.]
August 3, 2018 Clerk`s Text Order - The document submitted by WYNDHAM HOTELS AND RESORTS, LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 8/23/2018. (sm) [Transferred from njd on 12/6/2018.]
August 2, 2018 5 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer Attorney CLIFFORD BRIAN KORNBREK for WYNDHAM HOTELS AND RESORTS, LLC added. (KORNBREK, CLIFFORD) [Transferred from njd on 12/6/2018.]
July 28, 2018 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DANIEL CASTRILLON. WYNDHAM HOTELS AND RESORTS, LLC served on 7/19/2018, answer due 8/9/2018. (WISKOW, PHILLIP) [Transferred from njd on 12/6/2018.]
July 6, 2018 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to PRIME JANITORIAL SERVICE CORP., WYNDHAM HOTELS AND RESORTS, LLC Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *Susan Miller* (sm) [Transferred from njd on 12/6/2018.]
July 5, 2018 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (ak, ) [Transferred from njd on 12/6/2018.]
July 5, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion. (ak, ) [Transferred from njd on 12/6/2018.]
July 5, 2018 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DANIEL CASTRILLON identifying wyndham as Corporate Parent.. (WISKOW, PHILLIP) [Transferred from njd on 12/6/2018.]
July 5, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8863373) with JURY DEMAND, filed by DANIEL CASTRILLON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(WISKOW, PHILLIP) [Transferred from njd on 12/6/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castrillon v. Wyndham Hotels and Resorts, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Castrillon
Represented By: Phillip C. Wiscow
Represented By: Robert A. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEF Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: arbnwk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prime Janitorial Service Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Roe 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyndham Hotels and Resorts, LLC
Represented By: Clifford Brian Kornbrek
Represented By: Christian M. Echavarri-Junco
Represented By: Daniel Perez-Refojos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WHM Carib, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?