Rosario v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Inocencio Rosario
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2018cv01933
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Marshal D Morgan
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Inocencio Rosario upon (Attachments: #1 Supplement mail receipt) (Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro)
December 26, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by David O. Martorani-Dale on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Martorani-Dale, David)
December 12, 2018 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: By Order of Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (Docket No. 6), this case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan for all further proceedings, including entry of judgment. All future pleadings shall bear only the initials of the Magistrate Judge next to the case number: Civil Case No. 18-1933(MDM). Judge Gelpi is no longer assigned to this case. Signed by Clerk on 12/12/2018. (gr)
December 11, 2018 Filing 7 STANDING ORDERS: (1) DISCOVERY DISPUTES, (2) COURTESY COPIES, (3) DEPOSITIONS IN CIVIL CASES, (4) CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, (5) COMMUNICATIONS BY COUNSEL OR THEIR STAFF WITH JUDGE GELPI'S CHAMBERS' STAFF, (6) CODE OF CIVILITY. (gmm)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is hereby referred to US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan for all further proceedings, including entry of judgment as per 28 USC 636. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 12/11/2018. (AGF)
December 10, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm)
December 10, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (arg)
December 7, 2018 Filing 3 CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Inocencio Rosario. (Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro)
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Pedro G. Cruz-Sanchez on behalf of Inocencio Rosario (Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0104-6175536.), filed by Inocencio Rosario. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosario v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: David O. Martorani-Dale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Inocencio Rosario
Represented By: Pedro G. Cruz-Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?