Gonzalez-Rivera
Petitioner: Carlos L. Gonzalez-Rivera
Respondent: Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Wanda Vazquez-Garced and Lorraine Martinez-Adorno
Case Number: 3:2018cv01945
Filed: December 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Carmen C Cerezo
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2019 Filing 5 Motion In Compliance re #2 Notice of Defective Filing filed by Carlos L. Gonzalez-Rivera, pro se. Responses due by 2/7/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(idg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/28/2019: #2 Exhibit) (idg).
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for extension of time filed by Carlos L. Gonzalez-Rivera, pro se. Responses due by 1/30/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(idg)
December 10, 2018 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, filed by Carlos L. Gonzalez-Rivera, Pro Se. Service due by 3/11/2019, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(ad)
December 10, 2018 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING. The Prisoner did not attach a statement certified by the appropriate institutional officer, showing all receipts, expenditures, and balances during the last six months in his/her institutional account. Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 12/31/2018. (ad)
December 10, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Carlos L. Gonzalez-Rivera, Pro Se. Responses due by 12/24/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(ad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Carlos L. Gonzalez-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Commonwealth of Puerto Rico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Wanda Vazquez-Garced
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lorraine Martinez-Adorno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?