Contreras v. Commonwealth of Puerto Rico et al
Plaintiff: Manuel Contreras
Defendant: Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and Maria Lugardo-Cintron
Case Number: 3:2018cv01944
Filed: December 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Juan M Perez-Gimenez
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2019 Filing 6 Mail sent to Manuel Contreras re 2 NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE PLEADING was returned as undeliverable. (gav)
January 8, 2019 Filing 5 JUDGMENT dismissing case. This case is now closed. Signed by Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez on 1/8/2019.(PMA)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez on 1/8/2019.(PMA)
December 10, 2018 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Maria Lugardo-Cintron, filed by Manuel Contreras, Pro Se. Service due by 3/11/2019, (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ad)
December 10, 2018 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING. The Prisoner did not attach a statement certified by the appropriate institutional officer, showing all receipts, expenditures, and balances during the last six months in his/her institutional account. Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 12/31/2018. (ad)
December 10, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Manuel Contreras, Pro Se. Responses due by 12/24/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(ad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Contreras v. Commonwealth of Puerto Rico et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth of Puerto Rico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Lugardo-Cintron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Contreras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?